Adams v. PSP Group, LLC
Plaintiff: Jill Adams
Defendant: PSP Group, LLC doing business as Pet Supplies Plus
Case Number: 4:2022cv01210
Filed: November 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Ronnie L White
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2023 Filing 52 Briefing Schedule from USCA for #49 Notice of Appeal filed by Jill Adams USCA Appeal Number: 23-3303 (See attached document for all deadlines.)(KCD)
October 17, 2023 Filing 51 Initial Notification from USCA for #49 Notice of Appeal filed by Jill Adams USCA Appeal Number: 23-3303. (KCD)
October 16, 2023 Filing 50 NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL AND NOA SUPPLEMENT by clerk to USCA regarding #48 Order of Dismissal (case - Stipulation of Dismissal), #47 Memorandum & Order,,,. Notice of Appeal filed on 10/12/2023 by Plaintiff Jill Adams. NOTIFICATION TO COUNSEL AND PRO SE PARTY: FILE REQUEST FOR TRANSCRIPT WITH DISTRICT COURT CLERKS OFFICE.(JBH)
October 12, 2023 Filing 49 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #48 Order of Dismissal (case - Stipulation of Dismissal), #47 Memorandum & Order,,, by Plaintiff Jill Adams. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number AMOEDC-10211938.
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that all claims against Defendant PSP Group, LLC, d/b/a Pet Supplies Plus, are DISMISSED without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 9/13/2023. (TMT)
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Transfer this case to the United States District Court, Western District of Washington is DENIED. [ECF No. #34 ] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's Motions for Leave to File Supplemental Authority in Support of its Motion to Dismiss are DENIED. [ECF Nos. #44 & #45 ] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part without prejudice. [ECF No. #30 ]. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for lack of subject matter jurisdiction is GRANTED, in that Plaintiff does not have standing to bring her claims in federal court. In all other respects, Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is DENIED without prejudice, as the Court lacks subject matter jurisdiction. The Court will issue a separate Order of Dismissal. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 9/13/2023. (TMT)
August 4, 2023 Filing 46 RESPONSE in Opposition re #45 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Jill Adams. (Yiatras, Tiffany)
July 31, 2023 Filing 45 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Defendant PSP Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Memorandum and Order; Alves v. Goodyear Tire and Ruber Co., Case No. 22-cv-11820-WGY (D. Mass))(Vaysman, Karen)
July 21, 2023 Filing 44 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Defendant PSP Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Vaysman, Karen)
March 30, 2023 Filing 43 REPLY to Response to Motion re #30 MOTION to Dismiss Case (Amended Complaint) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant PSP Group, LLC. (Vaysman, Karen)
March 27, 2023 Filing 42 REPLY to Response to Motion re #34 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) and First-Filed Rule filed by Defendant PSP Group, LLC. (Vaysman, Karen)
March 15, 2023 Filing 41 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #34 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) and First-Filed Rule filed by Plaintiff Jill Adams. (Yiatras, Tiffany)
March 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Docket Text ORDER Re: ECF No. #39 , Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, filed Defendant PSP Group, LLC; ORDERED GRANTED. Defendant shall have up to and including March 30, 2023, to file its reply memorandum. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on March 15, 2023. (LTR)
March 14, 2023 Filing 39 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #30 MOTION to Dismiss Case (Amended Complaint) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant PSP Group, LLC. (Vaysman, Karen)
March 14, 2023 Filing 38 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #30 MOTION to Dismiss Case (Amended Complaint) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Plaintiff Jill Adams. (TMT)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Docket Text ORDER Re: ECF No. #36 , Consent MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum in Excess of Page Limitation, filed by Plaintiff Jill Adams, ORDERED GRANTED. The Clerk of Court shall detach and docket Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, which was submitted as an attachment to the Motion for Leave. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on March 13, 2023. (LTR)
