Ellis v. Nike USA, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Maria Guadalupe Ellis
Defendant: Nike USA, Inc and Nike Retail Services, Inc
Case Number: 4:2023cv00632
Filed: May 10, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Matthew T Schelp
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2023 Filing 22 MOTION for Ruling on re #21 Memorandum in Support of Motion, Request for Judicial Notice of Documents Cited in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Nike Retail Services, Inc, Nike USA, Inc. (Bauer, Beth)
July 6, 2023 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #20 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Nike Retail Services, Inc, Nike USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8)(Bauer, Beth)
July 6, 2023 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendants Nike Retail Services, Inc, Nike USA, Inc. (Bauer, Beth)
June 7, 2023 Filing 19 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Nike USA, Inc, Nike, Inc... (Bauer, Beth)
June 7, 2023 Filing 18 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Nike Retail Services, Inc, Nike USA, Inc... (Bauer, Beth)
June 6, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #11 Disclosure Statement, #10 Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Nike Retail Services, Inc, Nike USA, Inc. In accordance with Eastern District of Missouri Local Rules and the Case Management/Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) Procedures Manual, a filing deficiency has been identified as follows: Party filed the Disclosure Statement in this action in which jurisdiction is based on diversity under 28 U.S.C.1332(a) but, did not identify the name and citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor, including all members, sub-members, general and limited partners, and corporations. The Disclosure Statement must be refiled. (KXS)
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time, Doc. #9 , is GRANTED in part. Defendants shall file any motion to dismiss no later than July 06, 2023. Plaintiff shall file any opposition to such motion no later than August 03, 2023. Defendants may file any reply no later than August 14, 2023. All memoranda in support or opposition to any motion to dismiss must include a table of contents and table of authorities. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Docs. #12 , #13 , #14 , and #15 , are GRANTED. (Dispositive Motions due by 7/6/2023.) Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 6/5/2023. (TMT)
June 5, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Zhi Yang Tan. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-9981308) by Defendants Nike Retail Services, Inc, Nike USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Tan, Zhi Yang)
June 5, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Veronica L. Craig. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-9981266) by Defendants Nike Retail Services, Inc, Nike USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Craig, Veronica)
June 5, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Morgan D. MacBride. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-9981241) by Defendants Nike Retail Services, Inc, Nike USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(MacBride, Morgan)
June 5, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice David R. Singh. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-9981214) by Defendants Nike Retail Services, Inc, Nike USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Court Admissions, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Singh, David)
June 2, 2023 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendants Nike USA, Inc, Nike, Inc... (Bauer, Beth)
June 2, 2023 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendants Nike Retail Services, Inc, Nike USA, Inc... (Bauer, Beth)
June 2, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion to Dismiss and Related Responses by Defendants Nike Retail Services, Inc, Nike USA, Inc. (Bauer, Beth)
May 24, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED as to Defendant Nike USA, Inc. and Defendant Nike Retail Services, Inc. by Plaintiff Maria Guadalupe Ellis. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Return of Service - Nike USA, #2 Attachment Return of Service - Nike Retail)(Goffstein, Adam) Modified on 5/25/2023 (TMT).
May 18, 2023 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Plaintiff Maria Guadalupe Ellis. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Orlowsky, Daniel)
May 17, 2023 Filing 6 SECOND NOTICE of Filing Deficiency filed by Plaintiff Maria Guadalupe Ellis. In accordance with Eastern District of Missouri Local Rules and the Case Management/Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) Procedures Manual, a filing deficiency has been identified as follows: Party filed the Disclosure Statement in this action in which jurisdiction is based on diversity under 28 U.S.C.1332(a) but, did not identify the name and citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor, including all members, sub-members, general and limited partners, and corporations. The Disclosure Statement must be refiled. (TMT)
May 12, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #4 Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff Maria Guadalupe Ellis. In accordance with Eastern District of Missouri Local Rules and the Case Management/Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) Procedures Manual, a filing deficiency has been identified as follows: Party filed the Disclosure Statement in this action in which jurisdiction is based on diversity under 28 U.S.C.1332(a) but, did not identify the name and citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor, including all members, sub-members, general and limited partners, and corporations. See Section 2 of the form. The Disclosure Statement must be refiled. (CBL)
May 12, 2023 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Matthew T. Schelp. 2 Summons(es) issued and emailed to attorneys Dan Orlowsky and Adam Goffstein. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible. # (moed-0001.pdf). (JWD)
May 11, 2023 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Plaintiff Maria Guadalupe Ellis. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Orlowsky, Daniel)
May 11, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Maria Guadalupe Ellis (Orlowsky, Daniel)
May 11, 2023 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Adam M. Goffstein for Plaintiff Maria Guadalupe Ellis. (Goffstein, Adam)
May 10, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Nike Retail Services, Inc, Nike USA, Inc Jury Demand,, filed by Maria Guadalupe Ellis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Coversheet, #3 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form, #4 Summons Summons - Nike Retail, #5 Summons Summons - Nike USA, #6 Attachment Notice of Intent to Use Process Server, #7 Attachment Disclosure Statement)(Orlowsky, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ellis v. Nike USA, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Guadalupe Ellis
Represented By: Daniel John Orlowsky
Represented By: Adam M. Goffstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nike USA, Inc
Represented By: Beth A. Bauer
Represented By: David Singh
Represented By: Zhi Yang Tan
Represented By: Morgan Donoian MacBride
Represented By: Veronica Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nike Retail Services, Inc
Represented By: Veronica Craig
Represented By: Zhi Yang Tan
Represented By: Beth A. Bauer
Represented By: David Singh
Represented By: Morgan Donoian MacBride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?