Walsh v. At Home Care St. Louis, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Secretary of Labor Martin J. Walsh and Martin J. Walsh
Defendant: At Home Care St. Louis, LLC, At Home Care St. Louis CDS, LLC and Carlita Vasser
Case Number: 4:2021cv01176
Filed: September 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Henry Edward Autrey
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1938
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Martin J. Walsh At Home Care St. Louis CDS, LLC waiver signed on 9/30/2021, answer due 11/29/2021. (McGinnis, Megan)
November 22, 2021 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Martin J. Walsh Carlita Vasser waiver signed on 9/30/2021, answer due 11/29/2021. (McGinnis, Megan)
November 22, 2021 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Martin J. Walsh At Home Care St. Louis, LLC waiver signed on 9/30/2021, answer due 11/29/2021. (McGinnis, Megan)
October 1, 2021 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Henry E. Autrey. 3 Waiver(s) of Service issued. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). (JKL)
September 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Martin J. Walsh. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form, #4 Waiver of Service Waiver of Service, #5 Waiver of Service Waiver of Service, #6 Waiver of Service Waiver of Service)(McGinnis, Megan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walsh v. At Home Care St. Louis, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Secretary of Labor Martin J. Walsh
Represented By: Megan JoAnn McGinnis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin J. Walsh
Represented By: Megan JoAnn McGinnis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: At Home Care St. Louis, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: At Home Care St. Louis CDS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlita Vasser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?