American Strategic Insurance Corp. v. Dressel et al
Plaintiff: American Strategic Insurance Corp.
Defendant: Patrick Dressel, Kristina Dressel, Midas O'Fallon Hiex, LLC and Midas Hospitality, LLC
Case Number: 4:2021cv01386
Filed: November 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: John A Ross
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2022 Filing 20 Amended SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by American Strategic Insurance Corp.. Patrick Dressel served on 12/2/2021, answer due 1/24/2022. (Gausnell, Seth) Modified text on 1/21/2022 (JAB).
January 20, 2022 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by Midas O'Fallon Hiex, LLC.(Cowan, Tracy)
January 20, 2022 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by Midas Hospitality, LLC.(Cowan, Tracy)
January 20, 2022 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Patrick Dressel.(Taylor, Charles)
January 5, 2022 Filing 16 Alias Summons Issued as to defendant Kristina Dressel. The summons was emailed to attorney for Plaintiff, Seth Gausnell. (CSG) (Main Document 16 replaced on 1/5/2022 - plaintiff's attorney address corrected) (CSG).
January 4, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff American Strategic Insurance Corp. Process Server: Kristina Dressel (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Gausnell, Seth)
January 4, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE by Plaintiff American Strategic Insurance Corp. Letter to Clerk of Court, request for Alias Summons (Gausnell, Seth)
January 4, 2022 Filing 13 Summons Returned Unexecuted by American Strategic Insurance Corp. as to Kristina Dressel. (Gausnell, Seth)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Patrick Dressel. ORDERED: GRANTED. Patrick Dressel answer now due by 1/24/2022. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 12/28/2021. (CBL)
December 27, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Patrick Dressel. (Taylor, Charles)
December 27, 2021 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Charles E. Taylor for Defendant Patrick Dressel. (Taylor, Charles)
December 27, 2021 Filing 9 Electronic Notice of Noncompliance - Review of this case shows the Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate has not been filed by Defendants Midas Hospitality, LLC, Midas O'Fallon Hiex, LLC. The certificate must be filed with the Court within 5 days # (moed-0001.pdf). Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate due by 1/3/2022. (CBL)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants Midas Hospitality, LLC, Midas O'Fallon Hiex, LLC. ; ORDERED GRANTED. Midas Hospitality, LLC answer due 1/20/2022; Midas O'Fallon Hiex, LLC answer due 1/20/2022. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 12/23/2021. (CLO)
December 22, 2021 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants Midas Hospitality, LLC, Midas O'Fallon Hiex, LLC. (Cowan, Tracy)
December 15, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by American Strategic Insurance Corp.. Midas O'Fallon Hiex, LLC served on 12/2/2021, answer due 12/23/2021. (Gausnell, Seth)
December 15, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by American Strategic Insurance Corp.. Midas Hospitality, LLC served on 12/2/2021, answer due 12/23/2021. (Gausnell, Seth)
November 23, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff American Strategic Insurance Corp. Process Server: Patrick Dressel, Midas O'Fallon and Midas Hospitality (Gausnell, Seth)
November 23, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff American Strategic Insurance Corp. (Gausnell, Seth)
November 23, 2021 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff American Strategic Insurance Corp... (Gausnell, Seth)
November 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against defendant Kristina Dressel, Patrick Dressel, Midas Hospitality, LLC, Midas O'Fallon Hiex, LLC with receipt number AMOEDC-8995153, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by American Strategic Insurance Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Original Filing Form, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons)(Gausnell, Seth)
November 23, 2021 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable John A. Ross. 4 Summons(es) issued and emailed to Attorney Seth G. Gausnell. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). (JKL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Strategic Insurance Corp. v. Dressel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Strategic Insurance Corp.
Represented By: Seth G. Gausnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Dressel
Represented By: Charles E. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristina Dressel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midas O'Fallon Hiex, LLC
Represented By: Tracy J. Cowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midas Hospitality, LLC
Represented By: Tracy J. Cowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?