Beins v. Midland Credit Management, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jason Beins
Defendant: Midland Credit Management, Inc. and Midland Funding, LLC
Case Number: 4:2023cv01025
Filed: August 18, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Ronnie L White
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: This case is assigned to Track: two [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS]. (Motion to Join Parties due by 12/1/2023. Discovery Completion due by 4/5/2024. Non-Dispositive Motions due by 4/16/2024. ADR Future Reference 3/8/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 5/10/2024. Jury Trial set for 10/7/2024 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10S - St. Louis before District Judge Ronnie L. White. Pretrial Compliance due by 9/17/2024. Motion in Limine due by 9/17/2024). Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 10/11/2023. (KCD)
October 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Rule 16 Telephone Conference previously scheduled for October 12, 2023, at 1:00 p.m. is CANCELED. The Court will issue a case management order based upon the parties' Joint Proposed Scheduling Plan. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on October 5, 2023. (SMH)
October 4, 2023 Filing 19 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiff Jason Beins. . (Bressler, Isaac)
October 4, 2023 Filing 18 ENTRY of Appearance by Isaac Joseph Bressler for Plaintiff Jason Beins. (Bressler, Isaac)
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RULE 16 ORDER: This case is assigned to Track: Preliminary Track 2 (Standard) [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS] (Joint Scheduling Plan due by 10/5/2023. Rule 16 Conference set for 10/12/2023 01:00 PM in Telephone Conference in Chambers before District Judge Ronnie L. White.) Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 9/12/2023. (TMT)
September 8, 2023 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) #5 Petition (Removal/Transfer) filed by Defendants Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding, LLC. (Dickinson, Joshua)
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Petition (Removal/Transfer) by Defendants Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding, LLC (Mullin, Shilee); ORDERED GRANTED. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint no later than September 8, 2023. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on August 23, 2023. (JAU)
August 23, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding, LLC Sent To: State Court - Executed (Attachments: #1 Ex 1 - Notice to State Court)(Dickinson, Joshua)
August 22, 2023 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Petition (Removal/Transfer) by Defendants Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding, LLC. (Mullin, Shilee)
August 22, 2023 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by Shilee T. Mullin for Defendants Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding, LLC. (Mullin, Shilee)
August 21, 2023 Filing 11 AMENDED DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Midland Funding, LLC, Encore Capital Group, Inc., Midland Portfolio Services, Inc... (Dickinson, Joshua) Modified on 8/22/2023 (CBL).
August 21, 2023 Filing 10 Document deleted for filing error. - DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Midland Funding, LLC, Encore Capital Group, Inc., Midland Portfolio Services, Inc... (Dickinson, Joshua) Modified on 8/22/2023 (CBL).
August 21, 2023 Filing 9 AMENDED DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Midland Credit Management, Inc., Encore Capital Group, Inc... (Dickinson, Joshua) Modified on 8/22/2023 (CBL).
August 21, 2023 Filing 8 FINAL NOTICE of Filing Deficiency. The filing deficiency previously identified has not been corrected by the filing attorney. Case to proceed to judge assignment and further review by the Clerks Office Exec. Team. (JBH)
August 21, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #3 Disclosure Statement, #2 Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding, LLC. In accordance with Eastern District of Missouri Local Rules and the Case Management/Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) Procedures Manual, a filing deficiency has been identified as follows: Party filed the Disclosure Statement but failed to enter the individuals/entities into CM/ECF as required. The Disclosure Statement must be refiled and these individuals/entities must be added into CM/ECF where prompted. (CBL)
August 21, 2023 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Ronnie L. White. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible. # (moed-0001.pdf). (JBH)
August 18, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency. In accordance with Eastern District of Missouri Local Rules and the Case Management/Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) Procedures Manual, a filing deficiency has been identified as follows: Disclosure Statement not filed on the correct form. This deficiency must be filed in the case record immediately. (JBH)
August 18, 2023 Filing 5 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Charles County, filed by Jason Beins.(JBH)
August 18, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding LLC Sent To: Plaintiff (Dickinson, Joshua)
August 18, 2023 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Midland Funding LLC, Encore Capital Group, Inc... (Dickinson, Joshua)
August 18, 2023 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Midland Credit Management, Inc... (Dickinson, Joshua)
August 18, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Charles County Circuit Court, case number 2311-AC04204, with receipt number AMOEDC-10112678, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Midland Funding LLC, Midland Credit Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Ex A - State Court Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form)(Dickinson, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beins v. Midland Credit Management, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Beins
Represented By: Isaac Joseph Bressler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua C. Dickinson
Represented By: Shilee T. Mullin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Funding, LLC
Represented By: Joshua C. Dickinson
Represented By: Shilee T. Mullin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?