KRIEGER et al v. BAYER CROPSCIENCE LP
Plaintiff: MARK KRIEGER and KRIEGER FAMILY FARMS, LLC
Defendant: Bayer CropScience L.P., Bayer CropScience Inc, Corteva Inc., Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc., Cargill, Inc., BASF Corporation, Syngenta Corporation, Winfield Solutions, LLC, Univar Solutions, Inc., Federated Co-Operatives Ltd., CHS Inc., Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc., Growmark Inc., Growmark FS, LLC, Simplot AB Retail Sub, Inc. and Tenkoz Inc.
Case Number: 4:2022cv01261
Filed: November 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Sarah E Pitlyk
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Anti-trust
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2023 Filing 34 ENTRY of Appearance by John G. Emerson for Plaintiffs Brad DeKrey, Keith Lyle Bailey, Jones Planting Co. III, MARK KRIEGER, KRIEGER FAMILY FARMS, LLC, Leon Pfaff, George Potzner, TOM BURKE FARMS, Tyler Schultz, Melinda Budde, Kenneth Beck, Darren Duncan, Eagle Lake Farms Partnership, John C. Swanson, JSB Farms, LLC, Randi Handwerk, Justin Pic, John Vehrenkamp, Jason J. Canjar, B & H Farming, Cedar Draw LLC, Ceres Ag. LLC, Tyche Ag. LLC, Duane Peiffer, Barbara Piper, Amy Hapka, Beeman Berry Farm, LLC, Vienna Eqho Farms, Charles Lex, B & H Farming, Keith Lyle Bailey, Keith Lyle Bailey, Kenneth Beck, Beeman Berry Farm, LLC, Melinda Budde, Tom Burke, Jason J. Canjar, B. Carlson, Cedar Draw LLC, Ceres Ag. LLC, Brad DeKrey, Darren Duncan, Eagle Lake Farms Partnership, Dan Flaten, Randi Handwerk, Amy Hapka, Hapka Farms, Inc., JSB Farms, LLC, Jones Planting Co. III, MARK KRIEGER, KRIEGER FAMILY FARMS, LLC, James Koch, Charles Lex, Little Omega, Duane Peiffer, Leon Pfaff, Justin Pic, Barbara Piper, George Potzner, Michael J. Ryan, Ryan Bros., Inc., Tyler Schultz, John C. Swanson, Tyche Ag. LLC, John Vehrenkamp, Wunsch Farms, Michael J. Ryan, Ryan Bros., Inc., Wunsch Farms, B. Carlson, Little Omega, Dan Flaten. Associated Cases: 4:21-md-02993-SEP et al.(Emerson, John)
November 28, 2022 Filing 33 Case transferred in from District of Indiana Southern; Case Number 2:22-cv-00499. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case transferred in electronically. (DLB)
November 28, 2022 Filing 32 Transfer Letter to Clerk of the Eastern District of Missouri. Case transferred electronically to Eastern District of Missouri, on 11/28/2022. (CKM)
November 28, 2022 Filing 31 CLOSED TRANSFER to United States District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri. IN RE: CROP INPUTS ANTITRUST LITIGATION MDL No. 2993 - Conditional Transfer Order #4 on 11/28/2022. (CKM)
November 22, 2022 Filing 30 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by KRIEGER FAMILY FARMS, LLC, MARK KRIEGER. WINFIELD SOLUTIONS, LLC waiver sent on 11/11/2022. (Watkins, Charles)
November 22, 2022 Filing 29 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Nathan Eimer on 11/11/2022, filed by Plaintiffs MARK KRIEGER, KRIEGER FAMILY FARMS, LLC. (Watkins, Charles)
November 22, 2022 Filing 28 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Craig Martin on 11/11/2022, filed by Plaintiffs MARK KRIEGER, KRIEGER FAMILY FARMS, LLC. (Watkins, Charles)
November 22, 2022 Filing 27 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Lee Peifer on 11/11/2022, filed by Plaintiffs MARK KRIEGER, KRIEGER FAMILY FARMS, LLC. (Watkins, Charles)
November 22, 2022 Filing 26 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Paul Mishkin on 11/11/2022, filed by Plaintiffs MARK KRIEGER, KRIEGER FAMILY FARMS, LLC. (Watkins, Charles)
November 22, 2022 Filing 25 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Eric Brandfonbrener on 11/11/2022, filed by Plaintiffs MARK KRIEGER, KRIEGER FAMILY FARMS, LLC. (Watkins, Charles)
November 22, 2022 Filing 24 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Leslie John on 11/11/2022, filed by Plaintiffs MARK KRIEGER, KRIEGER FAMILY FARMS, LLC. (Watkins, Charles)
November 22, 2022 Filing 23 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to G. Patrick Watson on 11/11/2022, filed by Plaintiffs MARK KRIEGER, KRIEGER FAMILY FARMS, LLC. (Watkins, Charles)
November 22, 2022 Filing 22 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Barry Noeltner on 11/11/2022, filed by Plaintiffs MARK KRIEGER, KRIEGER FAMILY FARMS, LLC. (Watkins, Charles)
November 22, 2022 Filing 21 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Barry Noeltner on 11/11/2022, filed by Plaintiffs MARK KRIEGER, KRIEGER FAMILY FARMS, LLC. (Watkins, Charles)
November 22, 2022 Filing 20 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Michael McCluggage on 11/11/2022, filed by Plaintiffs MARK KRIEGER, KRIEGER FAMILY FARMS, LLC. (Watkins, Charles)
November 22, 2022 Filing 19 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Leslie John on 11/11/2022, filed by Plaintiffs MARK KRIEGER, KRIEGER FAMILY FARMS, LLC. (Watkins, Charles)
November 22, 2022 Filing 18 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Kathy Osborn on 11/11/2022, filed by Plaintiffs MARK KRIEGER, KRIEGER FAMILY FARMS, LLC. (Watkins, Charles)
November 22, 2022 Filing 17 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Eric Mahr on 11/11/2022, filed by Plaintiffs MARK KRIEGER, KRIEGER FAMILY FARMS, LLC. (Watkins, Charles)
