Zeavision, LLC v. Bausch & Lomb Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Zeavision, LLC
Defendant: Bausch & Lomb Incorporated and PF Consumer Healthcare 1 LLC
Case Number: 4:2021cv01487
Filed: December 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Henry Edward Autrey
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Docket Text ORDER: Re #31 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #27 MOTION to Transfer Case, #21 MOTION to Dismiss Case, #24 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiff Zeavision, LLC.; ORDERED ADDITIONAL TIME IS GRANTED UP TO AND INCLUDING March 28, 2022. (Response to Court due by 3/28/2022). Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 2/17/2022. (HMA)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Docket Text ORDER: Re #30 MOTION for Hearing re #22 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #21 MOTION to Dismiss Case, and Request for Oral Argument filed by Defendant PF Consumer Healthcare 1 LLC.; ORDERED REQUEST FOR ORAL ARGUMENT IS DENIED AS MOOT AT THIS TIME AND SUBJECT TO RECONSIDERATION AFTER FILINGS ON MARCH 28, 2022. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 2/17/2022. (HMA)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss [Doc. #21 ] is set in matter for March 7, 2022, at 2:00 p.m. and will take place by Zoom. Hearing participants will receive a separate email with a link to join the hearing by Zoom. Members of the general public who wish to listen in to the hearing are directed to call the following number to participate by phone: 1-669-254-5252, Meeting ID: 160 994 6867. Pursuant to Local Rule 13.02, all means of photographing, recording, broadcasting, and televising are prohibited in any courtroom, and in areas adjacent to any courtroom, except when authorized by the presiding judge. This includes proceedings ordered by the Court to be conducted by phone or video. (Motion Hearing set for 3/7/2022 02:00 PM in Zoom Video Conference before District Judge Henry Edward Autrey.) Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 2/16/2022. (KXS)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #27 MOTION to Transfer Case , #21 MOTION to Dismiss Case , #24 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Plaintiff Zeavision, LLC. (Tahan, Paul)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MOTION for Hearing re #22 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #21 MOTION to Dismiss Case , and Request for Oral Argument by Defendant PF Consumer Healthcare 1 LLC. (Ball, Dan)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Docket Text ORDER: Re #28 Amended MOTION for Hearing re #25 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #24 MOTION to Dismiss Case and Request for Oral Argument filed by Defendant Bausch & Lomb Incorporated; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 2/16/2022. (HMA)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Amended MOTION for Hearing re #25 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #24 MOTION to Dismiss Case and Request for Oral Argument by Defendant Bausch & Lomb Incorporated. (Ball, Dan)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION to Transfer Case by Defendant Bausch & Lomb Incorporated. (Ball, Dan)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE Defendant Bausch & Lomb Incorporated's Request for Oral Argument: by Defendant Bausch & Lomb Incorporated re #25 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #24 MOTION to Dismiss Case (Ball, Dan)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #24 MOTION to Dismiss Case , or In the Alternative, To Stay or Transfer filed by Defendant Bausch & Lomb Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Declaration)(Ball, Dan)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant Bausch & Lomb Incorporated. (Ball, Dan)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant PF Consumer Healthcare 1 LLC. Parent companies: GlaxoSmithKline Consumer Healthcare Holdings (US) LLC, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: No,. (Ball, Dan)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #21 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant PF Consumer Healthcare 1 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Ball, Dan)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant PF Consumer Healthcare 1 LLC. (Ball, Dan)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Docket Text ORDER: Re #18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice George Gordon filed by Defendant PF Consumer Healthcare 1 LLC.; GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 2/10/2022. (HMA)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Docket Text ORDER: Re #17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Kevin Flannery filed by Defendant PF Consumer Healthcare 1 LLC.; GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 2/10/2022. (HMA)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice George Gordon. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-9118573) by Defendant PF Consumer Healthcare 1 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing From PA Supreme Court)(Gordon, George)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Kevin Flannery. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-9118382) by Defendant PF Consumer Healthcare 1 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Certificate of Good Standing From PA Supreme Court)(Flannery, Kevin)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Docket Text ORDER: Re #15 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed The Page Limit For Its Motion To Dismiss by Defendants Bausch & Lomb Incorporated, PF Consumer Healthcare 1 LLC.; ) LEAVE TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATION IS GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 2/7/22. (EAB)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed The Page Limit For Its Motion To Dismiss by Defendants Bausch & Lomb Incorporated, PF Consumer Healthcare 1 LLC. (Ball, Dan)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENTRY of Appearance by Stefani L. Wittenauer for Defendants Bausch & Lomb Incorporated, PF Consumer Healthcare 1 LLC. (Wittenauer, Stefani)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING. Upon motion by Bausch & Lomb Incorporated and PF Consumer Healthcare 1, LLC (Defendants) to extend their time to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint, it is hereby ORDERED that: 1. The Defendants motion is GRANTED. 2. Defendants shall not be required to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint until February 11, 2022. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 1/10/22. (EAB)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Responsive Pleading by Defendants Bausch & Lomb Incorporated, PF Consumer Healthcare 1 LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bay, Peter) filed by PF Consumer Healthcare 1 LLC, Bausch & Lomb Incorporated ; GRANTED. Bausch & Lomb Incorporated answer due 2/11/2022; PF Consumer Healthcare 1 LLC answer due 2/11/2022. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on January 10, 2022. (MCB)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Dan H. Ball for Defendants Bausch & Lomb Incorporated, PF Consumer Healthcare 1 LLC. (Ball, Dan)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Responsive Pleading by Defendants Bausch & Lomb Incorporated, PF Consumer Healthcare 1 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bay, Peter)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Peter William Bay for Defendants Bausch & Lomb Incorporated, PF Consumer Healthcare 1 LLC. (Bay, Peter)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Zeavision, LLC. Bausch & Lomb Incorporated served on 12/22/2021, answer due 1/12/2022. (Simon, Anthony)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Zeavision, LLC. PF Consumer Healthcare 1 LLC served on 12/22/2021, answer due 1/12/2022. (Simon, Anthony)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Henry E. Autrey. 2 Summons(es) issued and emailed to attorney Anthony G. Simon. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). (BAK)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Paul Tahan for Plaintiff Zeavision, LLC. (Tahan, Paul)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Anthony G. Simon for Plaintiff Zeavision, LLC. (Simon, Anthony)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Zeavision, LLC Process Server: Harmon Legal Process Service (Simon, Anthony)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Zeavision, LLC Process Server: Markell & Associates, Inc. (Simon, Anthony)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Zeavision, LLC.. (Simon, Anthony)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-9038416, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Zeavision, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons - Bausch & Lomb Incorporated, #4 Summons - PF Consumer Healthcare 1)(Simon, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zeavision, LLC v. Bausch & Lomb Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zeavision, LLC
Represented By: Anthony G. Simon
Represented By: Paul Tahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bausch & Lomb Incorporated
Represented By: Dan H. Ball
Represented By: Peter William Bay
Represented By: Stefani L. Wittenauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PF Consumer Healthcare 1 LLC
Represented By: Dan H. Ball
Represented By: George G. Gordon
Represented By: Kevin Mark Flannery
Represented By: Peter William Bay
Represented By: Stefani L. Wittenauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?