Sahm et al v. Allegheny Technologies Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Janet Sahm, Peter Sahm and David Sahm
Defendant: ALLEGHENY TECHNOLOGIES INC., Individually and as Successor-in-Interest To TELEDYNE MOVIBLE OFFSHORE, INC.,, AVCO CORPORATION, Individually and as Successor-in-Interest to LYCOMING ENGINES, BAKER HUGHES, INC., Bell Helicopter Textron, Inc., THE BOEING COMPANY, as Individually and as Successor-in-interest to McDONNELL DOUGLAS CORPORATION, CONTINENTAL AEROSPACE TECHNOLOGIES, INC. f/k/a CONTINENTAL MOTORS INC., Individually and as Successor-in-Interest To CONTINENTAL MOTORS CORPORATION, GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY, Individually and as Successor-in-Interest to GOODYEAR AEROSPACE CORPORATION, HENKEL CORPORATION, as Successor-in-Interest to HYSOL, IMO Industries, Inc., J.P. BUSHNELL PACKING SUPPLY CO., MORTON INTERNATIONAL, LLC, PARKER-HANNIFIN CORPORATION, Individually and as Successor-in-Interest to CLEVELAND WHEEL & BRAKES, RAYTHEON TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION, f/k/a UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION, as Successor-in-Interest to PRATT & WHITNEY, TEXTRON AVIATION INC., Individually and as successor by merger with CESSNA AIRCRAFT COMPANY, and MCCAULEY PROPELLERS, Raytheon Technologies Corporation, Allegheny Technologies Inc., Avco Corporation, The Boeing Company, Continental Aerospace Technologies, Inc., Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Henkel Corporation, Morton Internationsl, LLC, Parker-Hannifin Corporation, United Technologies Corporation, Textron Aviation Inc. and Morton International LLC
Case Number: 4:2023cv00200
Filed: February 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Audrey G Fleissig
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2023 Filing 133 Electronic Notice Re: #132 Notice (Other), #126 Notice (Other), #131 Notice (Other), #128 Notice (Other), #127 Notice (Other), #129 Notice (Other) filed by Defendants Henkel Corporation, J.P. Bushnell Packing Supply Co., Raytheon Technologies Corporation, The Boeing Company, Plaintiffs David Sahm, Janet Sahm, Peter Sahm. Counsel are reminded that discovery documents are not accepted by the Court. PLEASE REVIEW LOCAL RULES BEFORE FILING. See Rule 3.02 (FRCP 26) Filing of Discovery and Disclosure Materials:(A) In civil actions, discovery and disclosure materials pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 26, 30, 31, 33, 34, 35, and 36, and the certificates of their service, shall not be filed with the Court except as exhibits to a motion or memorandum. (CBL)
November 8, 2023 Filing 132 NOTICE Service of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures: by Defendant Raytheon Technologies Corporation (Murphy, Patrick)
November 8, 2023 Filing 131 NOTICE Defendant J.P. Bushnell Packing Supply Co.s Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures: by Defendant J.P. Bushnell Packing Supply Co. (Fields, Matthew)
November 8, 2023 Filing 130 NOTICE of Rule 26(a)(1)(A) Initial Disclosure by Defendant Henkel Corporation. (Schuh, Matthew) Modified on 11/9/2023 (CBL).
