Copeland v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Michael T. Copeland
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 4:2021cv01445
Filed: December 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Patricia L Cohen
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2021 Filing 6 FULL CONSENT has been received by Plaintiff Michael T. Copeland, Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (JAB)
December 15, 2021 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Shane Kyle Blank for Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Blank, Shane)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - TRACK 4: SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL. (See Full Order.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following provisions apply in this case, and will be modified only upon a showing of exceptional circumstances: This case has been assigned to Track 4 (Administrative). This case has been randomly assigned to a United States Magistrate Judge. The parties have twenty-one (21) days from their entry of appearance to file their Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction forms. Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(a)(3) and (4), and this Court's Administrative Order entered September 10, 2021, within sixty (60) days of service of plaintiff's complaint, defendant must file a motion to dismiss, motion to remand, and/or certified administrative record which will be deemed an answer (general denial) to plaintiff's complaint. The certified administrative transcript is exempt from any redaction requirements and is to be filed in accordance with 42 U.S.C. 405(g). Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 12/14/2021. (CBL)
December 10, 2021 Filing 3 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (Potter, Jacob)
December 10, 2021 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Patricia L. Cohen. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Administrative Transcript Due 2/8/2022 (JKL)
December 9, 2021 Filing 2 SOCIAL SECURITY IDENTIFICATION FORM as to Plaintiff Michael T. Copeland. (Severs, Traci)
December 9, 2021 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT with receipt number AMOEDC-9021688, in the amount of $402 Non-Jury Demand,Yes or No - No,, filed by Michael T. Copeland. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form)(Severs, Traci)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Copeland v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael T. Copeland
Represented By: Traci L. Severs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Shane Kyle Blank
Represented By: USAO SSA Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?