Bausch & Lomb Incorporated et al v. ZeaVision LLC
Plaintiff: Bausch & Lomb Incorporated and PF Consumer Healthcare 1 LLC
Defendant: ZeaVision LLC
Case Number: 4:2022cv00914
Filed: September 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
Presiding Judge: John M Bodenhausen
Referring Judge: Audrey G Fleissig
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 73 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re: Confidential Information. SO ORDERED. (See Full Order.) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 3/7/2023. (CBL)
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER. For good cause shown, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties' Joint Motion for Entry of the Parties' Stipulated Protective Order is GRANTED in part. (Doc. No. #71 ). Paragraph 8 of the proposed Stipulated Protective Order (Doc. No. #71 -1, at 8) is AMENDED to comply with the Court's local rules. Paragraph 20(d) of the proposed Stipulated Protective Order (Doc. No. #71 -1, at 16) is likewise AMENDED. (See Amendments made in Order.) Except as amended herein the proposed Stipulated Protective Order (Doc No. #71 -1) is SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 3/7/2023. (CBL)
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 71 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Plaintiffs Bausch & Lomb Incorporated, PF Consumer Healthcare 1 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Ball, Dan)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 70 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #69 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File ;Extension to file the following: Protective Order ;Proposed extension date March 2, 2023 by Plaintiff Bausch & Lomb Incorporated. (Ball, Dan) (Main Document 69 replaced on 2/23/2023) (JMP). filed by Bausch & Lomb Incorporated ; ORDERED GRANTED ( Response to Court due by 3/2/2023.). Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 2/24/23. (KJS)
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 69 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File ;Extension to file the following: Protective Order ;Proposed extension date March 2, 2023 by Plaintiff Bausch & Lomb Incorporated. (Ball, Dan) (Main Document 69 replaced on 2/23/2023) (JMP).
January 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #67 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Monica Chou. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-9752463) by Plaintiff Bausch & Lomb Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing Certificate of Good Standing)(Chou, Monica) filed by Bausch & Lomb Incorporated ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 1/31/2023. (JMP)
January 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Monica Chou. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-9752463) by Plaintiff Bausch & Lomb Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Certificate of Good Standing)(Chou, Monica)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #64 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Steven C Kline. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-9734027) by Plaintiff Bausch & Lomb Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing Certificate of Good Standing)(Kline, Steven) filed by Bausch & Lomb Incorporated ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 1/20/2023. (JMP)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 65 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 3: COMPLEX - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following schedule shall apply in this case, and will be modified only upon a showing of exceptional circumstances: (See order for full details.) (Motion to Join Parties due by 6/30/2023. ADR Future Reference 5/18/2023.) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 1/20/23. (KJS)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Steven C Kline. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-9734027) by Plaintiff Bausch & Lomb Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Certificate of Good Standing)(Kline, Steven)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Docket Text ORDER: With consent of all parties, the Rule 16 Conference is rescheduled for today at 1:45 p.m. via Zoom. This is a time change only. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on January 19, 2023. (SAA)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 62 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiffs Bausch & Lomb Incorporated, PF Consumer Healthcare 1 LLC. and Joint Rule 26(f) Report. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Scheduling Plan)(Ball, Dan)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 61 REPLY to Response to Motion re #50 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant ZeaVision LLC. (Simon, Anthony)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 60 RULE 16 ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 2: STANDARD Joint Scheduling Plan due by 1/12/2023. Rule 16 Conference set for 1/19/2023 02:00 PM in Zoom Video Conference before District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig.. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 11/29/22. (KJS)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #58 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #50 MOTION to Dismiss Case , #56 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Defendant ZeaVision LLC; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 11/21/2022. (AFO)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #50 MOTION to Dismiss Case , #56 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Defendant ZeaVision LLC. (Tahan, Paul)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 57 NOTICE Plaintiff's Request for Oral Argument: by Plaintiffs Bausch & Lomb Incorporated, PF Consumer Healthcare 1 LLC re #50 MOTION to Dismiss Case , #56 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Ball, Dan)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 RESPONSE in Opposition re #50 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiffs Bausch & Lomb Incorporated, PF Consumer Healthcare 1 LLC. (Ball, Dan) (Main Document 56 replaced on 11/15/2022 per attorney to fix the table of contents) (KJS).