November 8, 2023 Filing 129 NOTICE by Plaintiffs David Sahm, Janet Sahm, Peter Sahm of Rule 26 (a)(1) Initial Disclosures (Aubrey, David)
November 8, 2023 Filing 128 NOTICE Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures: by Defendant The Boeing Company (Meyer, Timothy)
November 8, 2023 Filing 127 NOTICE by Plaintiffs David Sahm, Janet Sahm, Peter Sahm Notice of deposition for Patrice Billings (Aubrey, David)
November 8, 2023 Filing 126 NOTICE by Plaintiffs David Sahm, Janet Sahm, Peter Sahm Notice of deposition for Janet Sahm (Aubrey, David)
November 7, 2023 Filing 125 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #123 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party IMO INDUSTRIES INC. ORDERED: SO ORDERED. Signed by Sr. District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 11/7/2023. (CBL)
November 7, 2023 Filing 124 Docket Text ORDER: re: #122 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by David Sahm, Janet Sahm, Peter Sahm as to Defendant Continental Aerospace Technologies Inc. ORDERED: SO ORDERED. Signed by Sr. District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 11/7/2023. (CBL)
November 6, 2023 Filing 123 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party IMO INDUSTRIES INC. by Defendant IMO Industries, Inc.. (Stephens, Robert)
November 6, 2023 Filing 122 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by David Sahm, Janet Sahm, Peter Sahm as to Defendant Continental Aerospace Technologies Inc (Aubrey, David)
November 2, 2023 Filing 121 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiffs David Sahm, Janet Sahm, Peter Sahm. Joint Rule 26(f) Report. (Aubrey, David)
October 19, 2023 Filing 120 RESPONSE in Opposition re #117 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and/or for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed.R.CIV.P.12(b) filed by Plaintiffs David Sahm, Janet Sahm, Peter Sahm. (Aubrey, David)
October 13, 2023 Filing 119 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Morton International LLC, Rohm and Haas.. (Meyer, Julie)
October 13, 2023 Filing 118 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #117 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and/or for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed.R.CIV.P.12(b) filed by Defendant Morton International LLC. (Meyer, Julie)
October 13, 2023 Filing 117 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and/or for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed.R.CIV.P.12(b) by Defendant Morton International LLC. (Meyer, Julie)
October 13, 2023 Filing 116 ENTRY of Appearance by Julie Fix Meyer for Defendant Morton International LLC. (Meyer, Julie)
September 21, 2023 Filing 115 REPLY to Response to Motion re #106 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Continental Aerospace Technologies, Inc.. (Berwin, David)
September 19, 2023 Filing 114 RESPONSE in Opposition re #111 Amended MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Boeing Company sii to McDonnell Douglas Corporation filed by Plaintiffs David Sahm, Janet Sahm, Peter Sahm. (Aubrey, David)
September 15, 2023 Filing 113 ANSWER to #100 Amended Complaint, by Raytheon Technologies Corporation.(Murphy, Patrick)
September 13, 2023 Filing 112 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Boeing Company. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Meyer, Timothy)
September 13, 2023 Filing 111 Amended MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant The Boeing Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A re 1st AMD MTD PJ, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B re 1st AMD MTD PJ, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C re 1st AMD MTD PJ, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D re 1st AMD MTD PJ, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E re 1st AMD MTD PJ)(Meyer, Timothy)
September 13, 2023 Filing 110 ENTRY of Appearance by Timothy Joseph Meyer for Defendant The Boeing Company. (Meyer, Timothy)
September 13, 2023 Filing 109 RESPONSE in Opposition re #106 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Plaintiffs David Sahm, Janet Sahm, Peter Sahm. (Aubrey, David)
September 8, 2023 Filing 108 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Morton International LLC. Returned document(s): #101 Order. Could not verify new address and mail was not resent. (KJS)
September 6, 2023 Filing 107 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #106 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Continental Aerospace Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Memo in Support of Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint)(Berwin, David)
September 6, 2023 Filing 106 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Continental Aerospace Technologies, Inc.. (Berwin, David)
September 6, 2023 Filing 105 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to #100 Amended Complaint, by Henkel Corporation.(Schuh, Matthew)
