Barker et al v Nestle Purina Petcare Company
Plaintiff: Michelle Barker, Susanna Grigoli and Carrie Carter
Defendant: Nestle Purina PetCare Company
Case Number: 4:2021cv01075
Filed: August 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Matthew T Schelp
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time, Doc. #14 , is GRANTED. Defendant has through Monday, November 15, 2021 to file its required response to Plaintiffs' Complaint. In the event Defendant files a motion to dismiss, Plaintiffs shall have through Monday, December 13, 2021 to file a memorandum in opposition to the motion, and Defendant shall have through Monday, December 27, 2021 to file any reply. Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 10/28/2021. (TMT)
October 27, 2021 Filing 15 ENTRY of Appearance by Keri Elizabeth Borders for Defendant Nestle Purina PetCare Company. (Borders, Keri)
October 27, 2021 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Consent Motion for Extension of Time and Revised Briefing Schedule by Defendant Nestle Purina PetCare Company. (Bennett, James)
October 25, 2021 Filing 13 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Matthew T. Schelp for all further proceedings. (TMT)
October 25, 2021 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by James F. Bennett for Defendant Nestle Purina PetCare Company. (Bennett, James)
October 25, 2021 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Adam Joseph Simon for Defendant Nestle Purina PetCare Company. (Simon, Adam)
October 13, 2021 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Kevin Laukaitis for Plaintiffs Michelle Barker, Carrie Carter, Susanna Grigoli. (Laukaitis, Kevin)
September 30, 2021 Notice from Clerk instructing Plaintiffs Michelle Barker, Carrie Carter, Susanna Grigoli to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 10/7/2021. (KCD)
September 29, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Michelle Barker, Carrie Carter, Susanna Grigoli Nestle Purina PetCare Company waiver signed on 9/1/2021, answer due 11/1/2021. (Goldenberg, Jeffrey)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Verified Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Docs. #6 , #7 ) filed by Jeffrey S. Goldenberg and Gary E. Mason, counsel for Plaintiffs, are GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Jeffrey S. Goldenberg and Gary E. Mason are hereby admitted for the purpose of representing Plaintiffs in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 9/16/2021. (KBL)
September 15, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Gary E. Mason. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8868421) by Plaintiffs Michelle Barker, Carrie Carter, Susanna Grigoli. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Mason, Gary)
September 15, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jeffrey S. Goldenberg. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8867659) by Plaintiffs Michelle Barker, Carrie Carter, Susanna Grigoli. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Goldenberg, Jeffrey)
September 2, 2021 Filing 5 Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate to Defendant Nestle Purina PetCare Company. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every non-governmental organizational party must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within ten (10) days of the party's first pleading or entry of appearance. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible # (moed-0001.pdf). (KCD)
September 1, 2021 Filing 4 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (Potter, Jacob)
September 1, 2021 Filing 3 Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate to Defendant Nestle Purina PetCare Company. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every non-governmental organizational party must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within ten (10) days of the party's first pleading or entry of appearance. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible # (moed-0001.pdf). (KCD)
September 1, 2021 Case Opening Notification: Waivers issued 1. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins. (BAK)
August 31, 2021 Filing 2 WAIVER of Service issued defendant All Plaintiffs. sent to Nestle Purina Petcare Company on 9/1/21 filed by Michelle Barker. Waiver of Service due by 11/1/2021. (Edgar, John)
August 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Plaintiffs with receipt number AMOEDC-8839646, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Michelle Barker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Form Filing Form)(Edgar, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barker et al v Nestle Purina Petcare Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Barker
Represented By: John F. Edgar
Represented By: Jeffrey S Goldenberg
Represented By: Gary E. Mason
Represented By: Kevin Laukaitis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susanna Grigoli
Represented By: Kevin Laukaitis
Represented By: Jeffrey S Goldenberg
Represented By: John F. Edgar
Represented By: Gary E. Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrie Carter
Represented By: Jeffrey S Goldenberg
Represented By: John F. Edgar
Represented By: Gary E. Mason
Represented By: Kevin Laukaitis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nestle Purina PetCare Company
Represented By: James F. Bennett
Represented By: Keri Elizabeth Borders
Represented By: Adam Joseph Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?