Handi-Craft Company v. S.C. Products, Inc.
Plaintiff: Handi-Craft Company
Defendant: S.C. Products, Inc. and Michael L. McGinley
Case Number: 4:2023cv00076
Filed: January 23, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Matthew T Schelp
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2023 Filing 21 FINAL REPORT to Commissioner of filing or determination of an action regarding patent. (TMT) (Main Document 21 replaced on 3/13/2023) (TMT).
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Docket Text ORDER: In light of Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, Doc. #19 , the Clerk is directed to close this case. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i). Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 3/10/2023. (TMT)
March 9, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Handi-Craft Company (Vander Tuig, Marc)
February 24, 2023 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #17 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Improper Venue filed by Defendants Michael L. McGinley, S.C. Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Declaration of Mike McGinley, #2 Exhibit B- Declaration of Erin McGinley)(Walters, Roy)
February 24, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Improper Venue by Defendants Michael L. McGinley, S.C. Products, Inc.. (Walters, Roy)
February 24, 2023 Filing 16 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant S.C. Products, Inc.. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Walters, Roy)
February 24, 2023 Filing 15 ENTRY of Appearance by Roy F. Walters for Defendants Michael L. McGinley, S.C. Products, Inc.. (Walters, Roy)
February 24, 2023 Filing 14 Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate to Defendant S.C. Products, Inc.. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every non-governmental organizational party must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within ten (10) days of the party's first pleading or entry of appearance. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible # (moed-0001.pdf). (Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate due by 3/2/2023.) (TMT)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer, Doc. #10 , is GRANTED in part. Defendants shall file their Answers by Friday, February 24, 2023. (Michael L. McGinley answer due 2/24/2023; S.C. Products, Inc. answer due 2/24/2023.) Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 2/21/2023. (BRP)
February 21, 2023 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint filed by Defendants Michael L. McGinley, S.C. Products, Inc.. (Walters, Roy)
February 21, 2023 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint filed by Plaintiff Handi-Craft Company. (Vander Tuig, Marc)
February 20, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Defendants Michael L. McGinley, S.C. Products, Inc.. (Walters, Roy)
January 31, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Handi-Craft Company. S.C. Products, Inc. served on 1/30/2023, answer due 2/21/2023. (Vander Tuig, Marc)
January 31, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Handi-Craft Company. Michael L. McGinley served on 1/30/2023, answer due 2/21/2023. (Vander Tuig, Marc)
January 24, 2023 Filing 7 REPORT to Commissioner of filing or determination of an action regarding patent. (JDC)
January 24, 2023 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENTAL re #1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiff Handi-Craft Company. (Vander Tuig, Marc)
January 24, 2023 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Matthew T. Schelp. 2 Summons(es) issued and emailed to Attorney Charlie M. Jonas. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within 10 days of the filing of the first pleading or entry of appearance # (moed-0001.pdf). (JDC)
January 23, 2023 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Charlie M. Jonas for Plaintiff Handi-Craft Company. (Jonas, Charlie)
January 23, 2023 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Marc W. Vander Tuig for Plaintiff Handi-Craft Company. (Vander Tuig, Marc) (Main Document 4 replaced on 1/24/2023) (JDC).
January 23, 2023 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Handi-Craft Company. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Vander Tuig, Marc)
January 23, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Handi-Craft Company Process Server: Civil Action Group, Ltd. dba APS International, Ltd. (Vander Tuig, Marc)
January 23, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant S.C. Products, Inc., Michael L. McGinley Jury Demand,, filed by Handi-Craft Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Summons M. McGinley, #5 Summons S.C. Products, #6 Original Filing Form Form)(Vander Tuig, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Handi-Craft Company v. S.C. Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Handi-Craft Company
Represented By: Charlie M. Jonas
Represented By: Marc W. Vander Tuig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S.C. Products, Inc.
Represented By: Roy F. Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael L. McGinley
Represented By: Roy F. Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?