September 5, 2023 Filing 104 Amended ANSWER to #100 Amended Complaint, by J.P. Bushnell Packing Supply Co..(Fields, Matthew)
August 29, 2023 Filing 103 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Henkel Corporation, Henkel US Operations Corporations, Henkel of America Inc, Henkel of America I LLC, Henkel AG & Co. KGaA.. (Schuh, Matthew)
August 28, 2023 Filing 102 ENTRY of Appearance by Jason J Steinmeyer for Plaintiffs David Sahm, Janet Sahm, Peter Sahm. (Steinmeyer, Jason)
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, that the Clerk of Court shall mail a copy of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (ECF No. #100 ) and a copy of this Order (ECF No. #101 ) to the address on file for Morton International, LLC. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Morton International, LLC shall have until September 12, 2023, to file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint. If no answer or response is filed within that time, Plaintiffs may file a motion for entry of default as to Morton International, LLC. (cc: Mailed Amended complaint and order to Morton International LLC on this day.) (Response to Court due by 9/12/2023.) Signed by Sr. District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 8/23/2023. (JMP)
August 23, 2023 Filing 100 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant Continental Aerospace Technologies, Inc., Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Henkel Corporation, IMO Industries, Inc., J.P. Bushnell Packing Supply Co., Morton International LLC, Raytheon Technologies Corporation. filed by Peter Sahm, Janet Sahm, David Sahm.(JMP)
August 23, 2023 Filing 99 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for leave to file a First Amended Complaint is GRANTED. ECF No. #92 . The Clerk of Court shall detach and separately file Exhibit 1 to ECF No. 92. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Continentals, Goodyears, and Henkels motions to dismiss are DISMISSED as moot. ECF Nos. #87 , #88 , and #90 . Signed by Sr. District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 8/23/2023. (JMP)
August 22, 2023 Filing 98 Electronic Notice re: Disclosure Statement to Defendant Henkel Corporation - SECOND NOTICE. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible and add all individuals and entities into CM/ECF as required # (moed-0001.pdf). (KJS)
August 9, 2023 Filing 97 ENTRY of Appearance by Christopher Raistrick for Defendant Continental Aerospace Technologies, Inc.. (Raistrick, Christopher)
August 2, 2023 Filing 96 Electronic Notice re: Disclosure Statement to Defendant Henkel Corporation. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible and add all individuals and entities into CM/ECF as required # (moed-0001.pdf). (KJS)
August 1, 2023 Filing 95 REPLY to Response to Motion re #92 MOTION to Amend/Correct for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiffs David Sahm, Janet Sahm, Peter Sahm. (Aubrey, David)
July 27, 2023 Filing 94 RESPONSE in Opposition re #92 MOTION to Amend/Correct for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Continental Aerospace Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Berwin, David)
July 20, 2023 Filing 93 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #92 MOTION to Amend/Correct for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiffs David Sahm, Janet Sahm, Peter Sahm. (Aubrey, David)
July 20, 2023 Filing 92 MOTION to Amend/Correct for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Plaintiffs David Sahm, Janet Sahm, Peter Sahm. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint (USDC, EDMO), #2 Exhibit Strike through copy of original Pettion for Federal Court (USDC, EDMO))(Aubrey, David)
July 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, within ten (10) days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff's shall show cause in writing why Defendants Continental, Goodyear, and Henkel's unopposed motions to dismiss should not be granted. Failure to comply with this Order may result in dismissal of Plaintiffs' claims against the above-named Defendants without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 7/17/2023. (CLH)
July 13, 2023 Filing 89 ENTRY of Appearance by Jeffrey T. Bash for Defendant Henkel Corporation. (Bash, Jeffrey)
July 10, 2023 Filing 86 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Peter Sahm, Janet Sahm, David Sahm. Henkel Corporation served on 2/9/2023, answer due 3/2/2023. (CBL)
July 10, 2023 Filing 85 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Peter Sahm, Janet Sahm, David Sahm. Morton International, LLC served on 1/22/2023, answer due 2/13/2023. (CBL)
