State of Missouri et al v. Biden et al
Plaintiff: State of Missouri, State of Nebraska, State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Iowa, State of Montana, State of New Hampshire, State of North Dakota, State of South Dakota and State of Wyoming
Defendant: Joseph R. Biden, Jr., United States of America, United States Office of Personnel Management, Kiran Ahuja, General Services Administration, Robin Carnahan, Office of Management and Budget, Shalanda Young, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Jeffrey Zients, Federal Acquisition Regulatory Council, Lesley A. Field, John M. Tenaglia, Jeffrey A. Koses and Karla S. Jackson
Case Number: 4:2021cv01300
Filed: October 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: David D Noce
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a Zoom Scheduling Conference with the Court and counsel for all parties is set for Friday, January 7, 2022, at 10:00 a.m. Counsel should participate in the conference by going to zoomgov.com and enter the ID and password: Meeting ID: 160 599 0218 Password: 346672. Counsel should be prepared to discuss scheduling of further proceedings in this case. (Attorneys-Only Conference set for 1/7/2022 10:00 AM in Zoom Video Conference before Magistrate Judge David D. Noce.) Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 12/23/2021. (JMP)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for a preliminary injunction (Doc. #8 ) is sustained. Defendants are enjoined from enforcing the vaccine mandate for federal contractors and subcontractors in all covered contracts in Missouri, Nebraska, Alaska, Arkansas, Iowa, Montana, New Hampshire, North Dakota, South Dakota, and Wyoming. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs motion to expedite preliminary injunction briefing (Doc. #10 ) is denied as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 12/20/2021. (JMP)
December 20, 2021 Filing 35 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs State of Montana, State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Iowa, State of Missouri, State of Nebraska, State of New Hampshire, State of North Dakota, State of South Dakota, State of Wyoming . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Talent, Michael)
December 20, 2021 Filing 34 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Defendants Kiran Ahuja, Joseph R. Biden, Jr, Robin Carnahan, Federal Acquisition Regulatory Council, Lesley A. Field, General Services Administration, Karla S. Jackson, Jeffrey A. Koses, Office of Management and Budget, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, John M. Tenaglia, United States Office of Personnel Management, United States of America, Shalanda Young, Jeffrey Zients . (Avallone, Zach)
December 17, 2021 Filing 33 RESPONSE re #30 Notice of Supplemental Authority, #31 Notice of Supplemental Authority, filed by Defendants Kiran Ahuja, Joseph R. Biden, Jr, Robin Carnahan, Federal Acquisition Regulatory Council, Lesley A. Field, General Services Administration, Karla S. Jackson, Jeffrey A. Koses, Office of Management and Budget, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, John M. Tenaglia, United States Office of Personnel Management, United States of America, Shalanda Young, Jeffrey Zients. (Andrapalliyal, Vinita)
December 17, 2021 Filing 32 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Defendants Kiran Ahuja, Joseph R. Biden, Jr, Robin Carnahan, Federal Acquisition Regulatory Council, Lesley A. Field, General Services Administration, Karla S. Jackson, Jeffrey A. Koses, Office of Management and Budget, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, John M. Tenaglia, United States Office of Personnel Management, United States of America, Shalanda Young, Jeffrey Zients . (Attachments: #1 Order - Donovan v. Vance (E.D. Wash., Dec. 17, 2021))(Avallone, Zach)
December 15, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs State of Montana, State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Iowa, State of Missouri, State of Nebraska, State of New Hampshire, State of North Dakota, State of South Dakota, State of Wyoming . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Talent, Michael)
December 15, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs State of Montana, State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Iowa, State of Missouri, State of Nebraska, State of New Hampshire, State of North Dakota, State of South Dakota, State of Wyoming . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Talent, Michael)
December 10, 2021 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Supplemental Memorandum) filed by Defendants Kiran Ahuja, Joseph R. Biden, Jr, Robin Carnahan, Federal Acquisition Regulatory Council, Lesley A. Field, General Services Administration, Karla S. Jackson, Jeffrey A. Koses, Office of Management and Budget, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, John M. Tenaglia, United States Office of Personnel Management, United States of America, Shalanda Young, Jeffrey Zients. (Andrapalliyal, Vinita)
December 10, 2021 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re #26 Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Permanent Injunction filed by Plaintiffs State of Montana, State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Iowa, State of Missouri, State of Nebraska, State of New Hampshire, State of North Dakota, State of South Dakota, State of Wyoming. (Smith, Justin)
