Wilson v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Elaine Wilson
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 4:2023cv01481
Filed: November 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Matthew T Schelp
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 631 Small Business Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2024 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant United States of America. (Jones, Joshua)
January 19, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant United States of America. (Jones, Joshua)
December 15, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Elaine Wilson. (Eggmann, Robert)
December 11, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Elaine Wilson. (Eggmann, Robert)
November 29, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COURT re Summons served via Certified Mail as to US Attorney General filed by Elaine Wilson. (Eggmann, Robert) Modified on 11/30/2023 (TMT). Modified on 12/5/2023 (TMT).
November 29, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Elaine Wilson as to United States of America. (Eggmann, Robert)
November 27, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Elaine Wilson. Defendant United States of America served on 11/27/2023, answer due 1/26/2024. (Eggmann, Robert)
November 21, 2023 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Kellen Michael Capshaw Cushing for Plaintiff Elaine Wilson. (Cushing, Kellen)
November 21, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant United States of America, on behalf of its Agency, the US Small Business Administration with receipt number AMOEDC-10283541, in the amount of $402 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Elaine Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Original Filing Form Designation Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Small Business Administration, #4 Summons SBA Office of General Counsel, #5 Summons US Attorney's Office, #6 Summons US Attorney General)(Eggmann, Robert)
November 21, 2023 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Matthew T. Schelp. 3 Summons(es) issued and emailed to attormey Robert E. Eggmann, III and Kellen Michael Capshaw Cushing. (JWD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elaine Wilson
Represented By: Robert E. Eggmann, III
Represented By: Kellen Michael Capshaw Cushing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Joshua Michael Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?