New Cingular Wireless PCS LLC v. St. Charles County, Missouri et al
Plaintiff: New Cingular Wireless PCS LLC and New Cingular Wireless PCS LLC doing business as AT&T Mobility
Defendant: St. Charles County, Missouri and St. Charles County Council
Case Number: 4:2023cv01362
Filed: October 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Welby
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47 U.S.C. ยง 0151 Cable Communication Policy Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2023 Alias Summons Issued as to defendant St. Charles County, Missouri. The summons was emailed to plaintiff's counsel. (KXS)
December 14, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff New Cingular Wireless PCS LLC Process Server: Process Server St. Louis (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons)(Aubuchon, Cathleen) (cc: Email to Plaintiff Counsel)
December 6, 2023 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #12 MOTION to Quash Service filed by Defendants St. Charles County Council, St. Charles County, Missouri. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Affidavit of Denise Lutz)(Thomeczek, James)
December 6, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION to Quash Service by Defendants St. Charles County Council, St. Charles County, Missouri. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Denise Lutz)(Thomeczek, James)
December 6, 2023 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by James C. Thomeczek for Defendants St. Charles County Council, St. Charles County, Missouri. (Thomeczek, James)
December 1, 2023 Notice from Clerk instructing Plaintiff New Cingular Wireless PCS LLC to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 12/8/2023. (KJS)
November 16, 2023 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by New Cingular Wireless PCS LLC. St. Charles County Council served on 11/15/2023, answer due 12/6/2023. (Aubuchon, Cathleen) (Modified on 11/17/2023 to correct the party served.)(CBL).
November 16, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by New Cingular Wireless PCS LLC. St. Charles County served on 11/15/2023, answer due 12/6/2023. (Aubuchon, Cathleen) (Modified on 11/17/2023 to correct the party served.)(CBL).
October 31, 2023 Filing 8 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (auto)
October 31, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff New Cingular Wireless PCS LLC Process Server: Process Server St. Louis (Aubuchon, Cathleen)
October 31, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff New Cingular Wireless PCS LLC Process Server: Process Server St. Louis (Aubuchon, Cathleen)
October 31, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #1 Complaint,,. In accordance with Eastern District of Missouri Local Rules and the Case Management/Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) Procedures Manual, a filing deficiency has been identified as follows: Notice of Process Server forms are incomplete as they do not contain the name or address of the process server(s). This deficiency must be filed in the case record immediately by re-filing the Notice of Process Server forms. (JWD)
October 31, 2023 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Stephen R. Welby. 2 Summons(es) issued and emailed to attorney Cathleen Aubuchon. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. (JWD)
October 30, 2023 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by New Cingular Wireless PCS LLC, AT&T Mobility II, BellSouth Mobile Data, Inc., AT&T Corporation, AT&T Mobility LLC.. (Aubuchon, Cathleen)
October 30, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #1 Complaint,,. In accordance with Eastern District of Missouri Local Rules and the Case Management/Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) Procedures Manual, a filing deficiency has been identified as follows: Disclosure Statement not filed as separate docket entry. This deficiency must be filed in the case record immediately. (JWD)
October 27, 2023 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Luke G. Maher for Plaintiff New Cingular Wireless PCS LLC. (Maher, Luke)
October 27, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-10239846, in the amount of $402 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by New Cingular Wireless PCS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form, #7 Form Disclosure Statement, #8 Form Intent to Use Process Server - County, #9 Summons Summons - County, #10 Form Intent to Use Process Server - Council, #11 Summons Summons - Council)(Aubuchon, Cathleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: New Cingular Wireless PCS LLC v. St. Charles County, Missouri et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Cingular Wireless PCS LLC
Represented By: Luke G. Maher
Represented By: Cathleen Aubuchon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Cingular Wireless PCS LLC doing business as AT&T Mobility
Represented By: Cathleen Aubuchon
Represented By: Luke G. Maher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Charles County, Missouri
Represented By: James C. Thomeczek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Charles County Council
Represented By: James C. Thomeczek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?