Missouri, State of et al v. Biden et al
Plaintiff: Missouri, State of, Nebraska, State of, Arkansas, State of, Kansas, State of, Iowa, State of, Wyoming, State of, Alaska, State of, South Dakota, State of, North Dakota, State of and New Hampshire, State of
Defendant: Joseph R. Biden, Jr., United States of America, United States Department of Health and Human Services, Xavier Becerra, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, Chiquita Brooks-LaSure, Meena Seshamani and Daniel Tsai
Interested Party: Reliant Care Management Company, L.L.C.
Case Number: 4:2021cv01329
Filed: November 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Shirley Padmore Mensah
Referring Judge: Matthew T Schelp
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Consent Motion to Stay Proceedings, Doc. #39 , is GRANTED. Further proceedings in this Court shall be stayed in this case during the pendency of Defendants' appeal of the preliminary injunction order or until otherwise ordered by the Court. Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 12/22/2021. (TMT)
December 22, 2021 Filing 39 Consent MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Appeal by Defendants Xavier Becerra, Joseph R. Biden, Jr, Chiquita Brooks-LaSure, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, Meena Seshamani, Daniel Tsai, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States of America. (McElvain, Joel)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER (REVISED) of USCA : Before LOKEN, BENTON and KELLY, Circuit Judges Appellants' Emergency Motion for Stay Pending Appeal is denied. Judge Kelly would grant the motion. USCA Appeal #: 21-3725 (KCD)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER of USCA : Appellants' Emergency Motion for Stay Pending Appeal is denied. Judge Kelly would grant the motion. USCA Appeal #: 21-3725 (KCD)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER of USCA as to #29 Notice of Appeal, filed by Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, United States of America, Joseph R. Biden, Jr., Chiquita Brooks-LaSure, United States Department of Health and Human Services, Xavier Becerra, Meena Seshamani, Daniel Tsai USCA Appeal #: 21-3725 - Appellees are directed to provide an expedited response to Appellants' Emergency Motion for Stay Pending Appeal by Wednesday, December 8, 2021. (TMT)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Motion to Stay Pending Appeal, doc. #30 , is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 12/01/2021. (KCD)
November 30, 2021 Filing 34 NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL AND NOA SUPPLEMENT by clerk to USCA regarding #28 Memorandum & Order,,,,. Notice of Appeal filed on 11/30/2021 by Defendants Xavier Becerra, Joseph R. Biden, Jr, Chiquita Brooks-LaSure, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, Meena Seshamani, Daniel Tsai, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States of America. NOTIFICATION TO COUNSEL AND PRO SE PARTY: FILE REQUEST FOR TRANSCRIPT WITH DISTRICT COURT CLERKS OFFICE.(JKL)
November 30, 2021 Filing 33 Briefing Schedule from USCA for #29 Notice of Appeal, filed by Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, United States of America, Joseph R. Biden, Jr., Chiquita Brooks-LaSure, United States Department of Health and Human Services, Xavier Becerra, Meena Seshamani, Daniel Tsai USCA Appeal Number: 21-3725 (See attached document for all other deadlines.)(KCD)
November 30, 2021 Filing 32 Initial Notification from USCA for #29 Notice of Appeal, filed by Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, United States of America, Joseph R. Biden, Jr., Chiquita Brooks-LaSure, United States Department of Health and Human Services, Xavier Becerra, Meena Seshamani, Daniel Tsai USCA Appeal Number: 21-3725. (KCD)
November 30, 2021 Filing 31 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #30 MOTION to Stay re #28 Memorandum & Order,,,, Motion for a Stay Pending Appeal filed by Defendants Xavier Becerra, Joseph R. Biden, Jr, Chiquita Brooks-LaSure, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, Meena Seshamani, Daniel Tsai, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States of America. (McElvain, Joel)
November 30, 2021 Filing 30 MOTION to Stay re #28 Memorandum & Order,,,, Motion for a Stay Pending Appeal by Defendants Xavier Becerra, Joseph R. Biden, Jr, Chiquita Brooks-LaSure, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, Meena Seshamani, Daniel Tsai, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States of America. (McElvain, Joel)
November 30, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #28 Memorandum & Order,,,, by Defendants Xavier Becerra, Joseph R. Biden, Jr, Chiquita Brooks-LaSure, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, Meena Seshamani, Daniel Tsai, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States of America.
