Weaver v. ERDCC
Plaintiff: Edward Weaver
Defendant: ERDCC
Case Number: 4:2022cv00761
Filed: July 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: John A Ross
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(i). Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 8/1/2022. (LNJ)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion to voluntarily dismiss his case (Docket No. #3 ) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(i). A separate order of dismissal will be entered herewith. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 8/1/2022. (LNJ)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 4, 5. Mailed to party not set up for electronic delivery. Mon Aug 1 15:00:09 CDT 2022 (Jones, Lauren)
July 29, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Edward Weaver. (KXS)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall send to plaintiff a copy of the Court's prisoner civil rights complaint form. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall file an amended complaint on the Court form within thirty (30) days of the date of this order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint on the Court form within thirty (30) days of the date of this order, this action will be dismissed without prejudice and without further notice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall send to plaintiff a copy of the Court's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis form. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 7/22/22. (Attachments: #1 moed-0036, #2 moed-0046)(JAB)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 2. Mailed to party not set-up for electronic notification Fri Jul 22 12:23:14 CDT 2022 (Bernsen, John)
July 15, 2022 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable John A. Ross. (JWD)
July 15, 2022 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (JWD)
July 15, 2022 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Fri Jul 15 16:00:43 CDT 2022 (admin,)
July 11, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant ERDCC, Non-Jury Demand,filed by Edward Weaver. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JWD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weaver v. ERDCC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERDCC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?