Ohio Security Insurance Company v. Auto Owners Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Ohio Security Insurance Company
Defendant: Auto Owners Insurance Company, Michael Ayres, Wheel City Wholesalers, Inc. and Auto Plaza St. Peters, LLC
Case Number: 4:2022cv00268
Filed: March 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Ronnie L White
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #23 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #16 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Plaintiff Ohio Security Insurance Company (Clark, Angela); ORDERED GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file its response to Defendant Auto Owners Insurance Company's Motion to Dismiss no later than May 9, 2022. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on April 27, 2022. (JAU)
April 25, 2022 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #16 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Plaintiff Ohio Security Insurance Company. (Clark, Angela)
April 21, 2022 Filing 22 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Auto Owners Insurance Company. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Bousquet, Patrick)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 RULE 16 ORDER: This case is assigned to Track: Preliminary Track 2 (Standard) [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS] (Joint Scheduling Plan due by 5/5/2022. Rule 16 Conference set for 5/12/2022 02:00 PM in Telephone Conference in Chambers before District Judge Ronnie L. White.) Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 4/20/2022. (TMT)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER CONCERNING JURISDICTION: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that by April 25, 2022, Plaintiff shall file an Amended Complaint that alleges facts establishing the citizenship of all parties to this action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Plaintiff does not timely and fully comply with this Order, this matter will be dismissed without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (Amended/Supplemental Pleadings due by 4/25/2022.) Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 4/18/2022. (TMT)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Docket Text ORDER: Defendant Auto Owners Insurance Company shall review Local Rule 4.01(A), which requires a moving party to file with each motion a separate memorandum in support. In the future, any motion that does not comply with this requirement may be stricken for filing error. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on April 13, 2022. (JAU)
April 12, 2022 Filing 18 Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate to Defendants Auto Owners Insurance Company, Auto Plaza St. Peters, LLC, Wheel City Wholesalers, Inc.. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every non-governmental organizational party must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within ten (10) days of the party's first pleading or entry of appearance. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible # (moed-0001.pdf). (Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate due by 4/22/2022.) (TMT)
April 11, 2022 Filing 17 ENTRY of Appearance by Kathleen Ann McCarthy for Defendant Auto Owners Insurance Company. (McCarthy, Kathleen)
April 11, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant Auto Owners Insurance Company. (Bousquet, Patrick)
March 29, 2022 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Auto Owners Life Insurance Company. (TMT)
March 24, 2022 Filing 14 Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate to Defendants Auto Owners Insurance Company, Auto Plaza St. Peters, LLC, Wheel City Wholesalers, Inc.. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every non-governmental organizational party must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within ten (10) days of the party's first pleading or entry of appearance. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible # (moed-0001.pdf). (Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate due by 4/3/2022.) (TMT)
March 23, 2022 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Ohio Security Insurance Company. Michael Ayres served on 3/20/2022, answer due 4/11/2022. (Clark, Angela)
March 23, 2022 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Ohio Security Insurance Company. Auto Plaza St. Peters, LLC served on 3/21/2022, answer due 4/11/2022. (Clark, Angela)
March 23, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Ohio Security Insurance Company. Auto Owners Insurance Company served on 3/15/2022, answer due 4/5/2022. (Clark, Angela)
March 23, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Ohio Security Insurance Company. Wheel City Wholesalers, Inc. served on 3/15/2022, answer due 4/5/2022. (Clark, Angela)
March 21, 2022 Filing 9 DOCUMENT REMOVED FOR FILING ERROR; DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED - NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Ohio Security Insurance Company Process Server: St. Louis Investigation & Process Service (Clark, Angela) Modified on 3/22/2022 (TMT).
March 21, 2022 Filing 8 DOCUMENT REMOVED FOR FILING ERROR; DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED - NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Ohio Security Insurance Company Process Server: St. Louis Investigation & Process Service (Clark, Angela) Modified on 3/22/2022 (TMT).
March 21, 2022 Filing 7 DOCUMENT REMOVED FOR FILING ERROR; DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED - NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Ohio Security Insurance Company Process Server: St. Louis Investigation & Process Service (Clark, Angela) Modified on 3/22/2022 (TMT).
March 21, 2022 Filing 6 DOCUMENT REMOVED FOR FILING ERROR; DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED - NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Ohio Security Insurance Company Process Server: St. Louis Investigation & Process Service (Clark, Angela) Modified on 3/22/2022 (TMT).
March 7, 2022 Filing 5 Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate to Defendants Auto Owners Insurance Company, Auto Plaza St. Peters, LLC, Wheel City Wholesalers, Inc.. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every non-governmental organizational party must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within ten (10) days of the party's first pleading or entry of appearance. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible # (moed-0001.pdf). (Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate due by 3/17/2022.) (TMT)
March 4, 2022 Receipt 4644098857 in the amount of $402.00 for CIVIL FILING FEE on behalf of Ohio Security Insurance Co (CCAM)
March 4, 2022 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Ohio Security Insurance Company. Parent companies: Ohio Casualty Insurance Company, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Clark, Angela)
March 4, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Ohio Security Insurance Company Process Server: St. Louis Investigation & Process Service (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons Auto Owners, #2 Summons Summons Auto Plaza St. Peters, #3 Summons Summons Ayres, #4 Summons Summons Wheel City Wholesalers, Inc.)(Clark, Angela)
March 4, 2022 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENTAL to #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Ohio Security Insurance Company Civil Cover Sheet (Attachments: #1 Form Original Filing Form)(Clark, Angela) Modified on 3/4/2022 to reflect that documents are supplementals to complaint (JWD).
March 4, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against defendants Auto Owners Insurance Company, Michael Ayres, Wheel City Wholesalers, Inc., Auto Plaza St. Peters, LLC, with receipt number 4644098857, in the amount of $402.00, Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Ohio Security Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ohio Security Policy, #2 Exhibit Auto Owners Policy)(Clark, Angela) Modified on 3/4/2022 to add receipt information to docket sheet (JWD).
March 4, 2022 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Ronnie L. White. 4 Summons(es) issued and emailed to attorney Angela Higgins Clark. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). (JWD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ohio Security Insurance Company v. Auto Owners Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ohio Security Insurance Company
Represented By: Angela Higgins Clark
Represented By: Angela M. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: Patrick A. Bousquet
Represented By: Kathleen Ann McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Ayres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wheel City Wholesalers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto Plaza St. Peters, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?