Porter v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Plaintiff: Terence E Porter
Defendant: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Not Yet Classified: Melvin David Kennedy
Case Number: 4:2021cv01170
Filed: September 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Ronnie L White
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION AND ORDER APPOINTING PRO BONO NEUTRAL: This case is referred to: Early Neutral Evaluation. Designation of Lead Counsel: Mr. Arthur Gregg [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS] (ADR Completion Deadline due by 12/31/2021. ADR Compliance Report Deadline due by 1/14/2022. Designation of Neutral/Conference Report due by 12/2/2021.) Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 11/22/2021. (TMT) Modified on 11/23/2021 (TMT).
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 25. Mon Nov 22 11:43:57 CST 2021 (Davis, Kinica)
November 17, 2021 Filing 24 EXHIBITS Received: 11/17/2021 by Plaintiff Terence E Porter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 6, #6 Exhibit 7, #7 Exhibit 8)(KCD)
November 17, 2021 Filing 23 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY (no pdf attached) for proceedings held before District Judge Ronnie L. White:Rule 16 Conference held on 11/17/2021. Conference held in person. Case taken under evaluation for mediation. All motions held in abeyance until CMO is issued. (Court Reporter:Linda Nichols, Linda_Nichols@moed.uscourts.gov, 314-244-7983) (proceedings started: 2:00pm) (proceedings ended: 2:08pm) (Deputy Clerk: KCD)(Appearance for Plaintiff: Terence Porter (Pro Se))(Appearance for Defendant: Arthur Gregg) (KCD)
November 17, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION TO TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE by Plaintiff Terence E Porter. (TMT)
November 17, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION NOT TO ALLOW RULE 502D OR CLAWBACK ORDER by Plaintiff Terence E Porter. (TMT)
November 15, 2021 Filing 20 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiff Terence E Porter. (TMT)
November 10, 2021 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM re #9 Rule 16 Order, (Defendant Filing Memorandum Regarding Joint Proposed Scheduling Plan) by Defendant Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Gregg e-mail dtd 11.8.21, #2 Exhibit B - Defendant Proposed Scheduling Plan)(Gregg, Arthur)
November 8, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION TO TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE by Plaintiff Terence E Porter. (KCD)
November 5, 2021 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #11 MOTION for Leave to filed by Defendant Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. (Dickinson, Joshua)
November 4, 2021 Filing 16 ENTRY of Appearance by Arthur David Gregg for Defendant Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. (Gregg, Arthur)
November 1, 2021 Filing 15 RETURN LETTER from clerk to Terence E. Porter re: Discovery Material (Attachments: #1 Returned Item) (BRP)
October 29, 2021 Filing 14 RETURN LETTER from clerk to Terence Porter re: Return of Documents (Attachments: #1 Attachment Returned Document) (TMT)
October 28, 2021 Filing 13 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - MOTION for Discovery for Information Necessary to Receive a Fair Trial by Plaintiff Terence E Porter. (TMT) Modified on 10/29/2021 (TMT).
October 28, 2021 Filing 12 PRO SE MOTION to Take Judicial Notice by Plaintiff Terence E Porter. (Attachments: #1 1945 MO Bill of Rights Fed)(BRP)
October 22, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint by Plaintiff Terence E Porter. (TMT)
October 20, 2021 Filing 10 RETURN LETTER from clerk to Terence Porter re: Return of Documents (Attachments: #1 Attachment Returned Document) (TMT)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 10. Wed Oct 20 15:33:51 CDT 2021 (Tillman, Tiffani)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RULE 16 ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 2 Joint Scheduling Plan due by 11/10/2021. Rule 16 Conference set for 11/17/2021 02:00 PM in Courtroom 10S - St. Louis before District Judge Ronnie L. White. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 10/18/2021. (KXS)
October 18, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint #4 by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC.(Dickinson, Joshua)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 9. Mon Oct 18 11:21:48 CDT 2021 (Spurgeon, Katherine)
October 13, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC Sent To: State Court - Executed (Attachments: #1 Ex 1 - Notice to State Court)(Dickinson, Joshua)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 6. Sent to non-electronic party this date. Tue Oct 12 11:41:26 CDT 2021 (Porter, Brittany)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint (ECF No. 5) is GRANTED. Defendant shall file its response to Plaintiff's Complaint no later than October 18, 2021. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 10/7/21. (JEB)
October 7, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 Petition (Removal/Transfer) by Defendant Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. (Dickinson, Joshua)
September 30, 2021 Filing 4 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis County, filed by Terence E Porter.(JKL)
September 30, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, Sent To: Plaintiff (Dickinson, Joshua)
September 30, 2021 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC,. Parent companies: PRA Group, Inc., Publicly held company: PRA Group, Inc.,. (Dickinson, Joshua)
September 30, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis County Circuit Court, case number 21SL-SC00212, with receipt number AMOEDC-8895700, in the amount of $402 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC,. (Attachments: #1 Ex A - State Court Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form)(Dickinson, Joshua)
September 30, 2021 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Ronnie L. White. (JKL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Porter v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terence E Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Represented By: Joshua C. Dickinson
Represented By: Arthur David Gregg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Melvin David Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?