Williamson et al v. Willoughby et al
Plaintiff: Ramon Williamson and Kandice Wheelington
Defendant: Billy E. Willoughby and Anytime Hauling, LLC
Case Number: 4:2021cv01196
Filed: October 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Catherine D Perry
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Settlement by All Defendants (Zickrick, Korissa)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CONFERENCE. This case is assigned to Track: 2. Joint Scheduling Plan due by 12/10/2021. Rule 16 Conference set for 12/17/2021 11:00 AM in Telephone Conference in Chambers before District Judge Catherine D. Perry... SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 11/08/2021. (ANP)
November 2, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Anytime Hauling, LLC Sent To: State Court - Executed (Perryman, Ted)
October 7, 2021 Filing 11 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis County, filed by Ramon Williamson, Kandice Wheelington.(JKL)
October 7, 2021 Filing 10 Defendant Billy E. Willoughby's ANSWER to Complaint by Billy E Willoughby.(Perryman, Ted)
October 7, 2021 Filing 9 Defendant Anytime Hauling LLC's ANSWER to Complaint by Anytime Hauling, LLC.(Perryman, Ted)
October 7, 2021 Filing 8 STIPULATION For Removal by Defendants Anytime Hauling, LLC, Billy E Willoughby. (Perryman, Ted)
October 7, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Anytime Hauling, LLC, Billy E Willoughby Sent To: Plaintiff (Perryman, Ted)
October 7, 2021 Filing 6 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendants Anytime Hauling, LLC, Billy E Willoughby. (Perryman, Ted)
October 7, 2021 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Brandy Lynn Johnson for Defendants Anytime Hauling, LLC, Billy E Willoughby. (Johnson, Brandy)
October 7, 2021 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Korissa M. Zickrick for Defendants Anytime Hauling, LLC, Billy E Willoughby. (Zickrick, Korissa)
October 7, 2021 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Ted L. Perryman for Defendants Anytime Hauling, LLC, Billy E Willoughby. (Perryman, Ted)
October 7, 2021 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Anytime Hauling, LLC.. (Perryman, Ted)
October 7, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis County Circuit, case number 21SL-CC04049, with receipt number AMOEDC-8908986, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Anytime Hauling, LLC, Billy E Willoughby. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form)(Perryman, Ted)
October 7, 2021 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Catherine D. Perry. (JKL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williamson et al v. Willoughby et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramon Williamson
Represented By: John L.B. Wilbers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kandice Wheelington
Represented By: John L.B. Wilbers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billy E. Willoughby
Represented By: Ted L. Perryman
Represented By: Brandy Lynn Johnson
Represented By: Korissa M. Zickrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anytime Hauling, LLC
Represented By: Ted L. Perryman
Represented By: Brandy Lynn Johnson
Represented By: Korissa M. Zickrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?