Vining v. Geico Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Doris J. Vining
Defendant: Geico Casualty Company
Case Number: 4:2021cv01380
Filed: November 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Matthew T Schelp
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER OF REMAND: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that this action is REMANDED to the Circuit Court of St. Louis City, Missouri. (cc: Order and docket sheet mailed to the Circuit Court of St. Louis City, Missouri). Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 01/06/2022. (KCD)
January 5, 2022 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #15 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to The Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis, State of Missouri filed by Defendant Geico Casualty Company. (Kinder, Jacqueline)
December 22, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to The Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis, State of Missouri by Plaintiff Doris J. Vining. (Wann, Robert)
December 22, 2021 Filing 14 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert Earl Wann, III for Plaintiff Doris J. Vining. (Wann, Robert)
November 24, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Geico Casualty Company Sent To: State Court - Executed (Kinder, Jacqueline)
November 23, 2021 Filing 12 Electronic Notice - Application for Admission needed as to Gene S. Hou. Review of case shows that Attorney Gene S. Hou is not currently a member of our Bar. For instructions on applying for bar admission or moving for pro hac vice admission, please follow the instructions located on our website at #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov under the Attorney tab. Notice only, no.pdf attached. (JKL)
November 23, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Transfer Venue by Defendant Geico Casualty Company. (JKL)
November 23, 2021 Filing 10 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis, filed by Doris J. Vining. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Crash Report)(JKL)
November 23, 2021 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENTAL re #1 Notice of Removal Petition, Original Filing Form by Defendant Geico Casualty Company. (Kinder, Jacqueline)
November 23, 2021 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENTAL re #1 Notice of Removal Petition, Civil Cover Sheet by Defendant Geico Casualty Company. (Kinder, Jacqueline)
November 23, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Geico Casualty Company.(Kinder, Jacqueline)
November 23, 2021 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Joshua Robert Kolb for Defendant Geico Casualty Company. (Kolb, Joshua)
November 23, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Geico Casualty Company Sent To: Plaintiff (Kinder, Jacqueline)
November 23, 2021 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendant Geico Casualty Company. (Kinder, Jacqueline)
November 23, 2021 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Jacqueline M. Kinder for Defendant Geico Casualty Company. (Kinder, Jacqueline)
November 23, 2021 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Geico Casualty Company. Parent companies: GEICO Corporation, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Kinder, Jacqueline)
November 23, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis City, case number 2122-CC09621, with receipt number AMOEDC-8993833, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Geico Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. State Court File, #2 Exhibit B. Plaintiff's 11-11-20 Demand, #3 Exhibit C. Summons Issued 11-01-21 to Geico)(Kinder, Jacqueline)
November 23, 2021 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Matthew T. Schelp. (JKL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vining v. Geico Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doris J. Vining
Represented By: Gene S. Hou
Represented By: Robert Earl Wann, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geico Casualty Company
Represented By: Jacqueline M. Kinder
Represented By: Joshua Robert Kolb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?