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER. (PLEASE READ FULL ORDER FOR DETAILS. ) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's motions for entry of default as to Goodyear [ECF No. #79 ] and Continental [ECF No. #80 ] are DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, within seven (7) days of the entry of this Order, Goodyear shall submit file-stamped copies of its motion to dismiss and memorandum of law in support filed on February 27, 2023 to MOED_AGF_SRW_JSD_ORDERS@moed.uscourts.gov for entry in this matter, and Continental shall submit a file-stamped copy of its motion to dismiss filed on March 9, 2023 to MOED_AGF_SRW_JSD_ORDERS@moed.uscourts.gov for entry in this matter. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall detach and file in the Court records the following documents: (1) Certification of service of summons as to Henkel, ECF No. 81-1; and (2) Notice of service of summons as to Morton, ECF No. 82-1. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Continental's motion to file its responsive pleading out of time is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER OREDERED that the Clerk of Court shall send a copy of this Order to Jeffrey Thomas Bash, attorney of record for Henkel in the state court matter. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, within seven (7) days of receipt of this Order, attorney Jeffrey Thomas Bash shall enter an order of appearance in this matter and submit a file-stamped copy of Henkel's motion to dismiss filed on March 21, 2023 to MOED_AGF_SRW_JSD_ORDERS@moed.uscourts.gov for entry in this matter. The Parties are advised to refrain from submitting any further filings to the state court docket as this case was properly removed and remains under this Court's jurisdiction. (Response to Court due by 7/17/2023.) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 7/10/2023. (cc: Jeffrey Thomas Bash via email.)(CBL)
July 7, 2023 Filing 83 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #80 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Party Defendant Continental Aerospace Technologies Inc And Motion for Leave to File a Responsive Pleading out of Time Instanter filed by Defendant Continental Aerospace Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7)(Berwin, David)
July 7, 2023 Filing 82 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: Morton International LLC by Plaintiffs David Sahm, Janet Sahm, Peter Sahm. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 for Plaintiffs Response to Order to Show Cause re Morton International, LLC (USDC EDMO))(Aubrey, David)
July 7, 2023 Filing 81 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: Henkel Corporation by Plaintiffs David Sahm, Janet Sahm, Peter Sahm. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 for Plaintiffs' Response to Order to Show Cause re: Henkel Corporation (USDC EDMO))(Aubrey, David)
July 7, 2023 ***REMARK- Sent a copies of the Amended Motion for Entry of Clerk's Default's (doc. #79 & #80 ) to the Exec_Team email box this day. (JMP)
July 6, 2023 Filing 80 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default as to Party Defendant Continental Aerospace Technologies Inc by Plaintiffs David Sahm, Janet Sahm, Peter Sahm. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 for Plaintiffs' Motion for Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant Continental Aerospace Technologies, INC (EDMO), #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 for Plaintiffs' Motion for Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant Continental Aerospace Technologies, INC (EDMO), #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 for Plaintiffs' Motion for Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant Continental Aerospace Technologies, INC (EDMO), #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 for Plaintiffs' Motion for Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant Continental Aerospace Technologies, INC (EDMO))(Aubrey, David) Modified on 7/7/2023 (KXS).
July 6, 2023 Filing 79 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default as to Party Defendant Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company by Plaintiffs David Sahm, Janet Sahm, Peter Sahm. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 for Plaintiffs' Motion for Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company (USDC EDMO), #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 for Plaintiffs' Motion for Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company (USDC EDMO), #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 for Plaintiffs' Motion for Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company (USDC EDMO), #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 for Plaintiffs' Motion for Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company (USDC EDMO))(Aubrey, David)
July 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER OF DISMISSAL - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice against Defendants Avco Corporation, Bell Helicopter Textron, Inc., and Textron Aviation, Inc. only. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 7/5/2023. (JMP)
