Yaakub v. Kalibr, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Mary Yaakub
Defendant: Kalibr, LLC, Kalibur I, LP, Kalibr Consulting, LP, KC GP, Inc., Jared E. Ellis and Guardian Life Insurance Co.
Case Number: 4:2022cv00801
Filed: August 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Henry Edward Autrey
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2022 Filing 24 Summons Issued as to defendant KC GP, Inc., Kalibr Consulting, LP, Kalibur I, LP. The summons was emailed to Attorney Michael Cherba. (JEB)
September 14, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Mary Yaakub Process Server: the Missouri Secretary of State's Office (Attachments: #1 Summons for Service upon Kalibr Consulting, LP)(Cherba, Michael)
September 14, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Mary Yaakub Process Server: Missouri Secretary of State's Office (Attachments: #1 Summons for Service upon KC GP, Inc.)(Cherba, Michael)
September 13, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Mary Yaakub Process Server: Michael Barbieri, Curtis Martin and/or Michael Seba (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons for Kalibr I, LP)(Cherba, Michael) (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/14/2022) (JEB).
September 13, 2022 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Mary Yaakub. Jared E. Ellis served on 9/12/2022, answer due 10/3/2022. (Cherba, Michael)
September 13, 2022 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Mary Yaakub. Kalibr, LLC served on 9/12/2022, answer due 10/3/2022. (Cherba, Michael)
September 12, 2022 Filing 18 (FILED IN ERROR -State Court Summons) Summons Returned Unexecuted by Mary Yaakub as to KC GP, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons to KC GP, Inc.)(Cherba, Michael) Modified on 9/13/2022 (JEB).
September 12, 2022 Filing 17 (FILED IN ERROR -State Court Summons) Summons Returned Unexecuted by Mary Yaakub as to Kalibr Consulting, LP. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons to Kalibr Consulting, LP)(Cherba, Michael) Modified on 9/13/2022 (JEB).
September 12, 2022 Filing 16 (FILED IN ERROR -State Court Summons) Summons Returned Unexecuted by Mary Yaakub as to Kalibur I, LP. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons to Kalibr I, LP)(Cherba, Michael) Modified on 9/13/2022 (JEB).
September 12, 2022 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to defendant Jared E. Ellis and Kalibr, LLC. The summons were emailed to Attorney Michael Cherba for service. (JEB)
September 12, 2022 Filing 14 SUPPLEMENTAL re #12 Notice of Process Server Service of Summons on Kalibr, LLC by Plaintiff Mary Yaakub. (Cherba, Michael) (Main Document 14 replaced on 9/12/2022) (JEB).
September 12, 2022 Filing 13 SUPPLEMENTAL re #12 Notice of Process Server Service of Summons on Jared Ellis by Plaintiff Mary Yaakub. (Cherba, Michael) (Main Document 13 replaced on 9/12/2022) (JEB).
September 9, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Mary Yaakub Process Server: Michael Barbieri, Curtis Martin, or Michael Seba (Cherba, Michael)
August 8, 2022 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Guardian Life Insurance Co.. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Tharpe, Bradley)
August 8, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Guardian Life Insurance Co..(Tharpe, Bradley)
August 8, 2022 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Jared E. Ellis, Guardian Life Insurance Co., KC GP, Inc., Kalibr Consulting, LP, Kalibr, LLC, Kalibur I, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Disclosure of Organizational Interest)(Tharpe, Bradley) (Documents filed incorrectly; documents deleted and will be refiled by counsel) Modified on 8/8/2022 (KXS).
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Docket Text ORDER: Re #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Ann-Martha Andrews filed by Defendant Guardian Life Insurance Co.; GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 8/3/2022. (HMA)
August 2, 2022 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael Ryan Cherba for Plaintiff Mary Yaakub. (Cherba, Michael)
August 2, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Ann-Martha Andrews. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-9430787) by Defendant Guardian Life Insurance Co.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Certificate of Good Standing)(Andrews, Ann-Martha)
August 2, 2022 Filing 5 Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every non-governmental organizational party must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within ten (10) days of the party's first pleading or entry of appearance. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible # (moed-0001.pdf). Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate due by 8/11/2022. (HMA)
August 1, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE to Parties of Notice of Removal: by Defendant Guardian Life Insurance Co. (Tharpe, Bradley)
August 1, 2022 Filing 3 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis County, filed by Mary Yaakub.(JDC)
August 1, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE by Defendant Guardian Life Insurance Co. of Entry of Appearance of Bradley W. Tharpe (Tharpe, Bradley)
August 1, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of St. Louis County, case number 22SL-CC03176, with receipt number AMOEDC-9427595, in the amount of $402 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Guardian Life Insurance Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court Petition, #2 Exhibit B-State Court File, #3 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Tharpe, Bradley)
August 1, 2022 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Henry Edward Autrey. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). (JDC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yaakub v. Kalibr, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Yaakub
Represented By: Randall D. Grady
Represented By: Michael Ryan Cherba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kalibr, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kalibur I, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kalibr Consulting, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KC GP, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jared E. Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guardian Life Insurance Co.
Represented By: Bradley W. Tharpe
Represented By: Ann-Martha Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?