R&R Propane, LLC v. Tiger Payment Solutions, LLC et
Plaintiff: R&R Propane, LLC
Defendant: Tiger Payment Solutions, LLC and First Data Merchant Services, LLC
Case Number: 4:2023cv01281
Filed: October 11, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Sarah E Pitlyk
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2023 Filing 22 AMENDED DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by First Data Merchant Services, LLC, First Data Corporation, Fiserv, Inc., Huntington Merchant Services, L.L.C., JV Wind Down, LLC, PNC Merchant Services Company, Wells Fargo Merchant Services, L.L.C., First Data Merchant Services Mexico, S. de R.L. de C.V... (Fitts, Amy) Modified on 12/6/2023 (CBL).
November 30, 2023 Filing 21 AMENDED DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by R&R Propane, LLC. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Kaplan, Lawrence) Modified on 12/1/2023 (KXS).
November 30, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #18 Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff R&R Propane, LLC. In accordance with Eastern District of Missouri Local Rules and the Case Management/Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) Procedures Manual, a filing deficiency has been identified as follows: Party filed the Disclosure Statement in this action in which jurisdiction is based on diversity under 28 U.S.C.1332(a) but, did not identify the name and citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor, including all members, sub-members, general and limited partners, and corporations. This case was filed on the basis of diversity jurisdiction. Section 2 of the form must be completed and all members, sub-members, etc. of the LLC entity must be identified with their state of citizenship. The Disclosure Statement must be refiled. (CBL)
November 29, 2023 Filing 19 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by First Data Merchant Services, LLC, First Data Corporation, Fiserv, Inc... (Fitts, Amy)
November 29, 2023 Filing 18 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by R&R Propane, LLC. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Kaplan, Lawrence)
November 29, 2023 Filing 17 Electronic Notice re: Disclosure Statement to Defendant First Data Merchant Services, LLC, Plaintiff R&R Propane, LLC - SECOND NOTICE. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible and add all individuals and entities into CM/ECF as required # (moed-0001.pdf). (CBL)
November 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Second and Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Amended Complaint by Defendant First Data Merchant Services, LLC. (Fitts, Amy) filed by First Data Merchant Services, LLC ; ORDERED GRANTED. SO ORDERED. First Data Merchant Services, LLC answer due 12/12/2023. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 11/21/2023. (ANR)
November 21, 2023 Filing 15 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant First Data Merchant Services, LLC, Tiger Payment Solutions, LLC; Amendment to #6 Amended Complaint ; jury demand, filed by R&R Propane, LLC. (ANR)
November 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #12 MOTION to Amend/Correct by Plaintiff R&R Propane, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Kaplan, Lawrence) filed by R&R Propane, LLC ; ORDERED GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 11/21/2023. (ANR)
November 20, 2023 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Second and Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Amended Complaint by Defendant First Data Merchant Services, LLC. (Fitts, Amy)
November 15, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION to Amend/Correct by Plaintiff R&R Propane, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Kaplan, Lawrence)
November 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #6 Amended Complaint First and Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Amended Complaint by Defendant First Data Merchant Services, LLC. (Fitts, Amy) filed by First Data Merchant Services, LLC ; ORDERED GRANTED. (First Data Merchant Services, LLC answer due 11/22/2023.) Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 11/8/2023. (NEP)
November 7, 2023 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #6 Amended Complaint First and Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Amended Complaint by Defendant First Data Merchant Services, LLC. (Fitts, Amy)
October 24, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency. SECOND NOTICE In accordance with Eastern District of Missouri Local Rules and the Case Management/Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) Procedures Manual, a filing deficiency has been identified as follows: Original Filing Form not filed. This deficiency must be filed in the case record immediately. Please use the event Supplemental or Memorandum (non motion event) when filing. (CBL)
October 24, 2023 Filing 8 Electronic Notice re: Disclosure Statement to Plaintiff R&R Propane, LLC. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible and add all individuals and entities into CM/ECF as required # (moed-0001.pdf). (CBL)
October 23, 2023 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENTAL (Original Filing Form) by Plaintiff R&R Propane, LLC. (Kaplan, Lawrence) Modified on 11/15/2023 (CBL).
October 16, 2023 Summons Issued as to defendants First Data Merchant Services, LLC and Tiger Payment Solutions, LLC. The summons was emailed to LAWRENCE P. KAPLAN. (KRZ)
October 13, 2023 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant R&R Propane, LLC , filed by R&R Propane, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Kaplan, Lawrence)
October 13, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff R&R Propane, LLC Process Server: David Ayles (Kaplan, Lawrence)
October 13, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff R&R Propane, LLC Process Server: Harmon Legal Services (Kaplan, Lawrence)
October 12, 2023 Filing 3 FINAL NOTICE of Filing Deficiency. The filing deficiency previously identified has not been corrected by the filing attorney. Case to proceed to judge assignment and further review by the Clerks Office Exec. Team. (JBH)
October 12, 2023 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Sarah E. Pitlyk. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible. # (moed-0001.pdf). (JBH)
October 11, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency. In accordance with Eastern District of Missouri Local Rules and the Case Management/Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) Procedures Manual, a filing deficiency has been identified as follows: Original Filing Form not filed, Notice of Process Server not filed, and Summons not filed. This deficiency must be filed in the case record immediately. (JBH)
October 11, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Tiger Payment Solutions, LLC, First Data Merchant Services, LLC with receipt number CMOEDC-10207546, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by R&R Propane, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kaplan, Lawrence)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: R&R Propane, LLC v. Tiger Payment Solutions, LLC et
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R&R Propane, LLC
Represented By: Lawrence P. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiger Payment Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Data Merchant Services, LLC
Represented By: Amy D. Fitts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?