Hicks v. C.R. Bard, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Judy Hicks, CR Bard Inc, Becton Dickinson and Company and Bard Access Systems, Inc.
Defendant: C.R. Bard, Inc., Becton, Dickinson and Company and Does 1 through 10
Case Number: 4:2023cv00847
Filed: June 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Patricia L Cohen
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2023 ***REMARK Case transferred from Missouri Eastern has been opened in DISTRICT OF ARIZONA as case 2:23-cv-01703, filed 08/21/2023. (JBH)
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF MDL TRANSFER to: District of Arizona. Signed by Tiffaney D. Pete on 8/18/2023. Case transferred via CM-ECF extraction. Per MDL 3081. (JBH)
August 18, 2023 Filing 9 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) regarding MDL 3081 by Clerk of the Panel. Signed by Tiffaney D. Pete on 8/18/2023. (JBH)
July 31, 2023 Filing 8 Electronic Notice re: Disclosure Statement to Plaintiff Judy Hicks. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible and add all individuals and entities into CM/ECF as required # (moed-0001.pdf). (LNJ)
July 28, 2023 SECOND Notice from Clerk instructing Plaintiff Judy Hicks to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 8/2/2023. (LNJ)
July 24, 2023 Notice from Clerk instructing Plaintiff Judy Hicks to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 7/27/2023. (LNJ)
July 13, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #5 Supplemental filed by Plaintiff Judy Hicks. In accordance with Eastern District of Missouri Local Rules and the Case Management/Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) Procedures Manual, a filing deficiency has been identified as follows: Document filed was incomplete (all fields are blank). Please re-file a completely executed Civil Cover Sheet. (LNJ)
July 13, 2023 Summons Issued as to defendant Bard Access Systems, Inc., Becton, Dickinson and Company, C.R. Bard, Inc.. The summons was emailed to Attorney Thomas Kemper. (LNJ)
July 7, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Judy Hicks Process Server: Doug Shaw (Kemper, Thomas)
July 7, 2023 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENTAL re 2 Electronic Notice of Filing Deficiency, by Plaintiff Judy Hicks. (Kemper, Thomas)
July 5, 2023 Filing 4 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (auto)
July 5, 2023 Filing 3 FINAL NOTICE of Filing Deficiency. The filing deficiency previously identified has not been corrected by the filing attorney. Case to proceed to judge assignment and further review by the Clerks Office Exec. Team. (JBH)
July 5, 2023 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Patricia L. Cohen. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible. # (moed-0001.pdf). (JBH)
July 3, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency. In accordance with Eastern District of Missouri Local Rules and the Case Management/Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) Procedures Manual, a filing deficiency has been identified as follows: Notice of Process Server form not filed and the Civil Cover Sheet was filed as a blank document. This deficiency must be filed in the case record immediately. (JBH)
June 30, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Bard Access Systems, Inc., Becton Dickinson and Company, CR Bard Inc with receipt number AMOEDC-10026651, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Judy Hicks. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Hicks Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form Hicks Original Filing Form, #3 Summons CR Bard Summons, #4 Summons Becton Dickinson Summons, #5 Summons Bard Access Summons)(Kemper, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hicks v. C.R. Bard, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Hicks
Represented By: Thomas G. Kemper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CR Bard Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Becton Dickinson and Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bard Access Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.R. Bard, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Becton, Dickinson and Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?