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Docket Text ORDER Re: #54 Consent MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation for Response to Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiffs Bausch & Lomb Incorporated, PF Consumer Healthcare 1 LLC; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 11/10/2022. (AFO)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Consent MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation for Response to Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiffs Bausch & Lomb Incorporated, PF Consumer Healthcare 1 LLC. (Ball, Dan)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #52 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiffs Bausch & Lomb Incorporated, PF Consumer Healthcare 1 LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Ball, Dan) filed by PF Consumer Healthcare 1 LLC, Bausch & Lomb Incorporated ; ORDERED GRANTED ( Response to Court due by 11/14/2022.). Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 10/26/22. (KJS)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiffs Bausch & Lomb Incorporated, PF Consumer Healthcare 1 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Ball, Dan)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #50 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant ZeaVision LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Remarks Made in Amendment '297 Patent, #2 Exhibit B. Remarks Made in Amendment '522 Patent)(Simon, Anthony)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant ZeaVision LLC. (Simon, Anthony)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 REASSIGNMENT ORDER (GJL). Due to clerk's error, the above captioned case was mistakenly assigned to the Honorable Henry E. Autrey. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that this case is randomly reassigned to the Honorable Audrey G. Fleissig. (KXS)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen termed. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above styled cause is randomly reassigned from Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen to District Judge Henry Edward Autrey. (KEK)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice from Clerk instructing Plaintiffs Bausch & Lomb Incorporated, PF Consumer Healthcare 1 LLC to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction.Click #here for the instructions. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 10/14/2022. (ANP)
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Docket Text ORDER: This matter is before the Court on Motion to Withdraw for Mary E. Shepard. [ECF No. 44] New counsel has been retained. The motion is GRANTED. So Ordered. John M. Bodenhausen, United States Magistrate Judge. September 26, 2022. (CEC)
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Docket Text ORDER: This matter is before the Court on Motion to Withdraw for Michael R. Wolford. [ECF No. 43] New counsel has been retained. The motion is GRANTED. So Ordered. John M. Bodenhausen, United States Magistrate Judge. September 26, 2022. (CEC)
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Docket Text ORDER: This matter is before the Court on Motion to Withdraw for Laura A. Myers. [ECF No. 42] New counsel has been retained. The motion is GRANTED. So Ordered. John M. Bodenhausen, United States Magistrate Judge. September 26, 2022. (CEC)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MOTION to Withdraw for Mary E. Shepard by Plaintiffs Bausch & Lomb Incorporated, PF Consumer Healthcare 1 LLC. (Wittenauer, Stefani)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MOTION to Withdraw for Michael R. Wolford by Plaintiffs Bausch & Lomb Incorporated, PF Consumer Healthcare 1 LLC. (Wittenauer, Stefani)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MOTION to Withdraw for Laura A. Myers by Plaintiffs Bausch & Lomb Incorporated, PF Consumer Healthcare 1 LLC. (Wittenauer, Stefani)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ENTRY of Appearance by Peter William Bay for Plaintiffs Bausch & Lomb Incorporated, PF Consumer Healthcare 1 LLC. (Bay, Peter)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ENTRY of Appearance by Stefani L. Wittenauer for Plaintiffs Bausch & Lomb Incorporated, PF Consumer Healthcare 1 LLC. (Wittenauer, Stefani)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ENTRY of Appearance by Dan H. Ball for Plaintiffs Bausch & Lomb Incorporated, PF Consumer Healthcare 1 LLC. (Ball, Dan)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Doc. #37 ) is GRANTED. Zeevision, LLC Answer due by 10/17/22. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen on 9/22/22. (SGP)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #20 Amended Complaint, or Respond by Defendant ZeaVision LLC. (Tahan, Paul)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendants ZeaVision LLC, ZeaVision Holdings.. (Simon, Anthony)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (Potter, Jacob)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ENTRY of Appearance by Paul Tahan for Defendant ZeaVision LLC. (Tahan, Paul)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ENTRY of Appearance by Anthony G. Simon for Defendant ZeaVision LLC. (Simon, Anthony)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 REPORT to Commissioner of filing or determination of an action regarding patent. (JDC)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Case transferred in from District of New York Western; Case Number 6:20-cv-06452. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case transferred in electronically.
