D7 Roofing, LLC v. United Union of Roofers, Waterproofers, and Allied Workers Local #2
Plaintiff: D7 Roofing, LLC
Defendant: United Union of Roofers, Waterproofers, and Allied Workers Local #2
Case Number: 4:2023cv01327
Filed: October 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Henry Edward Autrey
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Labor/Mgmnt. Relatio
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Docket Text ORDER: Re #22 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply Memorandum in Excess of 15 Pages filed by Defendant United Union of Roofers, Waterproofers, and Allied Workers Local #2; LEAVE GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 12/12/2023. (HMA)
December 11, 2023 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant United Union of Roofers, Waterproofers, and Allied Workers Local #2. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - NLRB Charge)(Gierse, Matthew)
December 11, 2023 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to to File a Reply Memorandum in Excess of 15 Pages by Defendant United Union of Roofers, Waterproofers, and Allied Workers Local #2. (Gierse, Matthew)
December 11, 2023 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to St. Louis County Circuit Court, State of Missouri filed by Defendant United Union of Roofers, Waterproofers, and Allied Workers Local #2. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - NLRB Charge)(Gierse, Matthew)
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 MOTION to Dismiss Case , #15 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to St. Louis County Circuit Court, State of Missouri filed by Defendant United Union of Roofers, Waterproofers, and Allied Workers Local #2; ORDERED Additional time is granted up to and including December 11, 2023. (Response to Court due by 12/11/2023.) Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 11/22/2023. (HMA)
November 21, 2023 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 MOTION to Dismiss Case , #15 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to St. Louis County Circuit Court, State of Missouri by Defendant United Union of Roofers, Waterproofers, and Allied Workers Local #2. (Gierse, Matthew)
November 21, 2023 Filing 18 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Rodney H. Holmes termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Henry Edward Autrey for all further proceedings. (HMA)
November 20, 2023 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiff D7 Roofing, LLC. (Hellwig, Robb)
November 20, 2023 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #15 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to St. Louis County Circuit Court, State of Missouri filed by Plaintiff D7 Roofing, LLC. (Hellwig, Robb)
November 20, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to St. Louis County Circuit Court, State of Missouri by Plaintiff D7 Roofing, LLC. (Hellwig, Robb)
November 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Docket Text ORDER: Re #13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Plaintiff D7 Roofing, LLC.; ORDERED GRANTED. (Response to Court due by 11/20/2023.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Rodney H. Holmes on 11/16/23. (EAB)
November 16, 2023 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Plaintiff D7 Roofing, LLC. (Hellwig, Robb)
November 16, 2023 Notice from Clerk instructing Plaintiff D7 Roofing, LLC to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 11/21/2023. (EAB)
November 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Docket Text ORDER: Re #9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiff D7 Roofing, LLC; ORDERED GRANTED. (Response to Court due by 11/17/2023.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Rodney H. Holmes on 11/2/2023. (HMA)
November 1, 2023 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Robb E. Hellwig for Plaintiff D7 Roofing, LLC. (Hellwig, Robb)
November 1, 2023 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by D7 Roofing, LLC. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Hellwig, Robb)
November 1, 2023 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Plaintiff D7 Roofing, LLC. (Hellwig, Robb)
October 27, 2023 Filing 8 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (auto)
October 25, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant United Union of Roofers, Waterproofers, and Allied Workers Local #2 Sent To: State Court - Executed (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice of Removal Filed in State Court)(Gierse, Matthew)
October 23, 2023 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by United Union of Roofers, Waterproofers, and Allied Workers Local #2. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Gierse, Matthew)
October 23, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency. In accordance with Eastern District of Missouri Local Rules and the Case Management/Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) Procedures Manual, a filing deficiency has been identified as follows: Disclosure Statement not filed as separate docket entry. This deficiency must be filed in the case record immediately. (JBH)
October 23, 2023 Filing 4 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis County, filed by D7 Roofing, LLC.(JBH)
October 23, 2023 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Rodney H. Holmes. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible. # (moed-0001.pdf). (JBH)
October 20, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant United Union of Roofers, Waterproofers, and Allied Workers Local #2. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Gierse, Matthew)
October 20, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant United Union of Roofers, Waterproofers, and Allied Workers Local #2 Sent To: Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Removal)(Gierse, Matthew)
October 20, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of St. Louis County, Missouri, case number 23SL-CC03980, in the amount of $402.00 receipt number AMOED-10227234 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by United Union of Roofers, Waterproofers, and Allied Workers Local #2. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court File, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Attachment Original Filing Form, #4 Attachment Disclosure Statement)(Gierse, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: D7 Roofing, LLC v. United Union of Roofers, Waterproofers, and Allied Workers Local #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D7 Roofing, LLC
Represented By: Paul J. Puricelli
Represented By: Robb E. Hellwig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Union of Roofers, Waterproofers, and Allied Workers Local #2
Represented By: Matthew J. Gierse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?