July 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Avcos, Bells, and Textrons motions to dismiss are GRANTED, and Plaintiffs claims against these Defendants only will be DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to state a claim under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6). ECF Nos. #59 , #61 , and #63 . The Court will enter a separate Order of Dismissal as to these Defendants., Textron Aviation Inc. (Individually), Avco Corporation (Individually) and Bell Helicopter Textron, Inc. terminated. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 7/5/2023. (JMP)
July 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER OF DISMISSAL - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice against Defendants Baker Hughes, Inc., Parker-Hannifin Corporation, and The Boeing Company only. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 7/5/2023. (JMP)
July 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Bakers, Parkers, and Boeings motions to dismiss are GRANTED, and Plaintiffs claims against these Defendants only will be DISMISSED without prejudice for lack of personal jurisdiction. ECF Nos. #6 , #7 , and #45 . The Court will enter a separate Order of Dismissal as to these Defendants. The Boeing Company (Individually), Baker Hughes, Inc. and Parker-Hannifin Corporation (Individually) terminated. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 7/5/2023. (JMP)
June 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, per Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m), that Plaintiffs shall show cause in writing, within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order, why this action should not be dismissed without prejudice as to Defendants Henkel Corporation and Morton International, LLC for lack of timely service. Failure to comply with this Order will result in the dismissal of the above-mentioned Defendants without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 6/27/2023. (CLH)
June 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall, within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order, file a motion for entry of default by the Clerk of Court under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 55(a) against Defendants Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company and Continental Aerospace Technologies, Inc. only. Failure to comply with this Order may result in dismissal of Plaintiff's claims against the above-named Defendants without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 6/27/2023. (CLH)
June 26, 2023 Filing 72 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Baker Hughes, Inc., Baker Hughes Company.. (Titzer, Ross)
June 21, 2023 Filing 71 Electronic Notice re: Disclosure Statement to Defendant Baker Hughes, Inc. - FOURTH NON-COMPLIANCE NOTICE. Due Immediately. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible and add all individuals and entities into CM/ECF as required # (moed-0001.pdf). (KJS)
June 13, 2023 Filing 70 REPLY to Response to Motion re #59 MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant Avco Corporation. (Stephens, Robert)
June 13, 2023 Filing 69 REPLY to Response to Motion re #63 MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant Textron Aviation Inc.. (Stephens, Robert)
June 13, 2023 Filing 68 REPLY to Response to Motion re #61 MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant Bell Helicopter Textron, Inc.. (Stephens, Robert)
June 7, 2023 Filing 67 RESPONSE to Motion re #63 MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) by Textron Aviation Inc filed by Plaintiffs David Sahm, Janet Sahm, Peter Sahm. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 for Plaintiffs Responses to Defendant Textron Aviation Inc Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to 12(b)(6) (USDC, EDMO))(Aubrey, David)
June 7, 2023 Filing 66 RESPONSE to Motion re #61 MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) by Bell Textron Inc filed by Plaintiffs David Sahm, Janet Sahm, Peter Sahm. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 for Plaintiffs Responses to Defendant Bell Textron Inc Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to 12(b)(6) (USDC, EDMO))(Aubrey, David)
June 7, 2023 Filing 65 RESPONSE to Motion re #59 MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) by Avco Corporation filed by Plaintiffs David Sahm, Janet Sahm, Peter Sahm. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 for Plaintiffs Responses to Defendant Avco Corporation Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to 12(b)(6) (USDC, EDMO))(Aubrey, David)
May 31, 2023 Filing 64 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #63 MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant Textron Aviation Inc.. (Stephens, Robert)
May 31, 2023 Filing 63 MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) by Defendant Textron Aviation Inc.. (Stephens, Robert)
May 31, 2023 Filing 62 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #61 MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant Bell Helicopter Textron, Inc.. (Stephens, Robert)
May 31, 2023 Filing 61 MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) by Defendant Bell Helicopter Textron, Inc.. (Stephens, Robert)
