Volm Companies, Incorporated et al v. Mark' Andy, Inc.
Plaintiff: Volm Companies, Incorporated and Plaspack U.S.A., Inc.
Defendant: Mark' Andy, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2022cv00373
Filed: March 31, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Catherine D Perry
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Mark' Andy, Inc.. (Stoeberl, David) filed by Mark' Andy, Inc. ; ORDERED GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Mark' Andy, Inc. answer due 6/6/2022. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 05/24/2022. (ANP)
May 20, 2022 Filing 15 ENTRY of Appearance by Tyler C Schaeffer for Defendant Mark' Andy, Inc.. (Schaeffer, Tyler)
May 20, 2022 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Mark' Andy, Inc.. (Stoeberl, David)
May 20, 2022 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by David P. Stoeberl for Defendant Mark' Andy, Inc.. (Stoeberl, David)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Mark' Andy, Inc.. (Desai, Spencer) filed by Mark' Andy, Inc. ; ORDERED GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Mark' Andy, Inc. answer due 5/23/2022. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 04/19/2022. (ANP)
April 15, 2022 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Mark' Andy, Inc.. Parent companies: MAI Holdings, Inc., Subsidiaries: 1)MAI Capital Holdings, Inc. (2)Brandtjen and Kluge, LLC 3)MAI UK Holdings Ltd (4)Mark Andy Mexico (5) Mark Andy Canada (6)Mark Andy Poland Sp. (7) Mark Andy, Ltd., Publicly held company: none,. (Desai, Spencer)
April 14, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Mark' Andy, Inc.. (Desai, Spencer)
April 14, 2022 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Spencer P. Desai for Defendant Mark' Andy, Inc.. (Desai, Spencer)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #6 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Lance Duroni AND #7 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Robert L. Gegios; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 4/5/2022. (KEK)
April 4, 2022 Filing 7 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Robert L. Gegios. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-9219947) by Plaintiffs Plaspack U.S.A., Inc., Volm Companies, Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Certificate)(Gegios, Robert)
April 4, 2022 Filing 6 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Lance Duroni. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-9219793) by Plaintiffs Plaspack U.S.A., Inc., Volm Companies, Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Certificate)(Duroni, Lance)
April 4, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Volm Companies, Incorporated, Plaspack U.S.A., Inc.. Mark' Andy, Inc. served on 4/1/2022, answer due 4/22/2022. (Hunt, Jeffrey)
March 31, 2022 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Plaspack U.S.A., Inc.. Parent companies: Volm Companies, Incorporated, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Hunt, Jeffrey)
March 31, 2022 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Volm Companies, Incorporated. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Hunt, Jeffrey)
March 31, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs Plaspack U.S.A., Inc., Volm Companies, Incorporated Process Server: Jack Eisen (Hunt, Jeffrey)
March 31, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Mark' Andy, Inc. with receipt number AMOEDC-9213801, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Volm Companies, Incorporated, Plaspack U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons)(Hunt, Jeffrey)
March 31, 2022 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Catherine D. Perry. 1 Summons(es) issued and emailed to attorney Jeffrey B. Hunt. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). (BAK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Volm Companies, Incorporated et al v. Mark' Andy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Volm Companies, Incorporated
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Hunt
Represented By: Robert L. Gegios
Represented By: Lance Duroni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaspack U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Hunt
Represented By: Robert L. Gegios
Represented By: Lance Duroni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark' Andy, Inc.
Represented By: David P. Stoeberl
Represented By: Spencer P. Desai
Represented By: Tyler C Schaeffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?