Fendler v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Lynn Fendler
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 4:2021cv01482
Filed: December 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Matthew T Schelp
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2022 Filing 5 CERTIFIED Social Security Transcript Notice of Filing by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi (Attachments: #1 Transcript 1, #2 Transcript 2, #3 Transcript 3, #4 Transcript 4, #5 Transcript 5, #6 Transcript 6, #7 Transcript 7, #8 Transcript 8, #9 Transcript 9, #10 Transcript 10, #11 Transcript 11, #12 Transcript 12, #13 Transcript 13, #14 Transcript 14, #15 Transcript 15, #16 Transcript 16, #17 Transcript 17)(Blank, Shane)
December 20, 2021 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Shane Kyle Blank for Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Blank, Shane)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: four [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS]. Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 12/17/2021. (KCD)
December 17, 2021 Filing 2 SOCIAL SECURITY IDENTIFICATION FORM as to Plaintiff Lynn Fendler. (Van Fossan, Kristen)
December 17, 2021 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT with receipt number AMOEDC-9035683, in the amount of $402 Non-Jury Demand,Yes or No - No,, filed by Lynn Fendler. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form)(Van Fossan, Kristen)
December 17, 2021 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Matthew T. Schelp. Administrative Transcript Due 2/15/2022 (JKL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fendler v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn Fendler
Represented By: Kristen N. Van Fossan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: USAO SSA Division
Represented By: Shane Kyle Blank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?