Facility Guidelines Institute, Inc. v. Upcodes, Inc.
Plaintiff: Facility Guidelines Institute, Inc.
Defendant: Upcodes, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2022cv01308
Filed: December 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Audrey G Fleissig
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2023 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendant Upcodes, Inc.. (Gratz, Joseph)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #24 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Allyson Bennett filed by Upcodes, Inc.; ORDERED GRANTED. #25 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Rupali Singhal filed by Upcodes, Inc.; ORDERED GRANTED. #23 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Eugene Novikov filed by Upcodes, Inc.; ORDERED GRANTED. #22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Joseph Gratz filed by Upcodes, Inc.; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 1/11/23. (KJS)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #20 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint filed by Upcodes, Inc.; ORDERED GRANTED. #21 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation filed by Upcodes, Inc.; ORDERED GRANTED. (Upcodes, Inc. answer due 1/23/2023.) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 1/11/23. (KJS)
January 10, 2023 Filing 25 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Rupali Singhal. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-9715876) by Defendant Upcodes, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Singhal, Rupali)
January 10, 2023 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Allyson Bennett. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-9715869) by Defendant Upcodes, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Bennett, Allyson)
January 10, 2023 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Eugene Novikov. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-9715857) by Defendant Upcodes, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Novikov, Eugene)
January 10, 2023 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Joseph Gratz. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-9715847) by Defendant Upcodes, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Gratz, Joseph)
January 10, 2023 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Defendant Upcodes, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hoekel, Jennifer)
January 10, 2023 Filing 20 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, Second Unopposed by Defendant Upcodes, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hoekel, Jennifer)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, And Unopposed Motion to File Out of Time by Defendant Upcodes, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hoekel, Jennifer) filed by Upcodes, Inc. ; ORDERED GRANTED Upcodes, Inc. answer due 1/13/2023.. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 1/3/23. (KJS)
December 30, 2022 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, And Unopposed Motion to File Out of Time by Defendant Upcodes, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hoekel, Jennifer)
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Defendant Upcodes, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion)(Hoekel, Jennifer) filed by Upcodes, Inc. ; ORDERED GRANTED Upcodes, Inc. answer due 1/11/2023. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 12/22/2022. (JMP)
December 22, 2022 Filing 16 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Upcodes, Inc.. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Hoekel, Jennifer)
December 21, 2022 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Defendant Upcodes, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion)(Hoekel, Jennifer)
December 21, 2022 Filing 14 ENTRY of Appearance by Jennifer E. Hoekel for Defendant Upcodes, Inc.. (Hoekel, Jennifer)
December 7, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE Service of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Supporting Papers: by Plaintiff Facility Guidelines Institute, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons Returned Executed)(Hickey, Michael)
December 7, 2022 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Facility Guidelines Institute, Inc.. Upcodes, Inc. served on 12/7/2022, answer due 12/28/2022. (Hickey, Michael)
December 6, 2022 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Benjamin J. Siders for Plaintiff Facility Guidelines Institute, Inc.. (Siders, Benjamin)
December 6, 2022 Filing 10 REPORT to Commissioner of filing or determination of an action regarding copyright. (JDC)
December 6, 2022 Filing 9 DECLARATION filed by Plaintiff Facility Guidelines Institute, Inc. re #7 Memorandum in Support of Motion Declaration of Lindsey Bruno. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E, #2 Exhibit F, #3 Exhibit G, #4 Exhibit H, #5 Exhibit I, #6 Exhibit J, #7 Exhibit K, #8 Exhibit L, #9 Exhibit M, #10 Exhibit N, #11 Exhibit O)(Hickey, Michael)
December 6, 2022 Filing 8 DECLARATION filed by Plaintiff Facility Guidelines Institute, Inc. re #7 Memorandum in Support of Motion Declaration of Douglas Erickson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Hickey, Michael)
December 6, 2022 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Facility Guidelines Institute, Inc.. (Hickey, Michael)
December 6, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Plaintiff Facility Guidelines Institute, Inc.. (Hickey, Michael)
December 6, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Facility Guidelines Institute, Inc.. (Hickey, Michael)
December 6, 2022 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Lindsey Muse Bruno for Plaintiff Facility Guidelines Institute, Inc.. (Bruno, Lindsey)
December 6, 2022 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Facility Guidelines Institute, Inc.. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Hickey, Michael)
December 6, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Facility Guidelines Institute, Inc. Process Server: Brandywine Process Servers, Ltd. (Hickey, Michael)
December 6, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Upcodes, Inc. with receipt number AMOEDC-9657262, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Facility Guidelines Institute, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form, #7 Summons Summons)(Hickey, Michael) Modified on 12/6/2022 [To correct defendant in text] (JDC).
December 6, 2022 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Audrey G. Fleissig. 1 Summons(es) issued and emailed to Attorney Michael J. Hickey. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within 10 days of the filing of the first pleading or entry of appearance # (moed-0001.pdf). (JDC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Facility Guidelines Institute, Inc. v. Upcodes, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Facility Guidelines Institute, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Hickey
Represented By: Benjamin J. Siders
Represented By: Lindsey Muse Bruno
Represented By: Bridget Hoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Upcodes, Inc.
Represented By: Allyson R. Bennett
Represented By: Rupali Payal Singhal
Represented By: Eugene Novikov
Represented By: Jennifer E. Hoekel
Represented By: Joseph C. Gratz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?