Ford v. Board of Healing Arts
Plaintiff: Jamie Sue Ford
Defendant: Board of Healing Arts
Case Number: 4:2023cv01392
Filed: November 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Sarah E Pitlyk
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Jamie Sue Ford. (KEK)
December 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to mail to Plaintiff a copy of the Court's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff must either pay the $402 filing fee or submit the completed Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs, in accordance with the instructions in this Order, within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 12/06/2023. (ANR)
November 27, 2023 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENTAL re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Jamie Sue Ford. (ANR)
November 1, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Jamie Sue Ford. (JWD)
November 1, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Jamie Sue Ford. (JWD)
November 1, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Board of Healing Arts, Jury Demand, filed by Jamie Sue Ford. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -Evidence, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form, #4 Envelope)(JWD)
November 1, 2023 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (JWD)
November 1, 2023 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Sarah E. Pitlyk. (JWD)
November 1, 2023 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Wed Nov 1 15:01:25 CDT 2023 (admin,)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ford v. Board of Healing Arts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Sue Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Healing Arts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?