Oats v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Sydney Oats
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2023cv01480
Filed: November 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Joseph S Dueker
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 635 Breach of Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2024 Filing 25 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Amended from St. Louis County Circuit Court, case number 23SL-CC04180, Jury Demand,, filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-state court filings, #2 Exhibit B-demand letter)(Zeidler, Edward)
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that by January 17, 2024, Defendant shall file an amended notice of removal that alleges facts establishing the citizenship of all parties to this action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Defendant does not timely and fully comply with this Order, this matter will be remanded due to lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (Response to Court due by 1/17/2024.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph S. Dueker on 01/10/2024. (ANR)
January 9, 2024 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Plaintiff Sydney Oats. (Thompson, Tyler)
January 9, 2024 Filing 22 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Plaintiff Sydney Oats. (Modified on 1/10/2024.) (CBL). (Main Document 22 replaced on 1/11/2024) (CBL).
January 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT PROPOSED SCHEDULING PLAN AND SCHEDULING RULE 16 CONFERENCE. This case is assigned to Track: 2 - Standard. Joint Scheduling Plan due by 1/30/2024. Rule 16 Conference set for 2/6/2024 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Joseph S. Dueker. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph S. Dueker on 1/9/2024. (CBL)
January 9, 2024 Filing 20 Electronic Notice re: Disclosure Statement to Plaintiff Sydney Oats - SECOND NOTICE. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every non-governmental party, including individuals, or intervenors must file a Disclosure Statement in this case. Individual parties must list their name and state of citizenship in Section 2. Non individuals must include the state of incorporation/formation and state of primary state of business in section 2. LLCs, LLPs must include all members, sub-members, general and limited partners, and corporations and his/her/its state of citizenship (see above) in Section 2. These entities must be entered into cm/ecf where prompted. # (moed-0001.pdf). (CBL)
January 9, 2024 Filing 19 FULL CONSENT has been received by Plaintiff Sydney Oats, Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (CBL)
December 27, 2023 Filing 18 Electronic Notice re: Disclosure Statement to Plaintiff Sydney Oats. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible and add all individuals and entities into CM/ECF as required # (moed-0001.pdf). (KJS)
December 27, 2023 Notice from Clerk instructing Plaintiff Sydney Oats, Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 1/3/2024. (KJS)
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Memorandum to the Court (ECF No. #16 ), which the Court construes as a Motion for Extension of Time, is GRANTED. Plaintiff is granted until seven (7) days after his reinstatement to the bar of the United States District Court, Eastern District of Missouri, to file any opposition to Defendants Motion to Dismiss. In any event, this extension shall not exceed past Friday, January 12, 2024. ( Response to Court due by 1/12/2024.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph S. Dueker on 12/11/23. (KJS)
December 11, 2023 Filing 16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 MOTION for More Definite Statement by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Zeidler, Edward)
November 30, 2023 Filing 15 SECOND Electronic Notice - Application for Admission needed as to Tyler C. Thompson. Review of case shows that Attorney Tyler C. Thompson is not currently a member of our Bar. For instructions on applying for bar admission or moving for pro hac vice admission, please follow the instructions located on our website at #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov under the Attorney tab. Notice only, no.pdf attached. (KJS)
November 29, 2023 Filing 14 AMENDED DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Zeidler, Edward) Modified on 11/30/2023 (CBL).
November 29, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #12 Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. In accordance with Eastern District of Missouri Local Rules and the Case Management/Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) Procedures Manual, a filing deficiency has been identified as follows: Party filed the Disclosure Statement in this action in which jurisdiction is based on diversity under 28 U.S.C.1332(a) but, did not identify the name and citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor, including all members, sub-members, general and limited partners, and corporations. Please complete section 2 of the form and include the entity's state of incorporation/formation and its principal place of business. The Disclosure Statement must be refiled. (CBL)
November 28, 2023 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Zeidler, Edward)
November 27, 2023 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Zeidler, Edward)
November 27, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION for More Definite Statement by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Petition)(Zeidler, Edward)
November 21, 2023 Filing 9 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (auto)
November 21, 2023 Filing 8 Electronic Notice - Application for Admission needed as to Tyler C. Thompson. Review of case shows that Attorney Tyler C. Thompson is not currently a member of our Bar. For instructions on applying for bar admission or moving for pro hac vice admission, please follow the instructions located on our website at #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov under the Attorney tab. Notice only, no.pdf attached. (JWD)
November 21, 2023 Filing 7 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: St. Louis County Circuit Court, filed by Sydney Oats.(JWD)
November 21, 2023 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENTAL re #1 Notice of Removal Petition, Original Filing Form by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Zeidler, Edward)
November 21, 2023 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Joseph S. Dueker. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible. # (moed-0001.pdf). (JWD)
November 20, 2023 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENTAL Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Notice of Removal Petition, by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Zeidler, Edward) Modified on 11/21/2023 to reflect that supplement is a Civil Cover Sheet (JWD).
November 20, 2023 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Edward W. Zeidler, II for Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Zeidler, Edward)
November 20, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company Sent To: Plaintiff (Zeidler, Edward)
November 20, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company Sent To: State Court - Executed (Zeidler, Edward)
November 20, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of St. Louis County, Missouri, case number 23SL-CC04180, with receipt number AMOEDC-10283395, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Zeidler, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oats v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sydney Oats
Represented By: Tyler C. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Edward W. Zeidler, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?