Travelers Property Casualty Company of America v. Gramlisch et al
Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Defendant: Levi C. Gramlisch, Christopher Burke, Gershenson Construction Co., Inc., James P. Kinsey, Sr., J.P.K., D.K. and B.N.
Respondent: Christopher L. Burke, As Special Administrator of the Estate of Daryl J. Maynor, Gershenson Construction Co., INC, James P Kinsey As Independent Administrator of The Estate of Mary T. Kinsey, SR., James P Kinsey A Minor, By and Through His Father and Next Friend, James P. Kinsey, Sr., Jr., Danny Kinsey, A Minor, By and Through His Father and Next Friend, James P. Kinsey Sr. and Blake Nichols, A Minor By and Through His Mother and Next Friend, Jacqueline Nichols
Case Number: 4:2023cv01440
Filed: November 10, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Noelle C Collins
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2023 Notice from Clerk instructing Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. (Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 12/15/2023.) (TMT)
December 8, 2023 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America Christopher Burke waiver signed on 11/13/2023, answer due 1/12/2024. (Ketchum, Tyson)
December 5, 2023 Filing 23 Summons Issued as to defendant Levi C. Gramlisch. The summons was emailed to Attorney Kevin Prewitt. (TMT)
December 5, 2023 Filing 22 Waiver of Service Returned Unexecuted filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America as to Levi C. Gramlisch. (Ketchum, Tyson)
December 4, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America Process Server: HPS Process Service and Investigations (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Prewitt, Kevin)
November 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Tyson H. Ketchum (Doc. #18 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 11/17/2023. (TMT)
November 16, 2023 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America Gershenson Construction Co., Inc. waiver signed on 11/13/2023, answer due 1/12/2024. (Ketchum, Tyson)
November 16, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tyson H. Ketchum. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-10275136) by Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Ketchum, Tyson)
November 15, 2023 Filing 17 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Gershenson Construction Co., Inc.. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Neely, Joseph)
November 15, 2023 Filing 16 ENTRY of Appearance by Joseph Neely for Defendant Gershenson Construction Co., Inc.. (Neely, Joseph)
November 14, 2023 Filing 15 ENTRY of Appearance by Kevin Prewitt for Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Prewitt, Kevin)
November 13, 2023 Filing 14 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (auto)
November 13, 2023 Filing 13 Electronic Notice - Application for Admission needed as to Tyson Ketchum. Review of case shows that Attorney Tyson Ketchum is not currently a member of our Bar. For instructions on applying for bar admission or moving for pro hac vice admission, please follow the instructions located on our website at #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov under the Attorney tab. Notice only, no.pdf attached. (JWD)
November 13, 2023 Filing 12 WAIVER of Service issued defendant Levi C. Gramlisch sent to Levi C. Gramlisch on 11/13/23 filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. Waiver of Service due by 12/13/2023. (Ketchum, Tyson) Modified on 11/14/2023 (TMT).
November 13, 2023 Filing 11 WAIVER of Service issued defendant James P. Kinsey, Sr. sent to James P. Kinsey, Sr., as Independent Administrator on 11/13/23 filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. Waiver of Service due by 12/13/2023. (Ketchum, Tyson) Modified on 11/14/2023 (TMT).
November 13, 2023 Filing 10 WAIVER of Service issued defendant J.P.K. sent to J.K., a minor, by and through James P. Kinsey, Sr. on 11/13/23 filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. Waiver of Service due by 12/13/2023. (Ketchum, Tyson) Modified on 11/14/2023 (TMT).
November 13, 2023 Filing 9 WAIVER of Service issued defendant Gershenson Construction Co., Inc. sent to Gershenson Construction Co. on 11/13/23 filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. Waiver of Service due by 12/13/2023. (Ketchum, Tyson) Modified on 11/14/2023 (TMT).
November 13, 2023 Filing 8 WAIVER of Service issued defendant D.K. sent to D.K., a minor, by and through James P. Kinsey, Sr. on 11/13/23 filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. Waiver of Service due by 12/13/2023. (Ketchum, Tyson) Modified on 11/14/2023 (TMT).
November 13, 2023 Filing 7 WAIVER of Service issued defendant Christopher Burke sent to Christopher L. Burke, Special Administrator on 11/13/23 filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. Waiver of Service due by 12/13/2023. (Ketchum, Tyson) Modified on 11/14/2023 (TMT).
November 13, 2023 Filing 6 WAIVER of Service issued defendant B.N. sent to B.N. a minor, by and through Jacqueline Nichols on 11/13/23 filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. Waiver of Service due by 12/13/2023. (Ketchum, Tyson) Modified on 11/14/2023 (TMT).
November 13, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #1 Complaint,,,. In accordance with Eastern District of Missouri Local Rules and the Case Management/Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) Procedures Manual, a filing deficiency has been identified as follows: Completed Summons and Notice of Process Server or Request for Waiver of Service not filed. This deficiency must be filed in the case record immediately. (JWD)
November 13, 2023 Filing 4 AMENDED DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, The Travelers Companies, Inc., The Standard Fire Insurance Company, Travelers Insurance Group Holdings Inc., Travelers Property Casualty Corporation.. (Ketchum, Tyson) Modified on 11/16/2023 (CBL).
November 13, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #2 Disclosure Statement filed by Petitioner Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. In accordance with Eastern District of Missouri Local Rules and the Case Management/Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) Procedures Manual, a filing deficiency has been identified as follows: Party filed the Disclosure Statement but failed to enter the individuals/entities into CM/ECF as required. The Disclosure Statement must be refiled and these individuals/entities must be added into CM/ECF where prompted. (CBL)
November 13, 2023 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Noelle C. Collins. 7 Waiver(s) of Service issued. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible. # (moed-0001.pdf). (JWD)
November 10, 2023 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Ketchum, Tyson)
November 10, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Declaratory Judgment against defendant Christopher L. Burke, As Special Administrator of the Estate of Daryl J. Maynor, Gershenson Construction Co., INC, Levi C. Gramlisch, James P Kinsey A Minor, By and Through His Father and Next Friend, James P. Kinsey, Sr., Jr, James P Kinsey As Independent Administrator of The Estate of Mary T. Kinsey, SR, Danny Kinsey, A Minor, By and Through His Father and Next Friend, James P. Kinsey Sr., Blake Nichols, A Minor By and Through His Mother and Next Friend, Jacqueline Nichols with receipt number AMOEDC-10266162, in the amount of $402 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Exhibit 1 Underlying Maynor Suit, #4 Exhibit 2 Underlying Kinsey Suit, #5 Exhibit 3 Primary Policy, #6 Exhibit 4 Excess Policy)(Ketchum, Tyson) Modified on 11/13/2023 (JWD). Clerk's note: the Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, and Attachment #4 - Exhibit #2 all sealed pursuant to Local Rule 2.17 because they contain the full names of minors]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America v. Gramlisch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Represented By: Tyson Ketchum
Represented By: Kevin Prewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Levi C. Gramlisch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gershenson Construction Co., Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Neely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James P. Kinsey, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P.K.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.K.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B.N.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Christopher L. Burke, As Special Administrator of the Estate of Daryl J. Maynor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Gershenson Construction Co., INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: James P Kinsey As Independent Administrator of The Estate of Mary T. Kinsey, SR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: James P Kinsey A Minor, By and Through His Father and Next Friend, James P. Kinsey, Sr., Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Danny Kinsey, A Minor, By and Through His Father and Next Friend, James P. Kinsey Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Blake Nichols, A Minor By and Through His Mother and Next Friend, Jacqueline Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?