Igert v. 21st Century Sentinel Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Louis Igert
Defendant: 21st Century Sentinel Insurance Company and Cincinnati Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2021cv01191
Filed: October 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Henry Edward Autrey
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RULE 16 ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 2. Joint Scheduling Plan due by 1/5/2022. Rule 16 Conference set for 1/11/2022 10:00 AM in Telephone Conference in Chambers before District Judge Henry Edward Autrey. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on November 30, 2021. (MCB)
November 29, 2021 Filing 14 ENTRY of Appearance by Augustus Thomas Hayes for Defendant Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Hayes, Augustus)
November 29, 2021 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by Tyler James Finnegan for Defendant Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Finnegan, Tyler)
November 19, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by 21st Century Sentinel Insurance Company.(Schubert, Rebecca)
November 19, 2021 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Rebecca E. Schubert for Defendant 21st Century Sentinel Insurance Company. (Schubert, Rebecca)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #8 MOTION for Leave to Answer Out of Time by Defendant Cincinnati Insurance Company; GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 11/19/2021. (JEB)
November 18, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Cincinnati Insurance Company.(Bub, David)
November 18, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Answer Out of Time by Defendant Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Bub, David)
November 18, 2021 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by David P. Bub for Defendant Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Bub, David)
November 16, 2021 Filing 6 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Louis Igert. . (Kolker, Scott)
October 18, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Louis Igert as to 21st Century Sentinel Insurance Company. (MCB)
October 7, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant Louis Igert , filed by Louis Igert.(Kolker, Scott)
October 6, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Louis Igert Process Server: Cole County Sheriff (BAK)
October 6, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Louis Igert Process Server: Cole County Sheriff (BAK)
October 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Louis Igert Jury Demand,, filed by Louis Igert. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons in a Civil Action - 21st Century Sentinel Ins. Co., #4 Notice of Intent to Use Process Server - 21 St. Century Sentinel Ins. Co., #5 Summons in Civil Action - Cincinnati Ins. Co., #6 Notice of Intent to Use Process Server - Cincinnati Ins. Co.)(Kolker, Scott)
October 6, 2021 Receipt: $ 402.00, receipt number AMOEDC-8906009 for Civil Filing Fee. (BAK)
October 6, 2021 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Henry E. Autrey. 2 Summons(es) issued and emailed to attorney Scott L. Kolker. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). (BAK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Igert v. 21st Century Sentinel Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Igert
Represented By: Scott L. Kolker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 21st Century Sentinel Insurance Company
Represented By: Rebecca E. Schubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cincinnati Insurance Company
Represented By: David P. Bub
Represented By: Augustus Thomas Hayes
Represented By: Tyler James Finnegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?