Smith v. Quiktrip Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Brianna Smith
Defendant: Quiktrip Corporation, Quiktrip Corporation doing business as QuikTrip and John Doe
Case Number: 4:2023cv01325
Filed: October 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Shirley Padmore Mensah
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: (SEE FULL ORDER) This case is assigned to Track: 2 Motion to Join Parties due by 1/26/2024. Discovery Completion due by 9/19/2024. ADR Future Reference 6/14/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 10/18/2024. Status Conference set for 9/6/2024 10:00 AM in Zoom Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah. This action must be ready for trial by no later than April 7, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on 12/14/2023. (CLH)
December 14, 2023 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah:Rule 16 Conference held on 12/14/2023. Conference held in person. The court and counsel discussed subject matter jurisdiction issues and case deadlines. Case Management Order and ADR Referral Order to follow. (proceedings started: 9:33 AM) (proceedings ended: 10:13 AM) (CLH)
December 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution. This case is referred to: Mediation. Designation of Lead Counsel: Alyssa M. Reinhardt. Designation of Neutral/Conference Report due by 7/8/2024. ADR Completion Deadline due by 8/14/2024. ADR Compliance Report Deadline due by 8/28/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on 12/14/2023. (HMA)
December 11, 2023 Filing 13 FULL CONSENT has been received by Defendant Quiktrip Corporation, Plaintiff Brianna Smith. (JEB)
December 8, 2023 Notice from Clerk instructing Plaintiff Brianna Smith to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 12/15/2023. (CLH)
December 7, 2023 Filing 12 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Defendant Quiktrip Corporation. . (Kinder, Jacqueline)
November 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CONFERENCE This case is assigned to Track 2: (Standard). Joint Scheduling Plan due by 12/7/2023. Rule 16 Conference set for 12/14/2023 09:30 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 11/10/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on 11/07/2023. (HMA)
October 27, 2023 Filing 10 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (auto)
October 23, 2023 Filing 9 Electronic Notice - Application for Admission needed as to Alyssa Reinhardt. Review of case shows that Attorney Alyssa Reinhardt is not currently a member of our Bar. For instructions on applying for bar admission or moving for pro hac vice admission, please follow the instructions located on our website at #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov under the Attorney tab. Notice only, no.pdf attached. (JBH)
October 23, 2023 Filing 8 Amended Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis City, filed by Brianna Smith.(JBH)
October 23, 2023 Filing 7 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis City, filed by Brianna Smith.(JBH)
October 23, 2023 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Shirley P. Mensah. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible. # (moed-0001.pdf). (JBH)
October 20, 2023 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by John D. Cooney for Defendant Quiktrip Corporation. (Cooney, John)
October 20, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Quiktrip Corporation Sent To: Plaintiff (Kinder, Jacqueline)
October 20, 2023 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Jacqueline M. Kinder for Defendant Quiktrip Corporation. (Kinder, Jacqueline)
October 20, 2023 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Quiktrip Corporation. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Kinder, Jacqueline)
October 20, 2023 Filing 2 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by Quiktrip Corporation.(Kinder, Jacqueline)
October 20, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from City of St. Louis Circuit Court, case number 2322-CC07740, with receipt number AMOEDC-10226274, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Quiktrip Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D)(Kinder, Jacqueline)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Quiktrip Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brianna Smith
Represented By: Alyssa M. Reinhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quiktrip Corporation
Represented By: John D. Cooney
Represented By: Jacqueline M. Kinder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quiktrip Corporation doing business as QuikTrip
Represented By: Jacqueline M. Kinder
Represented By: John D. Cooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?