Morris v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Eugene Morris
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 4:2022cv00087
Filed: January 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Henry Edward Autrey
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #7 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi; ADDITIONAL TIME IS GRANTED UP TO AND INCLUDING MAY 24, 2022. Kilolo Kijakazi answer due 5/24/2022. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 3/22/2022. (JEB)
March 21, 2022 Filing 7 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (Social Security) by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Llewellyn, Nicholas)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (See Full Order) This case is assigned to Track: 4. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following provisions apply in this case, and will be modified only upon a showing of exceptional circumstances: This case has been assigned to Track 4 (Administrative). Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(a)(3) and (4), and this Courts Administrative Order entered September 10, 2021, within sixty (60) days of service of plaintiffs complaint, defendant must file a motion to dismiss, motion to remand, and/or certified administrative record which will be deemed an answer (general denial) to plaintiffs complaint. The certified administrative transcript is exempt from any redaction requirements and is to be filed in accordance with 42 U.S.C. 405(g). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant is granted leave to file the transcript of the record under seal. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 1/25/2022. (JEB)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [ECF No. #3 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall electronically serve the complaint upon the Social Security Administration pursuant to this Court's Administrative Order In re: Service in Civil Actions Under the Social Security Act issued on September 10, 2021. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 1/25/2022. (JEB)
January 25, 2022 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Nicholas P. Llewellyn for Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Llewellyn, Nicholas)
January 24, 2022 Filing 3 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Eugene Morris. (Van Fossan, Jennifer)
January 24, 2022 Filing 2 SOCIAL SECURITY IDENTIFICATION FORM as to Plaintiff Eugene Morris. (Van Fossan, Jennifer)
January 24, 2022 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT Non-Jury Demand,Yes or No - Yes,, filed by Eugene Morris. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet , #2 Original Filing Form)(Van Fossan, Jennifer)
January 24, 2022 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Henry E. Autrey. Administrative Transcript Due 3/25/2022 (BAK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morris v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Morris
Represented By: Jennifer M. Van Fossan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: USAO SSA Division
Represented By: Nicholas P. Llewellyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?