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS] For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Doc. #6 , is GRANTED. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants are preliminarily enjoined from the implementation and enforcement of 86 Fed. Reg. 61,555 (Nov. 5, 2021), the Interim Final Rule with Comment Period entitled Medicare and Medicaid Programs; Omnibus COVID-19 Health Care Staff Vaccination, against any and all Medicare- and Medicaid-certified providers and suppliers within the States of Alaska, Arkansas, Iowa, Kansas, Missouri, Nebraska, New Hampshire, North Dakota, South Dakota, and Wyoming pending a trial on the merits of this action or until further order of this Court. Defendants shall immediately cease all implementation or enforcement of the Interim Final Rule with Comment Period as to any Medicare- and Medicaid-certified providers and suppliers within the States of Alaska, Arkansas, Iowa, Kansas, Missouri, Nebraska, New Hampshire, North Dakota, South Dakota, and Wyoming. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that no security bond shall be required under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65(c). Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 11/29/2021. (TMT)
November 23, 2021 Filing 27 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiffs Alaska, State of, Arkansas, State of, Iowa, State of, Kansas, State of, Missouri, State of, Nebraska, State of, New Hampshire, State of, North Dakota, State of, South Dakota, State of, Wyoming, State of. (Osete, Jesus)
November 23, 2021 Filing 26 BRIEF OF RELIANT CARE MANAGEMENT COMPANY, L.L.C. AS AMICUS CURIAE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Interested Party Reliant Care Management Company, L.L.C. (TMT)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion for Leave To File Amicus Curiae Brief, filed by Reliant Care Management Company, Doc. #20 , is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 11/23/2021. (TMT)
November 22, 2021 Filing 24 ENTRY of Appearance by Jonathan D Kossak for Defendants Xavier Becerra, Joseph R. Biden, Jr, Chiquita Brooks-LaSure, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, Meena Seshamani, Daniel Tsai, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States of America. (Kossak, Jonathan)
November 22, 2021 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendants Xavier Becerra, Joseph R. Biden, Jr, Chiquita Brooks-LaSure, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, Meena Seshamani, Daniel Tsai, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States of America. (McElvain, Joel)
November 22, 2021 Filing 22 ENTRY of Appearance by Julie Straus Harris for Defendants Xavier Becerra, Joseph R. Biden, Jr, Chiquita Brooks-LaSure, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, Meena Seshamani, Daniel Tsai, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States of America. (Straus Harris, Julie)
November 21, 2021 Filing 21 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael Drezner for Defendants Xavier Becerra, Joseph R. Biden, Jr, Chiquita Brooks-LaSure, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, Meena Seshamani, Daniel Tsai, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States of America. (Drezner, Michael)
November 21, 2021 Filing 20 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by Interested Party Reliant Care Management Company, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A: Proposed Amicus Curiae Brief)(Kinser, Jason)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion to Expedite Briefing, Doc. #7 , is GRANTED in part. Defendants shall file their response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by 10:00 a.m. CST on Monday, November 22, 2021. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file any reply by 5:00 p.m. CST on Tuesday, November 23, 2021. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit, Doc. #8 , is GRANTED. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that Defendants are given leave to file in excess of page limitation up to fifty-five pages for their response, and Plaintiffs are given leave to file in excess of page limitation up to twenty pages for their reply. (Response to Court due by 11/22/2021.) Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 11/17/2021. (TMT)
November 17, 2021 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY (no pdf attached) for proceedings held before District Judge Matthew T. Schelp: Attorneys Only Scheduling Conference held on 11/17/2021 via Zoom. Scheduling Order to follow. (proceedings started: 12:00 PM) (proceedings ended: 12:15 PM) (Appearance for Plaintiff: Dean John Sauer, Jesus Osete, James Cambell)(Appearance for Defendant: Joel McElvain) (BRP)
November 17, 2021 Filing 17 ENTRY of Appearance by James A. Campbell for Plaintiffs Alaska, State of, Arkansas, State of, Iowa, State of, Kansas, State of, Missouri, State of, Nebraska, State of, New Hampshire, State of, North Dakota, State of, South Dakota, State of, Wyoming, State of. (Campbell, James)
November 17, 2021 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Expedite Briefing and Consideration of Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiffs Alaska, State of, Arkansas, State of, Iowa, State of, Kansas, State of, Missouri, State of, Nebraska, State of, New Hampshire, State of, North Dakota, State of, South Dakota, State of, Wyoming, State of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Osete, Jesus)
November 16, 2021 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Expedite Briefing and Consideration of Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendants Xavier Becerra, Joseph R. Biden, Jr, Chiquita Brooks-LaSure, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, Meena Seshamani, Daniel Tsai, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States of America. (McElvain, Joel)
November 16, 2021 Filing 14 ENTRY of Appearance by Joel L. McElvain for Defendants Xavier Becerra, Joseph R. Biden, Jr, Chiquita Brooks-LaSure, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, Meena Seshamani, Daniel Tsai, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States of America. (McElvain, Joel)
November 16, 2021 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by Dean John Sauer for Plaintiffs Alaska, State of, Arkansas, State of, Iowa, State of, Kansas, State of, Missouri, State of, Nebraska, State of, New Hampshire, State of, North Dakota, State of, South Dakota, State of, Wyoming, State of. (Sauer, Dean)
November 16, 2021 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by Kurtis K. Wiard for Plaintiff Kansas, State of. (Wiard, Kurtis)
November 15, 2021 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Samuel Paul Langholz for Plaintiff Iowa, State of. (Langholz, Samuel)