November 22, 2022 Filing 16 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Christopher Hohn on 11/11/2022, filed by Plaintiffs MARK KRIEGER, KRIEGER FAMILY FARMS, LLC. (Watkins, Charles)
November 22, 2022 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Christopher Hohn on 11/11/2022, filed by Plaintiffs MARK KRIEGER, KRIEGER FAMILY FARMS, LLC. (Watkins, Charles)
November 22, 2022 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Troy Bozarth on 11/11/2022, filed by Plaintiffs MARK KRIEGER, KRIEGER FAMILY FARMS, LLC. (Watkins, Charles)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE - granting #11 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Tammy McClendon Stokes for MARK KRIEGER and KRIEGER FAMILY FARMS, LLC added. Now that Counsel Stokes' motion has been corrected and granted via this order, her previous motion at Dkt. #6 , filed November 8, 2022, is denied as moot. Copy to Ms. Stokes via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia on 11/15/2022. (KAA)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE - granting #10 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney David J. Guin for MARK KRIEGER and KRIEGER FAMILY FARMS, LLC added. Now that Counsel Guin's motion has been corrected and granted via this order, his previous motion at Dkt. #5 , filed November 8, 2022, is denied as moot. Copy to Mr. Guin via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia on 11/15/2022. (KAA)
November 10, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Attorney(s) Tammy McClendon Stokes to Appear pro hac vice (No fee paid with this filing), filed by Plaintiffs MARK KRIEGER, KRIEGER FAMILY FARMS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Watkins, Charles)
November 10, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for Attorney(s) David J. Guin to Appear pro hac vice (No fee paid with this filing), filed by Plaintiffs MARK KRIEGER, KRIEGER FAMILY FARMS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Watkins, Charles)
November 9, 2022 Filing 9 PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge James R. Sweeney II. (TPS)
November 9, 2022 Filing 8 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (TPS)
November 8, 2022 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MARK KRIEGER, KRIEGER FAMILY FARMS, LLC. (Watkins, Charles)
November 8, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Attorney(s) Tammy McClendon Stokes to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number AINSDC-7362550), filed by Plaintiffs MARK KRIEGER, KRIEGER FAMILY FARMS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Watkins, Charles)
November 8, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Attorney(s) David J. Guin to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number AINSDC-7362537), filed by Plaintiffs MARK KRIEGER, KRIEGER FAMILY FARMS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Watkins, Charles)
November 8, 2022 Filing 4 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to CHS INC., FEDERATED CO-OPERATIVES LTD., GROWMARK FS, LLC, GROWMARK INC., NUTRIEN AG SOLUTIONS INC., SIMPLOT AB RETAIL SUB, INC., TENKOZ, INC.. (Watkins, Charles)
November 8, 2022 Filing 3 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to BASF CORPORATION, BAYER CROPSCIENCE LP, BAYER CROPSCIENCE, INC., CARGILL, INC., CORTEVA, INC., PIONEER HI-BRED INTERNATIONAL, INC., SYNGENTA CORPORATION, UNIVAR SOLUTIONS, INC., WINFIELD SOLUTIONS, LLC. (Watkins, Charles)
November 8, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AINSDC-7362491) (Watkins, Charles)
November 8, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles R. Watkins on behalf of Plaintiffs MARK KRIEGER, KRIEGER FAMILY FARMS, LLC. (Watkins, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KRIEGER et al v. BAYER CROPSCIENCE LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK KRIEGER
Represented By: Tammy McClendon Stokes
Represented By: Charles R. Watkins
Represented By: David J. Guin
Represented By: John G. Emerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KRIEGER FAMILY FARMS, LLC
Represented By: Charles R. Watkins
Represented By: David J. Guin
Represented By: Tammy McClendon Stokes
Represented By: John G. Emerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer CropScience L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer CropScience Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corteva Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cargill, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASF Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syngenta Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winfield Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Univar Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federated Co-Operatives Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHS Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Growmark Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Growmark FS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simplot AB Retail Sub, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tenkoz Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?