Agnew v. Casey's Marketing Company et al
Plaintiff: Peggy Agnew
Defendant: Casey's Marketing Company, Casey's Service Company, Casey's Marketing Co. doing business as Casey's General Store and Casey's Services Co. doing business as Casey's General Store
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Casey's Services Co. and Casey's Marketing Co.
3Rd Party Defendant: Divisions, Inc dba Divisions Maintenance Group
Case Number: 4:2023cv01422
Filed: November 7, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Audrey G Fleissig
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2023 Filing 24 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Leo Loren Logan. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-10306987) by Third Party Plaintiffs Casey's Marketing Co., Casey's Services Co., Defendants Casey's Marketing Co., Casey's Services Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Logan, Leo) filed by Casey's Marketing Co., Casey's Services Co. ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by Sr. District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 12/6/2023. (JMP)
December 6, 2023 Filing 23 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Schalie A. Johnson. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-10306188) by Third Party Plaintiffs Casey's Marketing Co., Casey's Services Co., Defendants Casey's Marketing Co., Casey's Services Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Johnson, Schalie) filed by Casey's Marketing Co., Casey's Services Co. ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by Sr. District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 12/6/2023. (JMP)
December 5, 2023 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Leo Loren Logan. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-10306987) by Third Party Plaintiffs Casey's Marketing Co., Casey's Services Co., Defendants Casey's Marketing Co., Casey's Services Co.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Logan, Leo)
December 5, 2023 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Schalie A. Johnson. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-10306188) by Third Party Plaintiffs Casey's Marketing Co., Casey's Services Co., Defendants Casey's Marketing Co., Casey's Services Co.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Johnson, Schalie)
November 28, 2023 Filing 20 AMENDED DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Peggy Agnew. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Flaherty, Sean) Modified on 11/29/2023 (CBL).
November 28, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons: by Third Party Plaintiffs Casey's Marketing Co., Casey's Services Co., Defendants Casey's Marketing Co., Casey's Services Co. (Kelly, Bryan)
November 28, 2023 Filing 18 WAIVER of Service issued defendantDivisions, Inc dba Divisions Maintenance Group. sent to Division, Inc on 11/28/2023 filed by Casey's Services Co., Casey's Marketing Co.. Waiver of Service due by 12/28/2023. (Kelly, Bryan)
November 28, 2023 Filing 17 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against third party defendant Divisions, Inc dba Divisions Maintenance Group Waivers issued Third Party Defendant Divisions, Inc, Jury DemandDemand,, filed by Casey's Services Co., Casey's Marketing Co..(Kelly, Bryan)
November 28, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #15 Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff Peggy Agnew. In accordance with Eastern District of Missouri Local Rules and the Case Management/Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) Procedures Manual, a filing deficiency has been identified as follows: Party filed the Disclosure Statement in this action in which jurisdiction is based on diversity under 28 U.S.C.1332(a) but, did not identify the name and state of citizenship of the individual party or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor, including all members, sub-members, general and limited partners, and corporations. The Disclosure Statement must be refiled. (CBL)
November 27, 2023 Filing 15 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Peggy Agnew. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Flaherty, Sean)
November 27, 2023 Filing 14 Electronic Notice re: Disclosure Statement to Plaintiff Peggy Agnew. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible and add all individuals and entities into CM/ECF as required # (moed-0001.pdf). (KJS)
November 14, 2023 Filing 13 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint by Casey's Marketing Co..(Kelly, Bryan)
November 8, 2023 Filing 12 Electronic Notice - Application for Admission needed as to Leo L. Logan, Schalie A. Johnson. Review of case shows that Attorney Leo L. Logan, Schalie A. Johnson is not currently a member of our Bar. For instructions on applying for bar admission or moving for pro hac vice admission, please follow the instructions located on our website at #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov under the Attorney tab. Notice only, no.pdf attached. (CBL)
November 8, 2023 Filing 11 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Jefferson County Circuit Court, filed by Peggy Agnew.(JWD)
November 8, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Casey's Marketing Co., Casey's Services Co. Sent To: Plaintiff (Kelly, Bryan)
November 8, 2023 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENTAL State Court Docket Sheet by Defendants Casey's Marketing Co., Casey's Services Co.. (Kelly, Bryan)
November 8, 2023 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENTAL Original Filing Form by Defendants Casey's Marketing Co., Casey's Services Co.. (Kelly, Bryan)
November 8, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #1 Notice of Removal Petition,. In accordance with Eastern District of Missouri Local Rules and the Case Management/Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) Procedures Manual, a filing deficiency has been identified as follows: Original Filing Form not filed. Copy of State Court Docket Sheet not filed. Notice of Filing Notice of Removal to plaintiff not filed. This deficiency must be filed in the case record immediately. (JWD)
November 8, 2023 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Audrey G. Fleissig. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible. # (moed-0001.pdf). (JWD)
November 7, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE Designation of Place of Trial - St. Louis: by Defendants Casey's Marketing Company, Casey's Service Company (Kelly, Bryan)
November 7, 2023 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Casey's Service Company, Casey's General Stores, Inc... (Kelly, Bryan)
November 7, 2023 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Casey's Marketing Company, Casey's General Stores, Inc... (Kelly, Bryan)
November 7, 2023 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendants Casey's Marketing Company, Casey's Service Company. (Kelly, Bryan)
November 7, 2023 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Bryan Kelly for Defendants Casey's Marketing Company, Casey's Service Company. (Kelly, Bryan)
November 7, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Missouri, case number 23JE-CC00923, with receipt number AMOEDC-10260117, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Casey's Service Company, Casey's Marketing Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - State Court Pleadings)(Kelly, Bryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Agnew v. Casey's Marketing Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy Agnew
Represented By: Sean M. Flaherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casey's Marketing Company
Represented By: Bryan Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casey's Service Company
Represented By: Bryan Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casey's Marketing Co. doing business as Casey's General Store
Represented By: Bryan Kelly
Represented By: Leo L. Logan
Represented By: Schalie A. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casey's Services Co. doing business as Casey's General Store
Represented By: Bryan Kelly
Represented By: Leo L. Logan
Represented By: Schalie A. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Casey's Services Co.
Represented By: Bryan Kelly
Represented By: Leo L. Logan
Represented By: Schalie A. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Casey's Marketing Co.
Represented By: Bryan Kelly
Represented By: Leo L. Logan
Represented By: Schalie A. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Divisions, Inc dba Divisions Maintenance Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?