Jones et al v. Papa John's International, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ann Jones and Jane Tenzer
Defendant: Papa Johns International, Inc. and Papa John's International, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2023cv00023
Filed: January 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Clark
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: In accordance with the memorandum and order issued on this date, the Court dismisses this case without prejudice for lack of personal jurisdiction over Defendant Papa John's. Signed by Chief District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 10/31/23. (JAB)
October 31, 2023 Filing 39 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Because the Court concludes that it lacks personal jurisdiction over Papa John's, the Court grants Papa John's' #21 Motion to Dismiss and dismisses Plaintiffs' claims without prejudice. A separate Order of Dismissal accompanies this Memorandum and Order. Signed by Chief District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 10/31/23. (JAB)
October 9, 2023 Filing 38 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re #21 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Papa John's International, Inc. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Supplemental Authority, #2 Exhibit B to Notice of Supplemental Authority)(Henn, Emily)
October 6, 2023 Filing 37 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re #21 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Plaintiffs Ann Jones, Jane Tenzer . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1A, Valenzuela v. Nationwide Mut. Ins. Co., No. 2:22-cv-06177-MEMF-SK, 2023 U.S. Dist. LEXIS (C.D. Aug. 14, 2023), #2 Exhibit 1B, Greenley v. Kochava, Inc., No. 22-cv-01327-BAS-AHG,2023 U.S. Dist. LEXIS 130552 (S.D. Cal. July 27, 2023), #3 Exhibit 1C, Hazel v. Prudential Fin., Inc., No. 22-cv-07465-CRB, 2023 U.S. Dist. LEXIS 100974 (N.D. Cal. June 9, 2023), #4 Exhibit 1D, Yockey v. Salesforce, Inc., No. 22-cv-09067-JST, 2023 U.S. Dist. LEXIS 150262 (N.D. Cal. Aug. 25, 2023), #5 Exhibit 1E, Augustine v. Lenovo (United States), Inc., No. 22-cv-2027-LAHG, 2023 U.S. Dist. LEXIS 134595 (S.D. Cal. Aug. 2, 2023))(Yiatras, Tiffany)
October 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER: Accordingly, the Court denies Plaintiffs' #30 Motion to Strike. Because Plaintiffs' proposed Notice of Supplemental Authorities describes the relevant authorities in some detail, the Court also denies Plaintiffs' #35 Motion for Leave without prejudice. All parties are free to provide future notices of supplemental authority in compliance with this Order. Signed by Chief District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 10/6/2023. (LNJ)
October 4, 2023 Filing 35 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Authorities and Exhibits Thereto by Plaintiffs Ann Jones, Jane Tenzer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Notice of Supplemental Authorities + Exhibits 1A-1E Thereto (Authorities))(Yiatras, Tiffany)
September 20, 2023 Filing 34 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re #21 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Papa John's International, Inc. -- Defendant Papa John's International, Inc.'s Notice of Supplemental Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Supplemental Authority)(Henn, Emily)
August 30, 2023 Filing 33 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re #21 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Papa John's International, Inc. . (Attachments: #1 Errata A to Notice of Supplemental Authorities, #2 Exhibit B to Notice of Supplemental Authorities)(Henn, Emily)
August 14, 2023 Filing 32 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re #21 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Papa John's International, Inc. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Supplemental Authority)(Henn, Emily)
August 8, 2023 Filing 31 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #30 MOTION to Strike #29 Notice of Supplemental Authority, #28 Notice of Supplemental Authority, -- Defendant Papa John's International, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike -- filed by Defendant Papa John's International, Inc.. (Henn, Emily)
August 7, 2023 Filing 30 MOTION to Strike #29 Notice of Supplemental Authority, #28 Notice of Supplemental Authority, by Plaintiffs Ann Jones, Jane Tenzer. (Yiatras, Tiffany)
July 26, 2023 Filing 29 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re #21 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Papa John's International, Inc. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Supplemental Authorities, #2 Exhibit B to Notice of Supplemental Authorities)(Henn, Emily)
July 20, 2023 Filing 28 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re #21 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Papa John's International, Inc. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Supplemental Authority)(Henn, Emily)
April 20, 2023 Filing 27 REPLY to Response to Motion re #21 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Papa John's International, Inc.. (Lannin, Cortlin)
March 31, 2023 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #21 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Plaintiffs Ann Jones, Jane Tenzer. (Yiatras, Tiffany)
March 8, 2023 Filing 25 NOTICE NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION AT DOCKET NO. 22: by Plaintiffs Ann Jones, Jane Tenzer re #22 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #21 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Yiatras, Tiffany)
March 8, 2023 Filing 24 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #23 Corrected Consent MOTION to Extend Remaining Briefing Deadlines re #21 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Plaintiffs Ann Jones, Jane Tenzer. (Yiatras, Tiffany) ; ORDERED GRANTED. (Response due by 3/31/2023., Reply due by 4/20/23.) Signed by Chief District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 3/8/23. (JAB)
March 7, 2023 Filing 23 Corrected Consent MOTION to Extend Remaining Briefing Deadlines re #21 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Plaintiffs Ann Jones, Jane Tenzer. (Yiatras, Tiffany) Modified text on 3/8/2023 (JAB).
