Bey v. Poettker Construction
Plaintiff: Gerald R, Carroll Bey, II and Gerald R. Carroll Bey II
Defendant: Poettker Construction Company and Poettker Construction
Case Number: 4:2023cv00911
Filed: July 18, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Henry Edward Autrey
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Poettker Construction. (Bailey, T.)
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiff Gerald R. Carroll Bey II. (Fields, Larry)
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Henry Edward Autrey for all further proceedings. (JAB)
August 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Notice from Clerk instructing Plaintiff Gerald R. Carroll Bey II to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 8/14/2023. (LNJ)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 First MOTION to Remand Case to State Court Motion and Memorandum to State Court filed by Defendant Poettker Construction. (Bailey, T.)
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by T. Christopher Bailey for Defendant Poettker Construction. (Bailey, T.)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Gerald R. Carroll Bey II. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Fields, Larry)
July 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Electronic Notice re: Disclosure Statement to Plaintiff Gerald R. Carroll Bey II. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible and add all individuals and entities into CM/ECF as required # (moed-0001.pdf). (LNJ)
July 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (auto)
July 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 First MOTION to Remand Case to State Court Motion and Memorandum to State Court by Plaintiff Gerald R. Carroll Bey II. (Fields, Larry)
July 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Poettker Construction. (Wasserman, David)
July 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant Poettker Construction. (Wasserman, David)
July 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Poettker Construction Sent To: State Court - Executed (Wasserman, David)
July 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: St. Louis City Circuit Court, filed by Gerald R. Carroll Bey II.(JBH)
July 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Patricia L. Cohen. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible. # (moed-0001.pdf). (JBH)
July 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Poettker Construction Company. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Wasserman, David)
July 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Poettker Construction Company Sent To: Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wasserman, David)
July 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by David Joseph Wasserman for Defendant Poettker Construction Company. (Wasserman, David)
July 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis City Circuit Court, case number 2322-CC01097, with receipt number AMOEDC-10053178, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Poettker Construction Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Original Filing Form)(Wasserman, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bey v. Poettker Construction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald R, Carroll Bey, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald R. Carroll Bey II
Represented By: Larry Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Poettker Construction Company
Represented By: David Joseph Wasserman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Poettker Construction
Represented By: David Joseph Wasserman
Represented By: T. Christopher Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?