Ross et al v. Siegert et al
Plaintiff: Whitney Ross, Ian Ross, Dr. Whitney Ross and Dr. Ian Ross
Defendant: Rachel Siegert and Jenkins & Kling, P.C.
Case Number: 4:2023cv01295
Filed: October 13, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Matthew T Schelp
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2023 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #17 MOTION for Sanctions against William Wurm, Amundsen Davis LLC, Whitney Ross, Trustee, and Ian Ross, Trustee filed by Plaintiffs Ian Ross, Whitney Ross. (Wurm, William)
December 7, 2023 Filing 26 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiffs Ian Ross, Whitney Ross. (BRP)
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Response to Motion to Dismiss, Doc. #16 , is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to docket Plaintiffs' Response. See Doc. [16-1]. Defendants shall have through Monday, December 18, 2023, to file any Reply in Support of their Motion to Dismiss. See E.D. Mo. L.R. 4.01(C). Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on December 7, 2023. (BRP)
December 5, 2023 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to Motion re #16 MOTION filed by Plaintiffs Ian Ross, Whitney Ross. (Wurm, William)
December 1, 2023 Filing 23 SECOND AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendants Jenkins & Kling, P.C., Rachel Siegert re #17 MOTION for Sanctions against William Wurm, Amundsen Davis LLC, Whitney Ross, Trustee, and Ian Ross, Trustee, #18 Memorandum in Support of Motion. (Stephens, Michael) Modified on 12/1/2023 (TMT).
December 1, 2023 Filing 22 REPLY TO #16 PLAINTIFFS' SHOW CAUSE RESPONSE AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Defendants Jenkins & Kling, P.C., Rachel Siegert. (Stephens, Michael) Modified on 12/1/2023 (TMT).
December 1, 2023 Filing 21 AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendants Jenkins & Kling, P.C., Rachel Siegert re #17 MOTION for Sanctions against William Wurm, Amundsen Davis LLC, Whitney Ross, Trustee, and Ian Ross, Trustee, #18 Memorandum in Support of Motion, (Stephens, Michael) Modified on 12/1/2023 (TMT).
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for Leave to File a Reply, Doc. #19 , is GRANTED. Defendants are directed to file their Reply to Plaintiffs' Show Cause Response and Motion for Leave to File Response to Motion to Dismiss, Doc. [19-1]. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall have through Tuesday, December 05, 2023, to file any Reply in support of their Response to Order to Show Cause and Motion for Leave to File Response to Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 12/1/2023. (TMT)
November 30, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiffs' Show Cause Response by Defendants Jenkins & Kling, P.C., Rachel Siegert. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Proposed Reply to Plaintiffs' Show Cause Response)(Stephens, Michael)
November 30, 2023 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #17 MOTION for Sanctions against William Wurm, Amundsen Davis LLC, Whitney Ross, Trustee, and Ian Ross, Trustee filed by Defendants Jenkins & Kling, P.C., Rachel Siegert. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - 08-28-23 Email, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - State Court Motion for TRO, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 - 9-14-23 Email)(Stephens, Michael)
November 30, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION for Sanctions against William Wurm, Amundsen Davis LLC, Whitney Ross, Trustee, and Ian Ross, Trustee by Defendants Jenkins & Kling, P.C., Rachel Siegert. (Stephens, Michael)
November 29, 2023 Filing 16 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #12 Order and MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Whitney Ross, Ian Ross filed by Plaintiffs Whitney Ross, Ian Ross. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Wurm, William) Modified on 11/30/2023 (TMT).
November 29, 2023 Filing 15 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Jenkins & Kling, P.C.. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (McLaughlin, Katherine)
November 29, 2023 Filing 14 Electronic Notice re: Disclosure Statement to Defendant Jenkins & Kling, P.C.. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible and add all individuals and entities into CM/ECF as required # (moed-0001.pdf). (TMT)
November 28, 2023 Filing 13 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #12 Order,, Amundsen Davis' Response by Plaintiffs Whitney Ross, Ian Ross filed by Plaintiffs Whitney Ross, Ian Ross. (Jurgiel, Ryan)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Plaintiffs have failed to oppose Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, Doc. #10 . See E.D. Mo. L.R. 4.01(B). Accordingly, no later than Wednesday, November 29, 2023, Plaintiffs shall show cause why the Court should not grant Defendants' unopposed Motion. Failure to timely and sufficiently show cause may result in the Court granting Defendants' Motion in full without further notice. (Show Cause Response due by 11/29/2023.) Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on November 27, 2023. (BRP)
November 8, 2023 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Jenkins & Kling, P.C., Rachel Siegert. (McLaughlin, Katherine)
November 8, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendants Jenkins & Kling, P.C., Rachel Siegert. (McLaughlin, Katherine)
November 8, 2023 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Katherine Irene McLaughlin for Defendants Jenkins & Kling, P.C., Rachel Siegert. (McLaughlin, Katherine)
November 8, 2023 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Liam Brannon for Defendants Jenkins & Kling, P.C., Rachel Siegert. (Brannon, Liam)
November 8, 2023 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael P. Stephens for Defendants Jenkins & Kling, P.C., Rachel Siegert. (Stephens, Michael)
November 8, 2023 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Ronald E. Jenkins for Defendants Jenkins & Kling, P.C., Rachel Siegert. (Jenkins, Ronald)
October 18, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to defendant Jenkins & Kling, P.C., Rachel Siegert. The summons was emailed to Attorney William R. Wurm. (TMT)
October 17, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs Ian Ross, Whitney Ross Process Server: Notice of Process Server (Wurm, William)
October 17, 2023 Filing 3 FINAL NOTICE of Filing Deficiency. The filing deficiency previously identified has not been corrected by the filing attorney. Case to proceed to judge assignment and further review by the Clerks Office Exec. Team. (JBH)
October 17, 2023 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Matthew T. Schelp. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible. # (moed-0001.pdf). (JBH)
October 16, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency. In accordance with Eastern District of Missouri Local Rules and the Case Management/Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) Procedures Manual, a filing deficiency has been identified as follows: Notice of Process Server form not filed. This deficiency must be filed in the case record immediately. (JBH)
October 14, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Plaintiff's Dr. Whitney Ross and Dr. Ian Ross against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-10214376, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Whitney Ross, Ian Ross. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form, #3 Summons Jenkins & Kling, #4 Summons Summons - Siegert, #5 Exhibit Ex A - Contract, #6 Exhibit Ex B - July 17, 2023 Letter, #7 Exhibit Ex C - August 25, 2023 Letter, #8 Exhibit Ex D - Order)(Wurm, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ross et al v. Siegert et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Whitney Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ian Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Whitney Ross
Represented By: William R. Wurm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Ian Ross
Represented By: William R. Wurm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachel Siegert
Represented By: Katherine Irene McLaughlin
Represented By: Michael P. Stephens
Represented By: Liam Brannon
Represented By: Ronald E. Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jenkins & Kling, P.C.
Represented By: Katherine Irene McLaughlin
Represented By: Michael P. Stephens
Represented By: Liam Brannon
Represented By: Ronald E. Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?