Gibson v. Hadzic et al
Plaintiff: Shannon Gibson
Defendant: Officer Unknown Hadzic, Officer Unknown Holmes and St. Louis County
Case Number: 4:2022cv00163
Filed: February 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Shirley Padmore Mensah
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (See Full Order) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff shall cause service of process to be effected upon the amended complaint in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on 4/5/2022. (HMA)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 6 . copy sent to non-electronic party on this date. Tue Apr 5 14:46:24 CDT 2022 (Aubuchon, Heather)
March 24, 2022 Receipt 4644099184 in the amount of $402.00 for CIVIL FILING FEE on behalf of Shannon Gibson (CCAM)
February 28, 2022 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendants Unknown Hadzic, Unknown Holmes, St. Louis County filed by Shannon Gibson. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Shannon Gibson.(KXS)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, within thirty (30) days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall either pay the $402 filing fee, or file a motion seeking leave to commence this action without prepaying fees or costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall mail to plaintiff a copy of the Courts form Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Plaintiffs failure to timely comply with this order may result in the dismissal of this case, without prejudice and without further notice. Response to Court due by 3/26/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on 2/24/2022. (Attachments: #1 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs)(HMA)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 4. copy sent to non-electronic party on this date. Thu Feb 24 11:37:29 CST 2022 (Aubuchon, Heather)
February 11, 2022 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENTAL Signature Page for Complaint re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Shannon Gibson. (JWD)
February 10, 2022 Filing 2 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (Potter, Jacob)
February 10, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Unknown Hadzic, Unknown Holmes, St. Louis County, Jury Demand, filed by Shannon Gibson.(JWD)
February 10, 2022 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Shirley P. Mensah. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. (JWD)
February 10, 2022 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Thu Feb 10 18:00:37 CST 2022 (admin,)
February 10, 2022 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (JWD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gibson v. Hadzic et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Unknown Hadzic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Unknown Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Louis County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?