March 7, 2023 Filing 22 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #21 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Plaintiffs Ann Jones, Jane Tenzer. (Yiatras, Tiffany)
March 3, 2023 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Papa John's International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Henn, Emily)
March 2, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE of Change of Address filed by Randal K. Mullendore. (Mullendore, Randal) Address updated in CM/ECF (CMC).
February 27, 2023 Filing 19 Docket Text ORDER: The Court grants #17 #18 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 2/27/23. (JAB)
February 27, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Taryn P. Winston. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-9805518) by Defendant Papa John's International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Winston, Taryn)
February 24, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Emily Johnson Henn. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-9802606) by Defendant Papa John's International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Henn, Emily)
February 22, 2023 Filing 16 Docket Text ORDER: The Court Grants doc. #15 Consent MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Defendant Papa John's International, Inc.. Parties must both comply with Local Rules and Judge's Requirements. Signed by Chief District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 2/22/2023. (LNJ)
February 21, 2023 Filing 15 Consent MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Defendant Papa John's International, Inc.. (Lannin, Cortlin)
February 16, 2023 Filing 14 Docket Text ORDER: The Court grants #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 2/16/2023. (CLT)
February 10, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Cortlin H. Lannin. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-9776342) by Defendant Papa John's International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Lannin, Cortlin)
February 3, 2023 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Papa John's International, Inc.. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Mullendore, Randal)
February 2, 2023 Filing 11 Docket Text ORDER: The Court grants Defendant's [doc. #9 ] Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. (Answer due 3/3/2023). Signed by Chief District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 2/2/2023. (LNJ)
February 1, 2023 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Tanner Cook for Defendant Papa John's International, Inc.. (Cook, Tanner)
February 1, 2023 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Papa John's International, Inc.. (Mullendore, Randal)
February 1, 2023 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Randal K. Mullendore for Defendant Papa John's International, Inc.. (Mullendore, Randal)
January 18, 2023 Filing 7 Docket Text ORDER: The Court grants #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 1/18/2023. (LNJ)
January 18, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Karen H. Riebel. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-9730755) by Plaintiffs Ann Jones, Jane Tenzer. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Riebel, Karen) Modified text per chambers on 1/18/2023 (LNJ).
January 18, 2023 Filing 5 Docket Text ORDER: The Court grants #3 & #4 Motions for Leave to Proceed Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 1/18/2023. (CLT)
January 18, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Maureen Kane Berg. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-9730367) by Plaintiffs Ann Jones, Jane Tenzer. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Berg, Maureen)
January 18, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Kate M. Baxter-Kauf. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-9730186) by Plaintiffs Ann Jones, Jane Tenzer. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Baxter-Kauf, Kate)
January 9, 2023 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Chief U.S. District Judge Stephen R. Clark. 1 Summons(es) issued and emailed to Tiffany M. Yiatras. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within 10 days of the filing of the first pleading or entry of appearance # (moed-0001.pdf). (JBH)
January 7, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs Ann Jones, Jane Tenzer Process Server: Dave Campbell / Northshore Process Server Network (Yiatras, Tiffany)
January 6, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Papa Johns International, Inc. with receipt number AMOEDC-9708279, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Ann Jones, Jane Tenzer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form, #3 Summons Summons - Papa John's International, Inc.)(Yiatras, Tiffany)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones et al v. Papa John's International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Jones
Represented By: Tiffany M. Yiatras
Represented By: Karen Hanson Riebel
Represented By: Maureen Kane Berg
Represented By: Kate M. Baxter-Kauf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Tenzer
Represented By: Tiffany M. Yiatras
Represented By: Kate M. Baxter-Kauf
Represented By: Karen Hanson Riebel
Represented By: Maureen Kane Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Papa Johns International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Papa John's International, Inc.
Represented By: Cortlin Hall Lannin
Represented By: Emily Henn
Represented By: Taryn Winston
Represented By: Randal K. Mullendore
Represented By: Tanner Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?