May 31, 2023 Filing 60 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #59 MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant Avco Corporation. (Stephens, Robert)
May 31, 2023 Filing 59 MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) by Defendant Avco Corporation. (Stephens, Robert)
May 25, 2023 Filing 58 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendants Continental Aerospace Technologies, Inc., AVIC, Ltd... (Hack, Ronald)
May 22, 2023 Filing 57 Electronic Notice re: Disclosure Statement THIRD NOTICE to Defendants Baker Hughes, Inc., First Notice to Continental Aerospace Technologies, Inc. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible and add all individuals and entities into CM/ECF as required # (moed-0001.pdf). (KJS)
May 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs motion to remand is DENIED. (Doc. No. #19 ). Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 5/17/23. (KJS)
May 11, 2023 Filing 55 ENTRY of Appearance by David C. Berwin for Defendant Continental Aerospace Technologies, Inc.. (Berwin, David)
May 4, 2023 Filing 54 RESPONSE to Motion re #45 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Plaintiffs David Sahm, Janet Sahm, Peter Sahm. (Aubrey, David)
April 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Docket Text ORDER: #52 JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ; ORDER SO ORDERED. Allegheny Technologies Inc. (Individually) terminated. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 4/27/2023. (JMP)
April 26, 2023 Filing 52 JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Defendant Allegheny Technologies Inc., Plaintiffs David Sahm, Janet Sahm, Peter Sahm. (CBL)
April 26, 2023 Filing 51 ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan J. McGinty for Defendant Allegheny Technologies Inc. (CBL)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #48 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney re attorney/firm Dyanna Ballou by Defendant Raytheon Technologies Corporation. (Ballou, Dyanna) filed by Raytheon Technologies Corporation. Attorney Dyanna Ballou terminated. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 4/26/2023. (JMP)
April 26, 2023 Filing 49 THIRD Electronic Notice of non compliance - Application for Admission needed as to Russell Baker. Review of case shows that Attorney Russell Baker is not currently a member of our Bar. For instructions on applying for bar admission or moving for pro hac vice admission, please follow the instructions located on our website at #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov under the Attorney tab. Notice only, no.pdf attached. (KJS)
April 25, 2023 Filing 48 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney re attorney/firm Dyanna Ballou by Defendant Raytheon Technologies Corporation. (Ballou, Dyanna)
April 25, 2023 Filing 47 ENTRY of Appearance by Patrick D. Murphy for Defendant Raytheon Technologies Corporation. (Murphy, Patrick)
April 14, 2023 Filing 46 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant J.P. Bushnell Packing Supply Co.. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Fields, Matthew)
April 13, 2023 Filing 45 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant The Boeing Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A re MTD PJ, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B MTD PJ, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C MTD PJ)(Meyer, Timothy)
April 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Raytheon Technologies Corporations motion for leave to file a surresponse in opposition to Plaintiffs motion to remand is DENIED. (Doc. No. #43 ). Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 4/12/2023. (JMP)
April 10, 2023 Filing 43 MOTION for Leave to File Surresponse in Opposition to Motion to Remand by Defendant Raytheon Technologies Corporation. (Kemp, Nathan)
April 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs motion for an extension of time is DENIED as MOOT. (Doc. No. #39 ).. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 4/7/23. (KJS)
April 6, 2023 Filing 41 REPLY to Response to Motion re #19 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Plaintiffs David Sahm, Janet Sahm, Peter Sahm. (Aubrey, David)
April 6, 2023 Filing 40 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #39 Notice (Other) filed by Plaintiffs David Sahm, Janet Sahm, Peter Sahm. In accordance with Eastern District of Missouri Local Rules and the Case Management/Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) Procedures Manual, a filing deficiency has been identified as follows: Counsel used the wrong filing event for this document. Docket entry modified and no further action needs to be taken. The correct event to use for future filings is: Motion for Extension of Time. (KJS)
April 5, 2023 Filing 39 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply In Support of Motion to Remand (USDC, EDMO): by Plaintiffs David Sahm, Janet Sahm, Peter Sahm (Aubrey, David) (Modified on 4/6/2023 to correct the event to a motion) (KJS).
