Byrd et al v. U.S. Silica Company
Plaintiff: Sabrina Byrd, Estate of Leonard Wayne Byrd, Estate of Rebecca Joyce Byrd, Dennis Wayne Byrd, Michelle R. Byrd, Lisa Michelle Forrester, Leonard Lee Byrd and Ronda Pezzulich
Defendant: U.S. Silica Company
Case Number: 4:2022cv00875
Filed: August 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Shirley Padmore Mensah
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Wrongful Death
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2022 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants , filed by Lisa Michelle Forrester, Estate of Rebecca Joyce Byrd, Leonard Lee Byrd, Estate of Leonard Wayne Byrd, Ronda Pezzulich, Dennis Wayne Byrd, Sabrina Byrd, Michelle R. Byrd.(Murphy, Amanda)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution. (See Full Order) This case is referred to: Mediation Designation of Lead Counsel: Amanda M. Murphy. Designation of Neutral/Conference Report due by 4/15/2024. ADR Completion Deadline due by 5/27/2024. ADR Compliance Report Deadline due by 6/10/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on 10/4/2022. (JEB)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (See Full Order) This case is assigned to Track: 2 Motion to Join Parties due by 12/9/2022. Status Conference set for 3/1/2024 10:00 AM in Courtroom 13S - St. Louis before Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah. Discovery Completion due by 3/15/2024. Non-Dispositive Motions due by 3/25/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 3/25/2024. This action must be ready for trial by no later than August 22, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on 10/4/2022. (JEB)
October 4, 2022 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah:Rule 16 Conference held on 10/4/2022. Conference held by zoom. The Court and counsel discussed jurisdictional issues and deadlines in the case. Case Management Order and Alternative Dispute Resolution referral order to follow. (proceedings started: 11:04 am) (proceedings ended: 11:46 am) (JEB)
September 30, 2022 Filing 13 FULL CONSENT has been received. (JEB)
September 28, 2022 Filing 12 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiffs Dennis Wayne Byrd, Leonard Lee Byrd, Michelle R. Byrd, Sabrina Byrd, Estate of Leonard Wayne Byrd, Estate of Rebecca Joyce Byrd, Lisa Michelle Forrester, Ronda Pezzulich. . (Murphy, Amanda)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Rule 16 Conference set for October 5, 2022, is re-set for October 4, 2022, at 11:00 AM in Zoom Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah. Hearing participants will receive a separate email with a link to join the hearing by Zoom. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on 9/21/2022. (GGB)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CONFERENCE (See Full Order) This case is assigned to Track: 2 Standard. (Joint Scheduling Plan due by 9/28/2022., Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 9/28/2022, Rule 16 Conference set for 10/5/2022 11:00 AM in Zoom Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah) Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on 9/2/2022. (JEB)
August 29, 2022 Filing 9 U.S. Silica Company's ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. Silica Company.(Butterfield, Michael)
August 23, 2022 Filing 8 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (Potter, Jacob)
August 23, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant U.S. Silica Company Sent To: State Court - Executed (Butterfield, Michael)
August 23, 2022 Filing 6 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of Jefferson County, filed by Lisa Michelle Forrester, Estate of Rebecca Joyce Byrd, Leonard Lee Byrd, Estate of Leonard Wayne Byrd, Ronda Pezzulich, Dennis Wayne Byrd, Sabrina Byrd, Michelle R. Byrd.(JBH)
August 23, 2022 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Shirley P. Mensah. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. (JBH)
August 22, 2022 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Jeffrey J. Brinker for Defendant U.S. Silica Company. (Brinker, Jeffrey)
August 22, 2022 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael S. Butterfield for Defendant U.S. Silica Company. (Butterfield, Michael)
August 22, 2022 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendants U.S. Silica Company, USS Holdings Company, hourglass holdings llc, Hourglass Acquisition I, LLC, U.S. Silica Holdings, Inc... (Butterfield, Michael)
August 22, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant U.S. Silica Company Sent To: Plaintiff (Butterfield, Michael)
August 22, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 22JE-CC00570, with receipt number AMOEDC-9465651, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by U.S. Silica Company. (Attachments: #1 Original Filing Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Ex. A - State Court File, #4 Ex. B - Leonard Lee Byrd's Petition for Dissolution of Marriage)(Butterfield, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Byrd et al v. U.S. Silica Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabrina Byrd
Represented By: Amanda M. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Leonard Wayne Byrd
Represented By: Amanda M. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Rebecca Joyce Byrd
Represented By: Amanda M. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Wayne Byrd
Represented By: Amanda M. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle R. Byrd
Represented By: Amanda M. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Michelle Forrester
Represented By: Amanda M. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard Lee Byrd
Represented By: Amanda M. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronda Pezzulich
Represented By: Amanda M. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Silica Company
Represented By: Michael S. Butterfield
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Brinker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?