Primerica Life Insurance Company v. Estate of Ronnell Dwight Burns et al
Plaintiff: Primerica Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Estate of Ronnell Dwight Burns, Estate of Keianna Renee Burns, Marianna Reed, Jaicha Martin, Reginald Burns, Raion Burns, Darlene Burns and Antoinette Reed
Case Number: 4:2022cv00260
Filed: March 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: John M Bodenhausen
Referring Judge: Catherine D Perry
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2022 Filing 26 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against defendant Estate of Keianna Renee Burns, COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff Primerica Life Insurance Company by Estate of Ronnell Dwight Burns, Reginald Burns, Darlene Burns, Raion Burns.(Weaver, Thayer)
April 12, 2022 Filing 25 MOTION to Deposit Funds into Court by Plaintiff Primerica Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Howell, Nikki)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Interpleader Complaint,, by Defendants Darlene Burns, Raion Burns, Reginald Burns, Estate of Ronnell Dwight Burns. (Weaver, Thayer) filed by Darlene Burns, Raion Burns, Reginald Burns, Estate of Ronnell Dwight Burns ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 4/12/2022. (NEP)
April 11, 2022 Filing 23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Interpleader Complaint,, by Defendants Darlene Burns, Raion Burns, Reginald Burns, Estate of Ronnell Dwight Burns. (Weaver, Thayer)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CONFERENCE: This case is assigned to Track: 2. Joint Scheduling Plan due by 5/12/2022. Rule 16 Conference set for 5/19/2022 01:00 PM in Telephone Conference in Chambers before District Judge Catherine D. Perry... SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 04/11/2022. (ANP)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion to remand #10 is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion for hearing #15 is denied asmoot. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 04/11/2022. (ANP)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Catherine D. Perry for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen no longer assigned to case. Signed by The Clerk of Court on 04/08/2022. (KRZ)
April 7, 2022 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint by Estate of Keianna Renee Burns, Jaicha Martin, Antoinette Reed, Marianna Reed.(Banks, Eric)
April 7, 2022 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to the Circuit Court for the City of St. Louis, State of Missouri filed by Plaintiff Primerica Life Insurance Company. (Howell, Nikki)
April 7, 2022 Filing 17 ENTRY of Appearance by Eric Kendall Banks for Defendants Estate of Keianna Renee Burns, Jaicha Martin, Antoinette Reed, Marianna Reed. (Banks, Eric)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Docket Text ORDER: This case is before the undersigned pursuant to Local Rule 2.08(A) of the Local Rules of the Eastern District of Missouri. Pending is a motion to remand, which the Court cannot rule on without the full, written consent of the parties. Consequently, no later than April 13, 2022, each party must complete the electronic Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction indicating that they either consent to the jurisdiction of a U.S. Magistrate Judge or opt to have the case assigned to a randomly-selected U.S. District Judge. Instructions for completing the required notice can be found on the Court's website at: http://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/documents/forms/moed-0041.pdf. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen on 4/6/22. (SGP)
April 5, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION for Hearing by Defendants Darlene Burns, Raion Burns, Reginald Burns, Estate of Ronnell Dwight Burns. (Weaver, Thayer)
April 4, 2022 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Primerica Life Insurance Company. Jaicha Martin served on 3/31/2022, answer due 4/21/2022. (Howell, Nikki)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Docket Text ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice H. Sanders Carter, Jr. (Doc. #12 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen on 3/30/22. (SGP)
March 28, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice H. Sanders Carter, Jr. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-9206216) by Plaintiff Primerica Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Carter, H.)
March 28, 2022 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Thayer L. Weaver, Jr for Defendants Darlene Burns, Raion Burns, Reginald Burns, Estate of Ronnell Dwight Burns. (Weaver, Thayer)
March 28, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to the Circuit Court for the City of St. Louis, State of Missouri by Defendants Darlene Burns, Raion Burns, Reginald Burns, Estate of Ronnell Dwight Burns. (Weaver, Thayer)
March 24, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Primerica Life Insurance Company. Reginald Burns served on 3/17/2022, answer due 4/7/2022. (Howell, Nikki)
March 24, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Primerica Life Insurance Company. Antoinette Reed served on 3/17/2022, answer due 4/7/2022. (Howell, Nikki)
March 23, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Primerica Life Insurance Company. Raion Burns served on 3/16/2022, answer due 4/6/2022. (Howell, Nikki)
March 23, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Primerica Life Insurance Company. Darlene Burns served on 3/16/2022, answer due 4/6/2022. (Howell, Nikki)
March 22, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Primerica Life Insurance Company. Estate of Ronnell Dwight Burns served on 3/16/2022, answer due 4/6/2022. (Howell, Nikki)
March 3, 2022 Filing 4 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (Potter, Jacob)
March 3, 2022 ***REMARK: Attorney for Plaintiff advises the court that a summons for defendant, Estate of Keianna Renee Burns, will not be prepared at this time. Summonses issued as to all other defendants. (JKL)
March 3, 2022 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable John M. Bodenhausen. 7 Summons(es) issued and emailed to Attorney Nikki Hininger Howell. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. (JKL)
March 2, 2022 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Primerica Life Insurance Company. Parent companies: Primerica, Inc., Subsidiaries: N/A, Publicly held company: N/A,. (Howell, Nikki) Modified on 3/3/2022 to correct docket text (JKL).
March 2, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Primerica Life Insurance Company Process Server: GoldKrupp Legal Support (Howell, Nikki) Modified on 3/3/2022 to correct docket text(JKL).
March 2, 2022 Filing 1 Interpleader COMPLAINT with receipt number AMOEDC-9159662, in the amount of $402 Non-JuryDemand,, filed by Primerica Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Summons R. Burns Estate, #17 Summons M. Reed, #18 Summons J. Martin, #19 Summons Reginald Burns, #20 Summons Raion Burns, #21 Summons D. Burns, #22 Summons A. Reed, #23 Civil Cover Sheet, #24 Original Filing Form)(Howell, Nikki)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Primerica Life Insurance Company v. Estate of Ronnell Dwight Burns et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Primerica Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Nikki Hininger Howell
Represented By: H. Sanders Carter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Ronnell Dwight Burns
Represented By: Thayer L. Weaver, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Keianna Renee Burns
Represented By: Eric Kendall Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marianna Reed
Represented By: Eric Kendall Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaicha Martin
Represented By: Eric Kendall Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reginald Burns
Represented By: Thayer L. Weaver, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raion Burns
Represented By: Thayer L. Weaver, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darlene Burns
Represented By: Thayer L. Weaver, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antoinette Reed
Represented By: Eric Kendall Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?