April 4, 2023 Filing 38 ANSWER to Complaint by J.P. Bushnell Packing Supply Co..(Fields, Matthew)
April 4, 2023 Filing 37 ENTRY of Appearance by Matthew R. Fields for Defendant J.P. Bushnell Packing Supply Co.. (Fields, Matthew)
April 3, 2023 Filing 36 Electronic Notice - Application for Admission needed as to Russell Baker. Review of case shows that Attorney Russell Baker is not currently a member of our Bar. For instructions on applying for bar admission or moving for pro hac vice admission, please follow the instructions located on our website at #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov under the Attorney tab. Notice only, no.pdf attached. (KJS)
March 31, 2023 Filing 35 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Defendant Raytheon Technologies Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Kemp, Nathan)
March 31, 2023 Filing 34 ENTRY of Appearance by Nathan Drew Kemp for Defendant Raytheon Technologies Corporation. (Kemp, Nathan)
March 31, 2023 Filing 33 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendants Avco Corporation, Textron Inc... (Stephens, Robert)
March 31, 2023 Filing 32 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert W. Stephens for Defendant Avco Corporation. (Stephens, Robert)
March 31, 2023 Filing 31 Electronic Notice re: Disclosure Statement to Defendant Baker Hughes, Inc. - SECOND NOTICE. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible and add all individuals and entities into CM/ECF as required # (moed-0001.pdf). (CBL)
March 30, 2023 Filing 30 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendants Textron Aviation Inc., Textron Inc... (Stephens, Robert)
March 30, 2023 Filing 29 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert W. Stephens for Defendant Textron Aviation Inc.. (Stephens, Robert)
March 30, 2023 Filing 28 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendants Bell Helicopter Textron, Inc., Textron Inc... (Stephens, Robert)
March 30, 2023 Filing 27 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert W. Stephens for Defendant Bell Helicopter Textron, Inc.. (Stephens, Robert)
March 30, 2023 Filing 26 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendants IMO Industries, Inc., ESAB Corporation.. (Stephens, Robert)
March 23, 2023 Filing 25 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant The Boeing Company. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Meyer, Timothy)
March 23, 2023 Filing 24 ENTRY of Appearance by Timothy Joseph Meyer for Defendant The Boeing Company. (Meyer, Timothy)
March 22, 2023 Filing 23 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Vanguard Group, Black Rock Inc. (Meyer, Timothy) Modified on 3/23/2023 (CBL).
March 22, 2023 Filing 22 ENTRY of Appearance by Timothy Joseph Meyer for Defendant Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Meyer, Timothy)
March 22, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE by Defendant Raytheon Technologies Corporation of Intent to File Opposition (Ballou, Dyanna)
March 15, 2023 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #19 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Plaintiffs David Sahm, Janet Sahm, Peter Sahm. (Aubrey, David)
March 15, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court by Plaintiffs David Sahm, Janet Sahm, Peter Sahm. (Aubrey, David)
March 14, 2023 Filing 18 Electronic Notice re: Disclosure Statement to Defendants Allegheny Technologies Inc., Baker Hughes, Inc., IMO Industries, Inc.. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible # (moed-0001.pdf). (KJS)
February 28, 2023 Filing 17 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert W. Stephens for Defendant IMO Industries, Inc.. (Stephens, Robert)
February 28, 2023 Filing 16 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Parker-Hannifin Corporation. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Schag, Michael)
February 28, 2023 Filing 15 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael David Schag for Defendant Parker-Hannifin Corporation. (Schag, Michael)
February 27, 2023 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by Raytheon Technologies Corporation.(Ballou, Dyanna) (Main Document 14 replaced on 2/27/2023) (KXS).
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #11 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney Sara Salger by Plaintiffs David Sahm, Janet Sahm, Peter Sahm. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Plaintiffs Motion to Withdraw Attorney Sara Salger (USDC EDMO))(Aubrey, David) filed by Peter Sahm, David Sahm, Janet Sahm ; ORDERED GRANTED. Attorney Sara M. Salger terminated. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 2/23/2023. (JMP)
February 23, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Raytheon Technologies Corporation Sent To: Plaintiff (Ballou, Dyanna)
February 22, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney Sara Salger by Plaintiffs David Sahm, Janet Sahm, Peter Sahm. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Plaintiffs Motion to Withdraw Attorney Sara Salger (USDC EDMO))(Aubrey, David)
February 22, 2023 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by David W. Aubrey for Plaintiffs David Sahm, Janet Sahm, Peter Sahm. (Aubrey, David)
February 21, 2023 Filing 9 Electronic Notice - Application for Admission needed as to Russell Baker, Sara M. Salger. Review of case shows that Attorney Russell Baker, Sara M. Salger is not currently a member of our Bar. For instructions on applying for bar admission or moving for pro hac vice admission, please follow the instructions located on our website at #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov under the Attorney tab. Notice only, no.pdf attached. (JDC)
February 21, 2023 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) #5 Petition (Removal/Transfer) filed by Defendant IMO Industries, Inc.. (JDC)
February 21, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant Parker-Hannifin Corporation. (JDC)
