Hoggard et al v. Mick Keane's Express Delivery Service, Inc.
Plaintiff: Gary Hoggard, Dawn Dale and Terry Sanders, Sr.
Defendant: Mick Keane's Express Delivery Service, Inc. doing business as Keane's Express Delivery
Case Number: 4:2021cv01292
Filed: October 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Clark
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Plaintiffs Dawn Dale, Gary Hoggard, Terry Sanders, Sr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Purushotham, Matthew)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Docket Text ORDER: The Court continues the Rule 16 conference to January 4, 2022 at 4:30 p.m. by Zoom. Conference participants will receive an email with a link to access the conference. Lead trial counsel must participate in the conference. Pursuant to Local Rule 13.02, all means of photographing, recording, broadcasting, and televising are prohibited in any courtroom, and in areas adjacent to any courtroom, except when authorized by the presiding judge. This includes proceedings ordered by the Court to be conducted by phone or video. (Rule 16 Conference set for 1/4/2022 04:30 PM in Zoom Video Conference before District Judge Stephen R. Clark.). Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 12/8/2021. (CLO)
November 30, 2021 Filing 14 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Defendant Mick Keane's Express Delivery Service, Inc.. . (Kaemmerer, Bryan)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: This case is assigned to Preliminary Track: Track 2 (Standard). No later than Monday, November 29, 2021, counsel shall file with the Clerk of the Court a joint proposed scheduling plan. Pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, a scheduling conference is set for December 8, 2021 at 4:00 p.m. CT by Zoom. Conference participants will receive an email with a link to access the conference. Lead trial counsel must participate in the conference. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS.) (Joint Scheduling Plan due by 11/29/2021. Rule 16 Conference set for 12/8/2021 04:00 PM via Zoom Video Conference before District Judge Stephen R. Clark.) Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 11/19/2021. (LNJ)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Docket Text ORDER: The Court grants the #10 #11 motions for leave to appear pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 11/19/2021. (LNJ)
November 19, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Matthew Purushotham. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8988577) by Plaintiffs Dawn Dale, Gary Hoggard, Terry Sanders, Sr.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Purushotham, Matthew)
November 19, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice David Ricksecker. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8988434) by Plaintiffs Dawn Dale, Gary Hoggard, Terry Sanders, Sr.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Ricksecker, David)
November 19, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Mick Keane's Express Delivery Service, Inc..(Kaemmerer, Bryan)
November 8, 2021 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Mick Keane's Express Delivery Service, Inc.. Parent companies: none, Subsidiaries: none, Publicly held company: none,. (Kaemmerer, Bryan)
November 8, 2021 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Bryan M. Kaemmerer for Defendant Mick Keane's Express Delivery Service, Inc.. (Kaemmerer, Bryan)
November 8, 2021 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael E. Kaemmerer for Defendant Mick Keane's Express Delivery Service, Inc.. (Kaemmerer, Michael)
November 2, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Gary Hoggard, Terry Sanders, Sr., Dawn Dale. Mick Keane's Express Delivery Service, Inc. served on 11/1/2021, answer due 11/22/2021. (Riggan, Russell)
November 1, 2021 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Samuel W. Moore for Plaintiffs Dawn Dale, Gary Hoggard, Terry Sanders, Sr.. (Moore, Samuel)
October 29, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Dawn Dale, Gary Hoggard, Terry Sanders, Sr. re #1 Complaint, Entry of Appearance of Samuel W. Moore (Riggan, Russell)
October 29, 2021 Judge Clark enters a Standing Order in all of his cases as follows: See Order for details #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/judge/stephen-r-clark (LNJ)
October 28, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs Dawn D Dale, Gary Wayne Hoggard, Terry Wayne Sanders, Sr. Process Server: Scott Brown of SB Serve LLC (JWD)
October 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Plaintiffs with receipt number AMOEDC-8945465, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Gary Hoggard, Terry Sanders, Sr., Dawn Dale. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Consents, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Hoggard Right to Sue Letter, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form, #5 Summons Summons in a Civil Action, #6 Notice of Intent to Use Process Server)(Riggan, Russell)
October 28, 2021 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Stephen R. Clark. 1 Summons(es) issued and emailed to attorney Russell C. Riggan. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). (JWD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoggard et al v. Mick Keane's Express Delivery Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Hoggard
Represented By: Russell C. Riggan
Represented By: David Ricksecker
Represented By: Matthew D. Purushotham
Represented By: Samuel W. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Dale
Represented By: Russell C. Riggan
Represented By: David Ricksecker
Represented By: Matthew D. Purushotham
Represented By: Samuel W. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Sanders, Sr.
Represented By: Russell C. Riggan
Represented By: David Ricksecker
Represented By: Matthew D. Purushotham
Represented By: Samuel W. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mick Keane's Express Delivery Service, Inc. doing business as Keane's Express Delivery
Represented By: Bryan M. Kaemmerer
Represented By: Michael E. Kaemmerer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?