Young v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Donald G. Young
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 4:2022cv01273
Filed: November 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Ronnie L White
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1355 Petition for Return of Property
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the United States' Motion for Extension of Time to File Response is GRANTED. (ECF No. #6 ). The United States shall file its response no later than February 22, 2023. ( Show Cause Response due by 2/22/2023.) Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 01/23/2023. (KCD)
January 23, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 Case Management Order,, by Defendant United States of America. (Casey, Stephen)
January 23, 2023 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Stephen R. Casey for Defendant United States of America. (Casey, Stephen)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 7. Mon Jan 23 16:30:20 CST 2023 (Davis, Kinica)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: This case is assigned to Track: 4 (Administrative) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following provisions apply in this case, and will be modified only upon a showing of exceptional circumstances: This case has been assigned to Track 4 (Administrative). Respondent must show cause, in writing and within forty-five (45) days of the date of this order, why the relief requested in the instant motion for return of property should not be granted. (Show Cause Response due by 1/19/2023.) Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 12/5/2022. (TMT)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Movant's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. #2 ) is DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 12/5/2022. (TMT)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 3, 4. Mon Dec 5 15:54:39 CST 2022 (Tillman, Tiffani)
November 29, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Donald G. Young. (JWD)
November 29, 2022 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Ronnie L. White. (JWD)
November 29, 2022 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Tue Nov 29 17:01:15 CST 2022 (admin,)
November 29, 2022 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (JWD)
November 28, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant United States of America, Non-Jury Demand, filed by Donald G. Young. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B - Preliminary Order of Forfeiture, #2 Exhibit C - Motion for Return of Property, #3 Exhibit D - Order, #4 Envelope)(JWD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald G. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Stephen R. Casey
Represented By: U. S. Attorney - Criminal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?