November 15, 2021 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF PROCESS by Plaintiffs Alaska, State of, Arkansas, State of, Iowa, State of, Kansas, State of, Missouri, State of, Nebraska, State of, New Hampshire, State of, North Dakota, State of, South Dakota, State of, Wyoming, State of. (Osete, Jesus)
November 12, 2021 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiffs Alaska, State of, Arkansas, State of, Iowa, State of, Kansas, State of, Missouri, State of, Nebraska, State of, New Hampshire, State of, North Dakota, State of, South Dakota, State of, Wyoming, State of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y, #26 Exhibit Z, #27 Exhibit AA, #28 Exhibit BB, #29 Exhibit CC, #30 Exhibit DD)(Osete, Jesus)
November 12, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Exceed the Page Limit for their Memorandum in Support of their Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs Alaska, State of, Arkansas, State of, Iowa, State of, Kansas, State of, Missouri, State of, Nebraska, State of, New Hampshire, State of, North Dakota, State of, South Dakota, State of, Wyoming, State of. (Osete, Jesus)
November 12, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Expedite Briefing and Consideration of Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs Alaska, State of, Arkansas, State of, Iowa, State of, Kansas, State of, Missouri, State of, Nebraska, State of, New Hampshire, State of, North Dakota, State of, South Dakota, State of, Wyoming, State of. (Osete, Jesus)
November 12, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs Alaska, State of, Arkansas, State of, Iowa, State of, Kansas, State of, Missouri, State of, Nebraska, State of, New Hampshire, State of, North Dakota, State of, South Dakota, State of, Wyoming, State of. (Osete, Jesus)
November 12, 2021 Filing 5 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Matthew T. Schelp for all further proceedings. (JEB)
November 12, 2021 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Madison McMillian Green for Plaintiff Missouri, State of. (Green, Madison)
November 12, 2021 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF PROCESS by Plaintiff Missouri, State of. (Osete, Jesus)
November 10, 2021 Filing 2 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (Potter, Jacob)
November 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-8970485, in the amount of $402 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Alaska, State of, Nebraska, State of, Missouri, State of, Wyoming, State of, Arkansas, State of, North Dakota, State of, South Dakota, State of, Kansas, State of, New Hampshire, State of, Iowa, State of. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form , #3 Summons - Joseph R. Biden, Jr., #4 Summons - USA, #5 Summons - U.S. Departemnt of Health and Human Services, #6 Summons - Xavier Becerra, #7 Summons - Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, #8 Summons - Chiquita Brooks-LaSure, #9 Summons - Meena Seshamani, #10 Summons - Daniel Tsai)(Osete, Jesus) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/10/2021: #11 Summons AG, #12 Summons AUSA) (BAK).
November 10, 2021 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Shirley P. Mensah. 10 Summons(es) issued and emailed to attorney Jesus Armando Osete. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. (BAK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Missouri, State of et al v. Biden et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Missouri, State of
Represented By: Jesus Armando Osete
Represented By: Dean John Sauer
Represented By: James A. Campbell
Represented By: Madison McMillian Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nebraska, State of
Represented By: Jesus Armando Osete
Represented By: Dean John Sauer
Represented By: James A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arkansas, State of
Represented By: Jesus Armando Osete
Represented By: Dean John Sauer
Represented By: James A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kansas, State of
Represented By: Jesus Armando Osete
Represented By: Kurtis K. Wiard
Represented By: Dean John Sauer
Represented By: James A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iowa, State of
Represented By: Jesus Armando Osete
Represented By: James A. Campbell
Represented By: Samuel Paul Langholz
Represented By: Dean John Sauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wyoming, State of
Represented By: Jesus Armando Osete
Represented By: Dean John Sauer
Represented By: James A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alaska, State of
Represented By: Jesus Armando Osete
Represented By: Dean John Sauer
Represented By: James A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: South Dakota, State of
Represented By: Jesus Armando Osete
Represented By: Dean John Sauer
Represented By: James A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Dakota, State of
Represented By: Jesus Armando Osete
Represented By: Dean John Sauer
Represented By: James A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Hampshire, State of
Represented By: Jesus Armando Osete
Represented By: Dean John Sauer
Represented By: James A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph R. Biden, Jr.
Represented By: Joel L. McElvain
Represented By: Julie Straus Harris
Represented By: Jonathan D Kossak
Represented By: Michael Drezner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Joel L. McElvain
Represented By: Julie Straus Harris
Represented By: Jonathan D Kossak
Represented By: Michael Drezner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Joel L. McElvain
Represented By: Julie Straus Harris
Represented By: Jonathan D Kossak
Represented By: Michael Drezner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Joel L. McElvain
Represented By: Julie Straus Harris
Represented By: Jonathan D Kossak
Represented By: Michael Drezner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services
Represented By: Joel L. McElvain
Represented By: Julie Straus Harris
Represented By: Jonathan D Kossak
Represented By: Michael Drezner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chiquita Brooks-LaSure
Represented By: Joel L. McElvain
Represented By: Julie Straus Harris
Represented By: Jonathan D Kossak
Represented By: Michael Drezner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meena Seshamani
Represented By: Joel L. McElvain
Represented By: Julie Straus Harris
Represented By: Jonathan D Kossak
Represented By: Michael Drezner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Tsai
Represented By: Joel L. McElvain
Represented By: Julie Straus Harris
Represented By: Jonathan D Kossak
Represented By: Michael Drezner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Reliant Care Management Company, L.L.C.
Represented By: Jason W. Kinser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?