Ventrone et al v. Webster University
Plaintiff: Jeanette Ventrone, Angela Williams, Phoenix Pereira, Rameak Smith, April Moore and Ashlee Bacon Cantrell
Defendant: Webster University
Case Number: 4:2022cv00513
Filed: May 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Rodney W Sippel
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER OF REMAND. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion to remand filed by Plaintiffs Jeanette Ventrone, Angela Williams, Phoenix Pereira, Rameak Smith, April Moore, and Ashlee Cantrell #6 is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is REMANDED to the Circuit Court for St. Louis County, Missouri, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all other pending motions are DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall bear their own costs, expenses, and attorneys fees incurred by reason of these removal and remand proceedings. (A copy to the Circuit Court for St. Louis County, Missouri this date.) Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 06/23/2022. (KRZ)
June 16, 2022 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiffs Ashlee Bacon Cantrell, April Moore, Phoenix Pereira, Rameak Smith, Jeanette Ventrone, Angela Williams. (Duree, David)
June 2, 2022 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Webster University. (Kearbey, Travis)
June 2, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant Webster University. (Kearbey, Travis)
May 27, 2022 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #6 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of St. Louis County Plaintiffs' Verified Reply Memorandum in Support of Their Motion to Remand filed by Plaintiffs Ashlee Bacon Cantrell, April Moore, Phoenix Pereira, Rameak Smith, Jeanette Ventrone, Angela Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Duree, David)
May 25, 2022 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of St. Louis County filed by Defendant Webster University. (Kearbey, Travis)
May 17, 2022 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Webster University. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Kearbey, Travis)
May 16, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Webster University Sent To: State Court - Executed (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Kearbey, Travis)
May 11, 2022 Filing 7 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Rodney W. Sippel for all further proceedings. (KXS)
May 11, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of St. Louis County by Plaintiffs Ashlee Bacon Cantrell, April Moore, Phoenix Pereira, Rameak Smith, Jeanette Ventrone, Angela Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Duree, David)
May 11, 2022 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by David M. Duree for Plaintiffs Ashlee Bacon Cantrell, April Moore, Phoenix Pereira, Rameak Smith, Jeanette Ventrone, Angela Williams. (Duree, David)
May 11, 2022 Filing 4 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, St. Louis County Missouri, filed by Ashlee Bacon Cantrell, Jeanette Ventrone, Rameak Smith, Phoenix Pereira, Angela Williams, April Moore.(BAK)
May 11, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Webster University Sent To: Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Removal)(Kearbey, Travis)
May 11, 2022 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENTAL - State Court docket sheet. (BAK)
May 11, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of St. Louis County, Missouri, case number 22SL-CC02473, with receipt number AMOEDC-9284960, in the amount of $402 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Webster University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court File, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kearbey, Travis)
May 11, 2022 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Shirley P. Mensah. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. (BAK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ventrone et al v. Webster University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanette Ventrone
Represented By: David M. Duree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Williams
Represented By: David M. Duree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phoenix Pereira
Represented By: David M. Duree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rameak Smith
Represented By: David M. Duree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April Moore
Represented By: David M. Duree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashlee Bacon Cantrell
Represented By: David M. Duree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Webster University
Represented By: Travis R. Kearbey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?