Tabone v. Hartmann U.S. Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Maurice J.P. Tabone
Defendant: Hartmann U.S. Inc. and The Happy Group Inc. doing business as Happy Egg CO USA
Case Number: 4:2023cv00986
Filed: August 8, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: John M Bodenhausen
Referring Judge: Sarah E Pitlyk
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Stephanie N. Sivinski. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-10168780) by Defendant Hartmann U.S. Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Sivinski, Stephanie) filed by Hartmann U.S. Inc., #15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Vincent K. Shier. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-10168744) by Defendant Hartmann U.S. Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Shier, Vincent) filed by Hartmann U.S. Inc., #17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Eugene Goryunov. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-10168913) by Defendant Hartmann U.S. Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Goryunov, Eugene) filed by Hartmann U.S. Inc. ; Docs #15 , #16 , and #17 are ORDERED GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 09/19/2023. (ANP)
September 19, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Eugene Goryunov. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-10168913) by Defendant Hartmann U.S. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Goryunov, Eugene)
September 19, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Stephanie N. Sivinski. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-10168780) by Defendant Hartmann U.S. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Sivinski, Stephanie)
September 19, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Vincent K. Shier. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-10168744) by Defendant Hartmann U.S. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Shier, Vincent)
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, (First Motion for Extension) by Defendant Hartmann U.S. Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shier, Vincent) filed by Hartmann U.S. Inc. ; ORDERED GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Hartmann U.S. Inc. answer due 10/20/2023. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 09/07/2023. (ANP)
September 6, 2023 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, (First Motion for Extension) by Defendant Hartmann U.S. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shier, Vincent)
September 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant the Happy Group Inc.'s unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer, Doc. [ #11 ], is GRANTED. Defendant's new deadline is October 20, 2023. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 9/5/2023. (NEP)
September 1, 2023 Filing 11 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Unopposed by Defendant The Happy Group Inc.. (Bader, Caroline)
August 25, 2023 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Maurice J.P. Tabone. All Defendants. (Niro, Raymond)
August 9, 2023 Filing 9 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk for all further proceedings. (NEP)
August 8, 2023 Filing 8 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (auto)
August 8, 2023 Filing 7 REPORT to Commissioner of filing or determination of an action regarding patent. (JWD)
August 8, 2023 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Kyle D. Wallenberg for Plaintiff Maurice Tabone. (Wallenberg, Kyle)
August 8, 2023 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Raymond Niro, Jr for Plaintiff Maurice Tabone. (Niro, Raymond)
August 8, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Maurice Tabone Process Server: Action Legal Process - St. Louis (Niro, Raymond)
August 8, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Maurice Tabone Process Server: Brandywine Process Servers, LTD (Niro, Raymond)
August 8, 2023 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Maurice Tabone. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Niro, Raymond)
August 8, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-10094265, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Maurice Tabone. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit U.S. Pat. No. 10,287,070, #2 Exhibit U.S. Pat. No. 11,225,365, #3 Exhibit Chart for U.S. Pat. No. 10,287,070, #4 Exhibit Chart for U.S. Pat. No. 11,225,365, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Original Filing Form, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(Niro, Raymond)
August 8, 2023 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable John M. Bodenhausen. 2 Summons(es) issued and emailed to attorneys Kyle D. Wallenberg and Raymond Niro, Jr.. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible. # (moed-0001.pdf). (JWD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tabone v. Hartmann U.S. Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurice J.P. Tabone
Represented By: Raymond Niro, Jr
Represented By: Kyle D. Wallenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartmann U.S. Inc.
Represented By: Stephanie Sivinski
Represented By: Eugene Goryunov
Represented By: Vincent Shier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Happy Group Inc. doing business as Happy Egg CO USA
Represented By: Caroline A. Bader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?