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable John M. Bodenhausen. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Per Local Rule 12.01, attorneys who are not admitted to the Eastern District of Missouri do not need to apply for admission pro hac vice in order to practice on a case if they had already filed an entry of appearance before the case was transferred from another United States District Court. For more information, visit #attorney applications. (JDC)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 DECISION AND ORDER: Defendant's #21 Motion to Dismiss or Transfer Venue is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case and transfer the case to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 8/31/2022. (MDS)Clerk to Follow up
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Letter filed by ZeaVision LLC as to ZeaVision LLC in response to B&L 8-8-22 letter. (McGuirk, Richard)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Letter filed by Bausch & Lomb Incorporated, PF Consumer Healthcare 1 LLC as to ZeaVision LLC with updated information for the Court. (Myers, Laura)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. for all further proceedings. Hon. Charles J. Siragusa no longer assigned to case. Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 7/6/22. (KAP)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 REPLY/RESPONSE to re #21 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint or Transfer filed by ZeaVision LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard A. McGuirk in Further Support of Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint or Transfer)(McGuirk, Richard)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bausch & Lomb Incorporated, PF Consumer Healthcare 1 LLC re #21 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint or Transfer (Wolford, Michael)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #21 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint or Transfer filed by Bausch & Lomb Incorporated, PF Consumer Healthcare 1 LLC. (Wolford, Michael)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 DECLARATION re #21 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint or Transfer filed by Bausch & Lomb Incorporated, PF Consumer Healthcare 1 LLC filed by Bausch & Lomb Incorporated, PF Consumer Healthcare 1 LLC. (Wolford, Michael)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION SCHEDULING ORDER (Please Note: This docket text may not contain the entire contents of the attached Order. It is your responsibility to read the attached Order and download it for future reference. Direct any questions to the Chambers of the Judge who entered this Order.)Defendant having filed a motion (ECF No. 21) to dismiss the Amended Complaint in this action, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file and serve any responsive papers on or before April 20, 2021. Defendant may file and serve any reply on or before May 11, 2021. The Court will not hear oral argument, but instead, will issue a written decision at its earliest opportunity. Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 02/23/2021. (MJK)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint or Transfer by ZeaVision LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Emily Frank in Support of Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint or Transfer, #2 Declaration of Richard A. McGuirk in Support of Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint or Transfer, #3 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint or Transfer)(McGuirk, Richard)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Bausch & Lomb Incorporated, PF Consumer Healthcare 1 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Wolford, Michael)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION SCHEDULING ORDER re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by ZeaVision LLC, ( Responses due by 2/26/2021., Replies due by 3/19/2021.). Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 1/28/21. (KAP)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary C. Osinski on behalf of ZeaVision LLC (Osinski, Zachary)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint - CORRECTION OF DOCKET #16 Corrected Memo of Law to correct formatting error in table of contents byZeaVision LLC. (McGuirk, Richard) (Main Document 17 replaced on 1/20/2021) (KAP).
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order E-Filing Notification: Incorrect memorandum originally attached by filing attorney. Correct memorandum is now attached. #17 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint - CORRECTION OF DOCKET #16 Corrected Memo of Law to correct formatting error in table of contents byZeaVision LLC. (McGuirk, Richard) (Main Document 17 replaced on 1/20/2021) (KAP). (KAP)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by ZeaVision LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Richard McGuirk in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Affidavit of Emily Clark in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #3 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(McGuirk, Richard)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Extending Time to Respond to Complaint by ZeaVision LLC. (McGuirk, Richard)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Complaint by ZeaVision LLC. (McGuirk, Richard)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Extending Time to Answer by ZeaVision LLC. (McGuirk, Richard)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura A. Myers on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Myers, Laura)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Extending Time to Answer by ZeaVision LLC. (McGuirk, Richard)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven(7) days of this notice. (MD)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on ZeaVision LLC on 09/10/2020, filed by Bausch & Lomb Incorporated, PF Consumer Healthcare 1 LLC. (Wolford, Michael)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER, Answer due date updated as to ZeaVision LLC answer due 11/2/2020. Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 9/24/20. (KAP)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Complaint by ZeaVision LLC. (McGuirk, Richard)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard A. McGuirk on behalf of ZeaVision LLC (McGuirk, Richard)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Report on the Filing or Determination of Patent or Trademark Case sent to USPTO. (Attachments: #1 complaint)(CGJ)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to ZeaVision LLC. (CGJ)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Case assigned to Hon. Charles J. Siragusa. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (CGJ)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(CGJ)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (CGJ)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Wolford on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Wolford, Michael)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PF Consumer Healthcare 1 LLC. (Shepard, Mary)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bausch & Lomb Incorporated. (Shepard, Mary)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants $ 400 receipt number 0209-3886091, filed by Bausch & Lomb Incorporated, PF Consumer Healthcare 1 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons)(Shepard, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bausch & Lomb Incorporated et al v. ZeaVision LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bausch & Lomb Incorporated
Represented By: Mary E. Shepard
Represented By: Laura A. Myers
Represented By: Michael R. Wolford
Represented By: Dan H. Ball
Represented By: Peter William Bay
Represented By: Stefani L. Wittenauer
Represented By: Steven C. Kline
Represented By: Monica Chou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PF Consumer Healthcare 1 LLC
Represented By: Mary E. Shepard
Represented By: Laura A. Myers
Represented By: Michael R. Wolford
Represented By: Dan H. Ball
Represented By: Peter William Bay
Represented By: Stefani L. Wittenauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZeaVision LLC
Represented By: Anthony G. Simon
Represented By: Richard A. McGuirk
Represented By: Zachary C. Osinski
Represented By: Paul Tahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?