March 10, 2023 Filing 36 Consent MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Plaintiff Jill Adams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant PSP Group, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint)(Yiatras, Tiffany)
March 1, 2023 Filing 35 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #34 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) and First-Filed Rule filed by Defendant PSP Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Popa Transfer Order)(Vaysman, Karen)
March 1, 2023 Filing 34 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) and First-Filed Rule by Defendant PSP Group, LLC. (Vaysman, Karen)
February 28, 2023 Filing 33 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #30 MOTION to Dismiss Case (Amended Complaint) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant PSP Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - PSP Privacy Policy, #2 Exhibit 2 - PSP Terms of Use, #3 Exhibit 3 - PSP Terms and Privacy Header, #4 Exhibit 4 - PSP Store Locator)(Vaysman, Karen)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Docket Text Order Re: ECF No. #31 , Consent Motion for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation, filed by Defendant PSP Group, LLC; ORDERED GRANTED. The Court, however, will not direct the Clerk of Court to detach and docket Defendant's proposed Memorandum in Support of its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, which was attached to Defendant's Motion for Leave. The proposed memorandum contains a table of contents and table of authorities, which are neither required by the Local Rules nor the Judge's requirements. It is the Court's preference that legal memoranda are filed without tables of contents or tables of authorities. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant shall promptly file its 30-page Memorandum in Support of its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint without a table of contents or table of authorities. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant shall provide the Court with a paper courtesy copy of its motion to dismiss and memorandum in support, printed on one side only, as required by the Judge's Requirements. See https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/judge/ronnie-l-white. Delivery may be made by regular mail or by hand delivery. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on February 27, 2023. (LTR)
February 24, 2023 Filing 31 Consent MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Defendant PSP Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Defendant's Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1 to Memo - PSP Privacy Policy, #3 Exhibit 2 to Memo - PSP Terms of Use, #4 Exhibit 3 to Memo - PSP Terms and Privacy Header, #5 Exhibit 4 to Memo - PSP Store Locator)(Vaysman, Karen)
February 24, 2023 Filing 30 MOTION to Dismiss Case (Amended Complaint), MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant PSP Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Vaysman, Karen)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Docket Text ORDER re: ECF No. #19 , MOTION to Dismiss Case, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, and ECF No. #21 , MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) and First-Filed Rule, filed by Defendant PSP Group, LLC; ORDERED DENIED as moot, as Plaintiff filed an Amended Complaint as a matter of course under Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1)(B). Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on February 17, 2023. (SMH)
February 17, 2023 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #21 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) and First-Filed Rule filed by Plaintiff Jill Adams. (Yiatras, Tiffany)
February 10, 2023 Filing 27 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant PSP Group, LLC Amendment to #1 Complaint, Previous Summons(es) issued, Waivers issued No, Consents issued No, JURY demand, , filed by Jill Adams. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Jill Adams.(Yiatras, Tiffany)
January 26, 2023 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #19 MOTION to Dismiss Case MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant PSP Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - PSP Privacy Policy, #2 Exhibit 2 - PSP Terms of Use, #3 Exhibit 3 - PSP Terms and Privacy Header)(KCD)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Docket Text ORDER Re: ECF No. #23 , Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Transfer, filed by Plaintiff Jill Adams, ORDERED GRANTED. Plaintiff shall have up to and including February 17, 2023, to file responses to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Transfer. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on January 26, 2023. (LTR) Modified on 1/26/2023 (TMT).
