Gray Media Group, Inc. v. Multimedia KSDK, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Gray Media Group, Inc.
Defendant: Multimedia KSDK, LLC and Tegna, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2023cv01163
Filed: September 15, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Noelle C Collins
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant TEGNA, Inc. is DISMISSED, without prejudice from this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 11/09/2023. (KCD)
November 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 RULE 16 ORDER: This case is assigned to Track: Preliminary Track 2 (Standard) [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS] (Joint Scheduling Plan due by 12/12/2023. Rule 16 Conference set for 12/19/2023 01:30 PM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 11/7/2023. (TMT)
November 2, 2023 Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Multimedia KSDK, LLC.(Musch, Jonathan)
October 31, 2023 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss Party Defendant TEGNA Inc. by Plaintiff Gray Media Group, Inc.. (Schultz, Jeffrey)
October 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer (Doc. #19 ) is GRANTED. Defendants shall file the answer or responsive pleading on or before November 2, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 10/24/2023. (ESD)
October 23, 2023 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendants Multimedia KSDK, LLC, TEGNA, Inc.. (Musch, Jonathan)
October 20, 2023 Filing 18 FULL CONSENT has been received by Plaintiff Gray Media Group, Inc., Defendants Multimedia KSDK, LLC, TEGNA, Inc. (TMT)
October 20, 2023 Filing 17 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (auto)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer (Doc. #13 ) is GRANTED. Defendants shall file the answer or responsive pleading on or before October 26, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 10/10/2023. (ESD)
October 9, 2023 Filing 15 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by TEGNA, Inc... (Musch, Jonathan)
October 9, 2023 Filing 14 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Multimedia KSDK, LLC (Musch, Jonathan) Modified on 10/10/2023 (BRP).
October 9, 2023 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendants Multimedia KSDK, LLC, TEGNA, Inc.. (Musch, Jonathan)
October 9, 2023 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by Jonathan G. Musch for Defendants Multimedia KSDK, LLC, TEGNA, Inc.. (Musch, Jonathan)
September 26, 2023 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Gray Media Group, Inc.. Multimedia KSDK, LLC served on 9/21/2023, answer due 10/12/2023. (Schultz, Jeffrey)
September 26, 2023 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Gray Media Group, Inc.. TEGNA, Inc. served on 9/21/2023, answer due 10/12/2023. (Schultz, Jeffrey) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/27/2023: #1 Attachment Original Summons Issued) (TMT).
September 19, 2023 Filing 9 REPORT to Commissioner of filing or determination of an action regarding trademark. (JWD)
September 19, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Gray Media Group, Inc. Process Server: Same Day Process, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons- TEGNA)(Schultz, Jeffrey)
September 19, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Gray Media Group, Inc. Process Server: Frederick Investigations, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons - KSDK)(Schultz, Jeffrey)
September 19, 2023 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Abigail Leigh Twenter for Plaintiff Gray Media Group, Inc.. (Twenter, Abigail)
September 19, 2023 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Angela B. Kennedy for Plaintiff Gray Media Group, Inc.. (Kennedy, Angela)
September 19, 2023 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by William Ray Price, Jr for Plaintiff Gray Media Group, Inc.. (Price, William)
September 19, 2023 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Noelle C. Collins. 2 Summons(es) issued and emailed to attorneys William Ray Price, Jr., Angela B. Kennedy, Abigail Leigh Twenter, Jeffrey L. Schultz. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible. # (moed-0001.pdf). (JWD)
September 18, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #1 Complaint,. In accordance with Eastern District of Missouri Local Rules and the Case Management/Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) Procedures Manual, a filing deficiency has been identified as follows: Notice of Process Server and Completed Summons or Request for Waiver of Service not filed. This deficiency must be filed in the case record immediately. (JWD)
September 15, 2023 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Gray Media Group, Inc., Gray Television, Inc... (Schultz, Jeffrey)
September 15, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Multimedia KSDK, LLC, Tegna, Inc. with receipt number AMOEDC-10164575, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Gray Media Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Original Filing Form)(Schultz, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gray Media Group, Inc. v. Multimedia KSDK, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gray Media Group, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Schultz
Represented By: Abigail Leigh Twenter
Represented By: Angela B. Kennedy
Represented By: William Ray Price, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Multimedia KSDK, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan G. Musch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tegna, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan G. Musch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?