December 6, 2021 Filing 27 STATEMENT of Material Facts re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction per #26 Court Order for Joint Statement of Material Facts filed by Plaintiffs State of Montana, State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Iowa, State of Missouri, State of Nebraska, State of New Hampshire, State of North Dakota, State of South Dakota, State of Wyoming. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael Talent with Exhibits)(Talent, Michael)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the pending motion of defendants for leave to exceed the local rule page limit to respond to plaintiffs motion for preliminary injunction (Doc. #19 ) is sustained. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the pending motion of plaintiffs for leave to exceed the local rule page limit to reply in support of motion for preliminary injunction (Doc. #22 ) is sustained. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, to facilitate the prompt disposition of this action, not later than Monday, December 6, 2021, the parties must file a non-argumentative Joint Statement of Material Facts regarding the plaintiffs motion for a preliminary injunction (Doc. #8 ) regarding plaintiffs claims other than those founded on the federal Administrative Procedure Act. This joint statement may include comments on stipulated facts by way of footnote to the respective statement. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65(a)(2), the Court intends the parties Joint Statement of Material Facts to apply to the ultimate final dispositive merits of plaintiffs claims other than those founded on the federal Administrative Procedure Act. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that not later than December 10, 2021, the parties may file simultaneously supplemental memoranda on their respective positions regarding plaintiffs claims other than those founded on the Administrative Procedure Act. Any such supplemental memorandum may not exceed 20 pages in length, excluding the signature pages.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 11/24/21. (KJS)
November 24, 2021 Filing 25 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY (no pdf attached) for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David D. Noce: Status Conference held on 11/24/2021. Court and counsel discuss scheduling. Order to issue. (proceedings started: 9:00 am) (proceedings ended: 9:24 am) (Recorded on Zoom by: K. Shirley)(Appearance for Plaintiff: James Campbell/Michael Talent)(Appearance for Defendant: Zach Avallone/Vinita Andrapalliyal) (KJS)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that an Attorney's Only Status Conference is set for November 24, 2021 at 9:00 am via zoom.(Join zoomgov.com and enter the ID and password: Meeting ID: 160 599 0218 Password: 346672 ) (Attorneys-Only Conference set for 11/24/2021 09:00 AM in Zoom Video Conference before Magistrate Judge David D. Noce.) Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 11/23/21. (KJS)
November 22, 2021 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiffs State of Montana, State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Iowa, State of Missouri, State of Nebraska, State of New Hampshire, State of North Dakota, State of South Dakota, State of Wyoming. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Smith, Justin)
November 22, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation for Reply in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs State of Montana, State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Iowa, State of Missouri, State of Nebraska, State of New Hampshire, State of North Dakota, State of South Dakota, State of Wyoming. (Smith, Justin)
November 19, 2021 Filing 21 FULL CONSENT has been received by Defendants Kiran Ahuja, Joseph R. Biden, Jr, Robin Carnahan, Federal Acquisition Regulatory Council, Lesley A. Field, General Services Administration, Karla S. Jackson, Jeffrey A. Koses, Office of Management and Budget, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, John M. Tenaglia, United States Office of Personnel Management, United States of America, Shalanda Young, Jeffrey Zients, Plaintiffs State of Montana, State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Iowa, State of Missouri, State of Nebraska, State of New Hampshire, State of North Dakota, State of South Dakota, State of Wyoming. (JMP)
November 18, 2021 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendants Kiran Ahuja, Joseph R. Biden, Jr, Robin Carnahan, Federal Acquisition Regulatory Council, Lesley A. Field, General Services Administration, Karla S. Jackson, Jeffrey A. Koses, Office of Management and Budget, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, John M. Tenaglia, United States Office of Personnel Management, United States of America, Shalanda Young, Jeffrey Zients. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Decl. of Peter Marks, M.D., Ph.D., #2 Affidavit Decl. of Cody Benjamin, #3 Affidavit Decl. of Erica Hoffman)(Andrapalliyal, Vinita)
November 18, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Defendants Kiran Ahuja, Joseph R. Biden, Jr, Robin Carnahan, Federal Acquisition Regulatory Council, Lesley A. Field, General Services Administration, Karla S. Jackson, Jeffrey A. Koses, Office of Management and Budget, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, John M. Tenaglia, United States Office of Personnel Management, United States of America, Shalanda Young, Jeffrey Zients. (Andrapalliyal, Vinita)