February 21, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant Baker Hughes, Inc.. (JDC)
February 21, 2023 Filing 5 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis City, filed by Peter Sahm, Janet Sahm, David Sahm.(JDC)
February 21, 2023 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Audrey G. Fleissig. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within 10 days of the filing of the first pleading or entry of appearance # (moed-0001.pdf). (JDC)
February 20, 2023 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant RAYTHEON TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION, f/k/a UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION, as Successor-in-Interest to PRATT & WHITNEY. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Ballou, Dyanna)
February 20, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant RAYTHEON TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION, f/k/a UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION, as Successor-in-Interest to PRATT & WHITNEY Sent To: Plaintiff (Ballou, Dyanna)
February 20, 2023 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Dyanna Ballou for Defendant RAYTHEON TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION, f/k/a UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION, as Successor-in-Interest to PRATT & WHITNEY. (Ballou, Dyanna)
February 20, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 22nd Judicial Court, City of St. Louis, Missouri, case number 2322-CC00094, with receipt number AMOEDC-9791870, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by RAYTHEON TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION, f/k/a UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION, as Successor-in-Interest to PRATT & WHITNEY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Petition, #2 Exhibit B - Article, #3 Original Filing Form, #4 Exhibit D - State Court Documents, #5 Exhibit E - Pending Motions, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ballou, Dyanna) Modified on 2/21/2023 (JDC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sahm et al v. Allegheny Technologies Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Sahm
Represented By: Sara M. Salger
Represented By: David W. Aubrey
Represented By: Jason J Steinmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Sahm
Represented By: David W. Aubrey
Represented By: Sara M. Salger
Represented By: Jason J Steinmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Sahm
Represented By: David W. Aubrey
Represented By: Sara M. Salger
Represented By: Jason J Steinmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLEGHENY TECHNOLOGIES INC., Individually and as Successor-in-Interest To TELEDYNE MOVIBLE OFFSHORE, INC.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AVCO CORPORATION, Individually and as Successor-in-Interest to LYCOMING ENGINES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAKER HUGHES, INC.
Represented By: Ross S. Titzer
Represented By: Matthew E. Pelikan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bell Helicopter Textron, Inc.
Represented By: Robert W. Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE BOEING COMPANY, as Individually and as Successor-in-interest to McDONNELL DOUGLAS CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONTINENTAL AEROSPACE TECHNOLOGIES, INC. f/k/a CONTINENTAL MOTORS INC., Individually and as Successor-in-Interest To CONTINENTAL MOTORS CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY, Individually and as Successor-in-Interest to GOODYEAR AEROSPACE CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HENKEL CORPORATION, as Successor-in-Interest to HYSOL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Marcie J. Vantine
Represented By: Robert W. Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. BUSHNELL PACKING SUPPLY CO.
Represented By: Matthew R. Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORTON INTERNATIONAL, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PARKER-HANNIFIN CORPORATION, Individually and as Successor-in-Interest to CLEVELAND WHEEL & BRAKES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAYTHEON TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION, f/k/a UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION, as Successor-in-Interest to PRATT & WHITNEY
Represented By: Dyanna Ballou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEXTRON AVIATION INC., Individually and as successor by merger with CESSNA AIRCRAFT COMPANY, and MCCAULEY PROPELLERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raytheon Technologies Corporation
Represented By: Dyanna Ballou
Represented By: Nathan Drew Kemp
Represented By: Patrick D. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allegheny Technologies Inc.
Represented By: Russell Baker
Represented By: Ryan J. McGinty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avco Corporation
Represented By: Robert W. Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Boeing Company
Represented By: Timothy Joseph Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Aerospace Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: David C. Berwin
Represented By: Christopher Raistrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Represented By: Timothy Joseph Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henkel Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Bash
Represented By: Matthew W. Schuh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morton Internationsl, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker-Hannifin Corporation
Represented By: Michael David Schag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Technologies Corporation
Represented By: Dyanna Ballou
Represented By: Nathan Drew Kemp
Represented By: Patrick D. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Textron Aviation Inc.
Represented By: Robert W. Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morton International LLC
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?