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Docket Text ORDER Re: ECF No. #20 , Consent MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum in Excess of Page Limitation, filed by Defendant PSP Group, LLC, ORDERED GRANTED. The Clerk of Court shall detach and docket Defendant's Memorandum in Support of its Motion to Dismiss and the exhibits, which were submitted as attachments to the Motion for Leave. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on January 26, 2023. (LTR)
January 25, 2023 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #19 MOTION to Dismiss Case MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #21 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) and First-Filed Rule by Plaintiff Jill Adams. (Yiatras, Tiffany)
January 20, 2023 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #21 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) and First-Filed Rule filed by Defendant PSP Group, LLC. (Vaysman, Karen)
January 20, 2023 Filing 21 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) and First-Filed Rule by Defendant PSP Group, LLC. (Vaysman, Karen)
January 20, 2023 Filing 20 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum in Excess of Page Limitation by Defendant PSP Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Defendant's Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit 1 to Memo - PSP Privacy Policy, #3 Exhibit 2 to Memo - PSP Terms of Use, #4 Exhibit 3 to Memo - PSP Terms and Privacy Header)(Vaysman, Karen)
January 20, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss Case , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant PSP Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Vaysman, Karen)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Docket Text Order Re: ECF No. #16 , MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, filed by Gerard M. Stegmaier; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on January 19, 2023. (LTR)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Docket Text Order Re: ECF No. #15 , MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, filed by James L. Rockney; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on January 19, 2023. (LTR)
January 19, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Gerard M. Stegmaier. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-9732528) by Defendant PSP Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Court Admissions, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Stegmaier, Gerard)
January 19, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice James L. Rockney. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-9731706) by Defendant PSP Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Rockney, James)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Docket Text ORDER Re: ECF No. #13 , Consent MOTION for Leave to File Documents in Excess of 15 Pages, filed by Defendant PSP Group, LLC; ORDERED DENIED without prejudice because the proposed overlength memorandum was not attached to the motion for leave, as required by the Courts CM/ECF Procedures Manual, Section II.B. The Court will not grant leave to file an overlength memorandum until it has reviewed the document. Defendant may refile its motion for leave with the proposed overlength memorandum submitted as an attachment thereto. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on January 3, 2023. (LTR)
January 3, 2023 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Documents in Excess of 15 Pages by Defendant PSP Group, LLC. (Vaysman, Karen)
December 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Docket Text Order Re: ECF No. #10 , MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, filed by Philip J. Krzeski; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on December 27, 2022. (LTR)
December 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Docket Text Order Re: ECF No. #9 , MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, filed by Bryan L. Bleichner; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on December 27, 2022. (LTR)
December 13, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Philip J. Krzeski. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-9670848) by Plaintiff Jill Adams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Attorney Admissions, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Krzeski, Philip)
December 13, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Bryan L. Bleichner. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-9669626) by Plaintiff Jill Adams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Attorney Admissions, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Bleichner, Bryan)
December 7, 2022 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendants PSP Group, LLC, Pet Supplies Plus, LLC., Franchise Group, Inc.. (Vaysman, Karen)
December 1, 2022 Filing 7 Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate to Defendant PSP Group, LLC. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every non-governmental organizational party must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within ten (10) days of the party's first pleading or entry of appearance. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible # (moed-0001.pdf). (Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate due by 12/11/2022.) (TMT)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Docket Text ORDER Re: ECF No. #5 , Motion for Extension of Time to Answer the Complaint, filed by Defendant PSP Group, LLC; ORDERED GRANTED. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before January 20, 2023. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on November 30, 2022. (LTR)
November 29, 2022 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by Defendant PSP Group, LLC. (Vaysman, Karen)
November 29, 2022 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Karen Vaysman for Defendant PSP Group, LLC. (Vaysman, Karen)
November 15, 2022 Filing 3 Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate to Defendant PSP Group, LLC. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every non-governmental organizational party must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within ten (10) days of the party's first pleading or entry of appearance. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible # (moed-0001.pdf). (KCD)
November 14, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Jill Adams Process Server: Ian Platz - Northshore Process Service Network (Yiatras, Tiffany)
November 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant PSP GROUP, LLC with receipt number AMOEDC-9618411, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Jill Adams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form, #3 Summons Summons)(Yiatras, Tiffany)
November 14, 2022 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Ronnie L. White. 1 Summons(es) issued and emailed to attorney Tiffany Yiatras. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within 10 days of the filing of the first pleading or entry of appearance # (moed-0001.pdf). (JWD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams v. PSP Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill Adams
Represented By: Tiffany M. Yiatras
Represented By: Bryan L. Bleichner
Represented By: Philip Joseph Krzeski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PSP Group, LLC doing business as Pet Supplies Plus
Represented By: Karen Vaysman
Represented By: Gerard Michael Stegmaier
Represented By: James L. Rockney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?