November 17, 2021 Filing 18 ENTRY of Appearance by Zach A. Avallone for Defendants Kiran Ahuja, Joseph R. Biden, Jr, Robin Carnahan, Federal Acquisition Regulatory Council, Lesley A. Field, General Services Administration, Karla S. Jackson, Jeffrey A. Koses, Office of Management and Budget, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, John M. Tenaglia, United States Office of Personnel Management, United States of America, Shalanda Young, Jeffrey Zients. (Avallone, Zach)
November 16, 2021 Filing 17 ENTRY of Appearance by Samuel Paul Langholz for Plaintiff State of Iowa. (Langholz, Samuel)
November 15, 2021 Filing 16 ENTRY of Appearance by James A. Campbell for Plaintiff State of Nebraska. (Campbell, James)
November 15, 2021 Notice from Clerk instructing Defendants Kiran Ahuja, Joseph R. Biden, Jr, Robin Carnahan, Federal Acquisition Regulatory Council, Lesley A. Field, General Services Administration, Karla S. Jackson, Jeffrey A. Koses, Office of Management and Budget, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, John M. Tenaglia, United States Office of Personnel Management, United States of America, Shalanda Young, Jeffrey Zients to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 11/19/2021. (KXS)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion of plaintiffs for leave to exceed the 15-page limit for their memorandum (Doc. #9 ) in support of their motion for a preliminary injunction (Doc. #7 ) is sustained.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 11/12/21. (KJS)
November 12, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE Appearance of Counsel: by Defendants Kiran Ahuja, Joseph R. Biden, Jr, Robin Carnahan, Federal Acquisition Regulatory Council, Lesley A. Field, General Services Administration, Karla S. Jackson, Jeffrey A. Koses, Office of Management and Budget, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, John M. Tenaglia, United States Office of Personnel Management, United States of America, Shalanda Young, Jeffrey Zients (Avallone, Zach)
November 11, 2021 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Expedite Preliminary Injunction Briefing filed by Plaintiffs State of Montana, State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Iowa, State of Missouri, State of Nebraska, State of New Hampshire, State of North Dakota, State of South Dakota, State of Wyoming. (Smith, Justin)
November 10, 2021 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Expedite Preliminary Injunction Briefing filed by Defendants Kiran Ahuja, Joseph R. Biden, Jr, Robin Carnahan, Federal Acquisition Regulatory Council, Lesley A. Field, General Services Administration, Karla S. Jackson, Jeffrey A. Koses, Office of Management and Budget, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, John M. Tenaglia, United States Office of Personnel Management, United States of America, Shalanda Young, Jeffrey Zients. (Andrapalliyal, Vinita)
November 10, 2021 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Vinita Andrapalliyal for Defendants Kiran Ahuja, Joseph R. Biden, Jr, Robin Carnahan, Federal Acquisition Regulatory Council, Lesley A. Field, General Services Administration, Karla S. Jackson, Jeffrey A. Koses, Office of Management and Budget, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, John M. Tenaglia, United States Office of Personnel Management, United States of America, Shalanda Young, Jeffrey Zients. (Andrapalliyal, Vinita)
November 9, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Expedite Preliminary Injunction Briefing by Plaintiffs State of Montana, State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Iowa, State of Missouri, State of Nebraska, State of New Hampshire, State of North Dakota, State of South Dakota, State of Wyoming. (Smith, Justin)
November 4, 2021 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiffs State of Montana, State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Iowa, State of Missouri, State of Nebraska, State of New Hampshire, State of North Dakota, State of South Dakota, State of Wyoming. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit Exhibit O)(Smith, Justin)
November 4, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs State of Montana, State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Iowa, State of Missouri, State of Nebraska, State of New Hampshire, State of North Dakota, State of South Dakota, State of Wyoming. (Smith, Justin)
November 4, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs State of Montana, State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Iowa, State of Missouri, State of Nebraska, State of New Hampshire, State of North Dakota, State of South Dakota, State of Wyoming. (Smith, Justin)
November 3, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Plaintiffs State of Montana, State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Iowa, State of Missouri, State of Nebraska, State of New Hampshire, State of North Dakota, State of South Dakota, State of Wyoming. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Talent, Michael)
November 3, 2021 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael E. Talent for Plaintiffs State of Montana, State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Iowa, State of Missouri, State of Nebraska, State of New Hampshire, State of North Dakota, State of South Dakota, State of Wyoming. (Talent, Michael)
November 1, 2021 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable David D. Noce. 17 Summons(es) issued and emailed to Attorney Justin D. Smith. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. (JKL)
October 29, 2021 Filing 4 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (Potter, Jacob)
