McKay v. RBM Partners LLC et al
Plaintiff: Keith McKay
Defendant: RBM Partners LLC doing business as Chez Paree, Jason Hams and Sinetria Staples
Case Number: 4:2023cv01384
Filed: October 31, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Sarah E Pitlyk
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981 Housing Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2023 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #22 MOTION for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Keith McKay. (KEK)
December 18, 2023 Filing 22 MOTION for Default Judgment by Plaintiff Keith McKay. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(KEK)
December 13, 2023 Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion re #16 MOTION to Set Aside Default filed by Plaintiff Keith McKay. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(KRZ)
December 12, 2023 Filing 20 AMENDED DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by RBM Partners LLC, Kristie Bailey as Trustee Bailey Dynasty Trust, Michael Bailey as Trustee AGM Trust, Abigail Bailey Trustee Abigail M Bailey Trust. (Martin, Matthew) Modified on 12/13/2023 (CBL).
December 12, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #18 Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant RBM Partners LLC. In accordance with Eastern District of Missouri Local Rules and the Case Management/Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) Procedures Manual, a filing deficiency has been identified as follows: Please review Local Rule 2.09, which was revised in March 2023 and use the form adopted by this Court to re-file a correct disclosure statement,. (Form MOED0001) The Disclosure Statement must be refiled. (CBL)
December 8, 2023 Filing 18 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by RBM Partners LLC, RBM Partners, LLC.. (Martin, Matthew)
December 8, 2023 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #16 MOTION to Set Aside Default filed by Defendants Jason Hams, RBM Partners LLC, Sinetria Staples. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Ex A Tempest Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Ex B SOS RBM Partners)(Martin, Matthew)
December 8, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION to Set Aside Default by Defendants Jason Hams, RBM Partners LLC, Sinetria Staples. (Martin, Matthew)
December 8, 2023 Filing 15 ENTRY of Appearance by Matthew P. Martin for Defendant Jason Hams. (Martin, Matthew)
December 8, 2023 Filing 14 ENTRY of Appearance by Matthew P. Martin for Defendant Sinetria Staples. (Martin, Matthew)
December 8, 2023 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by Matthew P. Martin for Defendant RBM Partners LLC. (Martin, Matthew)
December 8, 2023 Filing 12 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Clerk's Default against Defendants RBM Partners, LLC, d/b/a Chez Paree; Jason Hams; and Sinetria Staples [ECF No. #9 ] is GRANTED and the default of said defendant is hereby entered. (Copy of this default mailed to each defendant at the address listed on the summonses returned.) (ANR)
December 8, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 12. Fri Dec 8 11:42:57 CST 2023 (Reichert, Alexis)
December 4, 2023 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT re #9 MOTION for Entry of Clerk's Default against defendants by Plaintiff Keith McKay. (NEP)
December 4, 2023 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #9 MOTION for Entry of Clerk's Default against defendants filed by Plaintiff Keith McKay. (NEP)
December 4, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for Entry of Clerk's Default against defendants by Plaintiff Keith McKay. (cc: Exec Team) (NEP)
November 27, 2023 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Truth II by Plaintiff Keith McKay. (KEK)
November 16, 2023 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF TRUTH by Plaintiff Keith McKay. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Lease agreement)(KRZ)
November 13, 2023 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Keith McKay. Jason Hams served on 11/9/2023, answer due 11/30/2023; RBM Partners LLC served on 11/9/2023, answer due 11/30/2023; Sinetria Staples served on 11/9/2023, answer due 11/30/2023. (statistical event only, no attachment. See doc #5 .) (NEP)
November 13, 2023 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Keith McKay, Fireside Financial LLC. (KRZ)
November 13, 2023 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Keith McKay. (KRZ)
October 31, 2023 Filing 4 Receipt: $ 402.00, receipt number 18154 Civil Filing Fee- Non-Prisoner on behalf of Keith McKay (CCAM). (auto)
October 31, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Exhibit with the Clerk's Office in flash drive format by Plaintiff Keith McKay (JBH)
October 31, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Keith McKay Process Server: Missouri Process Serving (Attachments: #1 Summons 1, #2 Summons 2, #3 Summons 3)(JBH)
October 31, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number STL-18154, in the amount of $402, Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Keith McKay. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Attachment Affidavit and Notice of Default, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Original Filing Form, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Attachment Memorandum of Law)(JBH) Modified on 10/31/2023 to add receipt number (JBH).
October 31, 2023 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Sarah E. Pitlyk. 3 Summons(es) issued and emailed to Keith McKay. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible. # (moed-0001.pdf). (JBH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKay v. RBM Partners LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith McKay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBM Partners LLC doing business as Chez Paree
Represented By: Matthew P. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Hams
Represented By: Matthew P. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sinetria Staples
Represented By: Matthew P. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?