Brunts v. Hornell Brewing Co., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Nicholas Brunts
Defendant: Hornell Brewing Co., Inc. and Does 1 through 10
Case Number: 4:2022cv00648
Filed: June 17, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Henry Edward Autrey
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Docket Text ORDER: Re #18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #17 MOTION to Dismiss Case (PARTIAL CONSENT MOTION) filed by Plaintiff Nicholas Brunts; ORDERED GRANTED ( Response to Court due by 9/1/2022.) Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 8/12/2022. (HMA)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Docket Text ORDER: Re #11 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal a Memorandum of Law and Declaration of Don Vultaggio filed by Defendant Hornell Brewing Co., Inc.; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 8/12/2022. (HMA)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 RESPONSE to Motion re #18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #17 MOTION to Dismiss Case (PARTIAL CONSENT MOTION) filed by Defendant Hornell Brewing Co., Inc.. (Donovan, Robert)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #17 MOTION to Dismiss Case (PARTIAL CONSENT MOTION) by Plaintiff Nicholas Brunts. (Harvath, Daniel)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss Case and Memorandum in Support by Defendant Hornell Brewing Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Defendant's Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Defendant's Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit A to RJN, #4 Exhibit B to RJN, #5 Exhibit C to RJN, #6 Exhibit D to RJN, #7 Exhibit E to RJN, #8 Exhibit F to RJN, #9 Exhibit G to RJN, #10 Exhibit H to RJN, #11 Exhibit I to RJN, #12 Exhibit J to RJN, #13 Exhibit K to RJN, #14 Exhibit L to RJN, #15 Exhibit M to RJN, #16 Exhibit N to RJN, #17 Exhibit O to RJN, #18 Text of Proposed Order Granting Defendant Hornell's Motion to Dismiss)(Donovan, Robert) Modified on 7/19/2022 (JEB).
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Robert P. Donovan, Esq.; GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 7/13/2022. (JEB)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to MISSOURI STATE COURT filed by Plaintiff Nicholas Brunts. (Harvath, Daniel)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Robert P. Donovan, Esq.. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-9393303) by Defendant Hornell Brewing Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing for Robert P. Donovan, Esq.)(Donovan, Robert)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 REDACTION to #12 Sealed Memorandum in Support of Motion for Leave to File Under Seal, #6 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to MISSOURI STATE COURT by Hornell Brewing Co., Inc. filed by Defendant Hornell Brewing Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Don Vultaggio)(Samuels, Joel)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SEALED MEMORANDUM in Support of #11 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal a Memorandum of Law and Declaration of Don Vultaggio filed by Defendant Hornell Brewing Co., Inc.. Redacted Copy due by 7/11/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Defendant's Brief in Opposition to Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Don Vultaggio)(Samuels, Joel)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal a Memorandum of Law and Declaration of Don Vultaggio by Defendant Hornell Brewing Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Samuels, Joel)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 Petition (Removal/Transfer) filed by Defendant Hornell Brewing Co. Inc.; GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Hornell Brewing Co., Inc. answer due 7/18/2022). Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 6/24/2022. (HMA)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Henry Edward Autrey for all further proceedings (JEB)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 Petition (Removal/Transfer) by Defendant Hornell Brewing Co., Inc.. (Samuels, Joel) (Main Document 8 replaced on 6/23/2022) (JEB).
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Hornell Brewing Co., Inc. Sent To: State Court - Executed (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Removal documents)(Samuels, Joel)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to MISSOURI STATE COURT by Plaintiff Nicholas Brunts. (Harvath, Daniel)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (Potter, Jacob)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis County, filed by Nicholas Brunts.(JDC)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Nannette A. Baker. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. (JDC)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Hornell Brewing Co., Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Samuels, Joel) Modified on 6/22/2022 (JEB).
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Hornell Brewing Co., Inc.. Parent companies: Beverage Marketing USA, Inc.,. (Samuels, Joel) Modified on 6/22/2022 (JEB).
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis County Circuit Court, case number 22SL-CC02131, with receipt number AMOEDC-9355228, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Hornell Brewing Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #2 Exhibit B - Vultaggio Declaration & Exhibits, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Original Filing Form)(Samuels, Joel) Modified on 6/22/2022 (JEB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brunts v. Hornell Brewing Co., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Brunts
Represented By: Daniel F. Harvath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hornell Brewing Co., Inc.
Represented By: Joel R. Samuels
Represented By: Robert Paul Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Represented By: Joel R. Samuels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?