Wysinger v. Buckner
Petitioner: Charles T. Wysinger
Respondent: Michele Buckner
Case Number: 4:2021cv01372
Filed: November 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Patricia L Cohen
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2022 Filing 10 SECOND MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Petitioner Charles T. Wysinger. (JAB)
December 14, 2021 Filing 9 FULL CONSENT has been received by Respondent Michele Buckner, Petitioner Charles T. Wysinger. (CBL)
December 14, 2021 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Andrew Clarke for Respondent Michele Buckner. (Clarke, Andrew)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER TRACK 4: 2254 HABEAS CORPUS PETITION. (See Full Order.)IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following provisions apply in this case, and will be modified only upon a showing of exceptional circumstances: This case has been randomly assigned to a United States Magistrate Judge. The parties have twenty-one (21) days from their entry of appearance to file their Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction forms. Respondent must show cause, in writing and within forty-five (45) days of the date of this order, why the relief requested in the instant petition should not be granted. (Show Cause Response due by 1/21/2022.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 12/7/2021. (CBL)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (See Full Order.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that petitioner's motion for appointment of counsel [ECF No. #3 ] is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 12/7/2021. (CBL)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. Petitioner moves for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Upon review of the financial information, the Court has determined that petitioner is unable to pay the filing fee. See 28 U.S.C. 1915. The motion will be granted. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED petitioner's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis [ECF No. #2 ] is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 12/7/2021. (CBL)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 5, 6, 7. Orders sent to party not electronically notified this date. Tue Dec 7 12:00:17 CST 2021 (Long, Carol)
December 6, 2021 Receipt 4644097340 in the amount of $5.00 for WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS on behalf of Wysinger, Charles (CCAM)
November 19, 2021 Filing 4 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (Potter, Jacob)
November 19, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Petitioner Charles T. Wysinger. (JKL)
November 19, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Charles T. Wysinger. (JKL)
November 19, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Petitioner Charles T. Wysinger. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Exhibit MDOC- Investigation, #4 Envelope)(JKL)
November 19, 2021 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (JKL)
November 19, 2021 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Fri Nov 19 15:01:21 CST 2021 (admin,)
November 19, 2021 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Patricia L. Cohen. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. (JKL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wysinger v. Buckner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Charles T. Wysinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michele Buckner
Represented By: Office of Missouri Attorney General - Habeas Division
Represented By: Andrew Clarke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?