United States of America v. Nineteen Thousand, Eight Hundred Thirty-One ($19,831.00) Dollars in U.S. Currency et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Nineteen Thousand, Eight Hundred Thirty-one ($19, 831.00) Dollars in U.S. Currency, Grey Ruger P89 9MM Semi-Automatic Pistol, SN: 315-04234, Silver Taurus PT101 AFS .40 Caliber Semi-Automatic Pistol with Pearl Handle, SN: SOC 57246, Black Springfield XDS-9 9MM Semi-automatic Pistol, SN: HG951220, Tan Sig Sauer SP2022 9MM Semi-automatic pistol, SN: 24B363127, Silver and Black Zig Tisas M1911 .45 Pistol, SN: 0620-20Z09456, Black Ruger LCP .380 Semi-automatic Pistol with Defaced Serial Number, Nineteen Thousand, Eight Hundred Thirty-One ($19,831.00) Dollars in U.S. Currency, One (1) Grey Ruger P89 9MM Semi-Automatic Pistol, SN: 315-04234, One (1) Silver Taurus PT101 AFS .40 Caliber Semi-Automatic Pistol with Pearl Handle, SN: SOC 57246, One (1) Black Springfield XDS-9 9MM Semi-automatic Pistol, SN: HG951220, One (1) Tan Sig Sauer SP2022 9MM Semi-automatic Pistol, SN: 24B363127, One (1) Silver and Black Zig Tisas M1911 .45 Pistol, SN: 0620-20Z09456 and One (1) Black Ruger LCP .380 Semi-automatic Pistol with Defaced Serial Number
Case Number: 4:2023cv00915
Filed: July 19, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Ronnie L White
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 881 Forfeiture Property-Drugs
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2023 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #16 MOTION for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Casey, Stephen)
September 27, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION for Default Judgment by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Casey, Stephen)
September 25, 2023 Filing 15 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendants Nineteen Thousand, Eight Hundred Thirty-One ($19,831.00) Dollars in U.S. Currency, One (1) Black Ruger LCP.380 Semi-automatic Pistol with Defaced Serial Number, One (1) Black Springfield XDS-9 9MM Semi-automatic Pistol, SN: HG951220, One (1) Grey Ruger P89 9MM Semi-Automatic Pistol, SN: 315-04234, One (1) Silver Taurus PT101 AFS.40 Caliber Semi-Automatic Pistol with Pearl Handle, SN: SOC 57246, One (1) Silver and Black Zig Tisas M1911.45 Pistol, SN: 0620-20Z09456, One (1) Tan Sig Sauer SP2022 9MM Semi-automatic Pistol, SN: 24B363127. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Clerk's Default against Defendant properties and all other persons and entities having an interest in the defendant properties [ECF No. #14 ] is GRANTED and the default of said defendants is hereby entered. (CBL)
September 21, 2023 ***REMARK - The Motion for Clerks Default #14 was forwarded to the Clerk of Court/Chief Deputy for ruling. (TMT)
September 20, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION for Entry of Clerk's Default against Defendant Property by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support, #2 Entry of Default)(Casey, Stephen)
September 15, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE by Plaintiff United States of America of Public Notification (Casey, Stephen)
August 22, 2023 Filing 12 MARSHAL Return Unexecuted: Party served: Kelly Simmons. Type of return Complaint and Notice . (TMT)
August 8, 2023 Filing 11 MARSHAL Return Executed: Party served: James Rodgers, Type of return Complaint & Notice. (KCD)
August 8, 2023 Filing 10 MARSHAL Return Executed: Party served: Mark Mannheimer, Type of return Complaint & Notice. (KCD)
August 8, 2023 Filing 9 MARSHAL Return Executed: Party served: Jeffery Baybrook, Type of return Complaint & Notice. (KCD)
August 8, 2023 Filing 8 MARSHAL Return Unexecuted: Party served: Kelly Simmons, Type of return Complaint & Notice. (KCD)
August 2, 2023 Filing 7 MARSHAL Return Executed. Party served: Estate of Patrick McDermott. Type of return: Complaint and Notice. (TMT)
August 2, 2023 Filing 6 MARSHAL Return Executed. Party served: Marcus Cooper. Type of return: Complaint and Notice. (TMT)
August 2, 2023 Filing 5 MARSHAL Return Executed. Party served: Shane McDermott. Type of return: Complaint and Notice. (TMT)
August 2, 2023 Filing 4 MARSHAL Return Executed. Party served: Bianca Eden. Type of return: Complaint and Notice. (TMT)
August 2, 2023 Filing 3 MARSHAL Return Executed. Party served: Paul Sims. Type of return: Complaint and Notice. (TMT)
July 25, 2023 Filing 2 MARSHAL Return Executed. Party served: $19,831.00 U.S. Currency, Type of return Complaint and Warrant. (TMT)
July 19, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT of Forfeiture against defendant All Defendants Non-Jury Demand,, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Warrant, #4 Warrant, #5 Warrant, #6 Warrant, #7 Warrant, #8 Warrant, #9 Warrant)(Casey, Stephen)
July 19, 2023 Forfeiture Warrant Issued as to All Defendants. (JBH)
July 19, 2023 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Ronnie L. White. (JBH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Nineteen Thousand, Eight Hundred Thirty-One ($19,831.00) Dollars in U.S. Currency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Stephen R. Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nineteen Thousand, Eight Hundred Thirty-one ($19, 831.00) Dollars in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grey Ruger P89 9MM Semi-Automatic Pistol, SN: 315-04234
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silver Taurus PT101 AFS .40 Caliber Semi-Automatic Pistol with Pearl Handle, SN: SOC 57246
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black Springfield XDS-9 9MM Semi-automatic Pistol, SN: HG951220
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tan Sig Sauer SP2022 9MM Semi-automatic pistol, SN: 24B363127
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silver and Black Zig Tisas M1911 .45 Pistol, SN: 0620-20Z09456
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black Ruger LCP .380 Semi-automatic Pistol with Defaced Serial Number
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nineteen Thousand, Eight Hundred Thirty-One ($19,831.00) Dollars in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One (1) Grey Ruger P89 9MM Semi-Automatic Pistol, SN: 315-04234
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One (1) Silver Taurus PT101 AFS .40 Caliber Semi-Automatic Pistol with Pearl Handle, SN: SOC 57246
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One (1) Black Springfield XDS-9 9MM Semi-automatic Pistol, SN: HG951220
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One (1) Tan Sig Sauer SP2022 9MM Semi-automatic Pistol, SN: 24B363127
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One (1) Silver and Black Zig Tisas M1911 .45 Pistol, SN: 0620-20Z09456
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One (1) Black Ruger LCP .380 Semi-automatic Pistol with Defaced Serial Number
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?