October 29, 2021 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENTAL Summons - U.S. Attorney General by Plaintiffs State of Montana, State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Iowa, State of Missouri, State of Nebraska, State of New Hampshire, State of North Dakota, State of South Dakota, State of Wyoming. (Smith, Justin)
October 29, 2021 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENTAL Summons - U.S. Attorney - Eastern District of Missouri by Plaintiffs State of Montana, State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Iowa, State of Missouri, State of Nebraska, State of New Hampshire, State of North Dakota, State of South Dakota, State of Wyoming. (Smith, Justin)
October 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-8947392, in the amount of $402 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by New Hampshire, State of, State of Nebraska, Missouri, State of Montana, Alaska, State of, State of South Dakota, State of North Dakota, State of Arkansas, Wyoming, State of, Iowa, State of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form, #5 Summons Summons - Joseph R. Biden, Jr., #6 Summons Summons - USA, #7 Summons Summons - U.S. Office of Personnel Management, #8 Summons Summons - Kiran Ahuja, #9 Summons Summons - General Services Administration, #10 Summons Summons - Robin Carnahan, #11 Summons Summons - Office of Management and Budget, #12 Summons Summons - Shalanda Young, #13 Summons Summons - Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, #14 Summons Summons - Jeffrey Zients, #15 Summons Summons - Federal Acquisition Regulatory Council, #16 Summons Summons - Lesley Field, #17 Summons Summons - John Tenaglia, #18 Summons Summons - Jeffrey Koses, #19 Summons Summons - Karla Jackson)(Smith, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Missouri et al v. Biden et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Missouri
Represented By: Justin D. Smith
Represented By: Michael E. Talent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Nebraska
Represented By: Justin D. Smith
Represented By: James A. Campbell
Represented By: Michael E. Talent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Alaska
Represented By: Justin D. Smith
Represented By: Michael E. Talent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Arkansas
Represented By: Justin D. Smith
Represented By: Michael E. Talent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Iowa
Represented By: Justin D. Smith
Represented By: Samuel Paul Langholz
Represented By: Michael E. Talent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Montana
Represented By: Justin D. Smith
Represented By: Michael E. Talent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of New Hampshire
Represented By: Justin D. Smith
Represented By: Michael E. Talent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of North Dakota
Represented By: Justin D. Smith
Represented By: Michael E. Talent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of South Dakota
Represented By: Justin D. Smith
Represented By: Michael E. Talent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Wyoming
Represented By: Justin D. Smith
Represented By: Michael E. Talent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph R. Biden, Jr.
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Represented By: Zach A. Avallone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Represented By: Zach A. Avallone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Office of Personnel Management
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Represented By: Zach A. Avallone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kiran Ahuja
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Represented By: Zach A. Avallone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Services Administration
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Represented By: Zach A. Avallone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Carnahan
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Represented By: Zach A. Avallone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Management and Budget
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Represented By: Zach A. Avallone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shalanda Young
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Represented By: Zach A. Avallone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safer Federal Workforce Task Force
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Represented By: Zach A. Avallone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Zients
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Represented By: Zach A. Avallone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Acquisition Regulatory Council
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Represented By: Zach A. Avallone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lesley A. Field
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Represented By: Zach A. Avallone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John M. Tenaglia
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Represented By: Zach A. Avallone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey A. Koses
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Represented By: Zach A. Avallone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karla S. Jackson
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Represented By: Zach A. Avallone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?